Rivera v. State of Colorado Parole Board et al

Petitioner: Victor Rivera
Respondent: Rick Raemisch, Colorado Department of Corrections and State of Colorado Parole Board
Case Number: 1:2018cv02504
Filed: October 1, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Lewis T Babcock
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241st
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 21, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 21, 2018 Filing 9 JUDGMENT by Clerk re: #8 Order Of Dismissal (evana, )
November 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER OF DISMISSAL. That the Petitioner's Request to Amend 28 U.S.C. 2241 Habeas Corpus Petition (ECF No. #7 ) is construed as a request to supplement the original Application (ECF No. #1 ) and is GRANTED. That the Application for a Writ of Habeas Corpus Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2241 (ECF No. #1 ) is DENIED and this action is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for failure to exhaust state court remedies. That no certificate of appealability will issue because jurists of reason would not debate the correctness of the procedural ruling and Applicant has not made a substantial showing of the denial of a constitutional right. IFP on Appeal is Denied, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 11/21/2018. (evana, )
November 14, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION to Amend #1 Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Petitioner Victor Rivera. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Document, #2 Notice of Relief for Amended 2241)(evana, )
October 23, 2018 Filing 6 RESPONSE to #3 Order by Respondents Colorado Department of Corrections, Rick Raemisch, State of Colorado Parole BoardAttorney Kristin A. Ruiz added to party Colorado Department of Corrections(pty:res), Attorney Kristin A. Ruiz added to party Rick Raemisch(pty:res), Attorney Kristin A. Ruiz added to party State of Colorado Parole Board(pty:res). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - ICCES Search)(Ruiz, Kristin)
October 11, 2018 Filing 5 Acceptance of Service on behalf of Rick Raemisch on 10/11/2018 (angar, ) Modified on 10/12/2018 Modified on 10/12/2018 to correct text (angar, ).
October 9, 2018 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Service by Clerk of Court re #3 Order to File Preliminary Response, #1 Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus for Service of Process (rroge, )
October 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER to File Preliminary Response. Within twenty-one days from the date of this Order, Respondents shall file a Preliminary Response that complies with this Order, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 10/3/2018. (angar, )
October 1, 2018 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. Text Only Entry (dbera, )
October 1, 2018 Filing 1 APPLICATION for Writ of Habeas Corpus Pursuant to 28 USC 2241 (Filing fee $ 5, Receipt Number COX086962), filed by Victor Rivera. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(dbera, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rivera v. State of Colorado Parole Board et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Victor Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Rick Raemisch
Represented By: Kristin A. Ruiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Colorado Department of Corrections
Represented By: Kristin A. Ruiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: State of Colorado Parole Board
Represented By: Kristin A. Ruiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?