Pearson v. Colorado Department of Transportation et al
Plaintiff: Joshua M Pearson
Defendant: Colorado Dept. of Transportation, Colorado Department of Transportation and Aaron Adame
Case Number: 1:2018cv02538
Filed: October 3, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Kristen L Mix
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 29, 2018 Filing 13 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (jgonz, ) Modified on 11/29/2018 to correct PDF (jgonz, ).
November 29, 2018 Filing 12 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Aaron Adame by Plaintiff Joshua M Pearson. (Halepaska, John)
November 28, 2018 Filing 11 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (jgonz, )
November 28, 2018 Filing 10 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Colorado Dept. of Transportation by Plaintiff Joshua M Pearson. (Halepaska, John)
November 28, 2018 Filing 9 SUMMONSES issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (jgonz, )
November 28, 2018 Filing 8 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Aaron Adame by Plaintiff Joshua M Pearson. (Halepaska, John)
November 28, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Colorado Dept. of Transportation by Plaintiff Joshua M Pearson. (Halepaska, John)
November 21, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Aaron Adame by Plaintiff Joshua M Pearson. (Halepaska, John)
November 21, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Colorado Dept. of Transportation by Plaintiff Joshua M Pearson. (Halepaska, John)
October 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING/PLANNING CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 10/4/18. Scheduling Conference set for 12/20/2018 10:30 AM in Courtroom A401 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1, #2 Attachment 2) (lgale, )
October 4, 2018 Filing 3 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. No Summons Issued. (rvill, )
October 3, 2018 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. Text Only Entry. (rvill, )
October 3, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT AND JURY DEMAND against Colorado Dept. of Transportation (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6327027)Attorney John David Halepaska added to party Joshua M Pearson(pty:dft), filed by Joshua M Pearson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Halepaska, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pearson v. Colorado Department of Transportation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua M Pearson
Represented By: John David Halepaska
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colorado Dept. of Transportation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colorado Department of Transportation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aaron Adame
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?