Lara v. Arizona Maricopa County

Petitioner: Esteban Benito Lara
Respondent: No Named Defendants, No Named Respondents and Arizona Maricopa County
Case Number: 1:2018cv02589
Filed: October 9, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Gordon P Gallagher
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241st
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 15, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER that the Prisoner's Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915 (ECF No. #8 ) is granted. It is FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant's previously filed Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by a Prisoner (Habeas) (ECF No. #6 ) is denied as moot. It is FURTHER ORDERED that process shall not issue at this time, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 11/15/2018. (evana, )
November 13, 2018 Filing 8 Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915 by Petitioner Esteban Benito Lara. (dkals, )
November 13, 2018 Filing 7 [AMENDED] APPLICATION for Writ of Habeas Corpus Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2241 filed by Esteban Benito Lara.(dkals, )
November 2, 2018 Filing 6 Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs. by Petitioner Esteban Benito Lara. (evana, )
October 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER Applicant has failed to cure the deficiencies because he has not submitted an Application for a Writ of Habeas Corpus Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2241 on the Court-approved form or submitted either Prisoner's Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915 in a Habeas Corpus Action on the Court-approved form or paid the applicable filing fee. Applicant will be given one more opportunity to cure the deficiencies in this action. Applicant shall have up to and including November 30, 2018, to cure the deficiencies as previously directed. The clerk of the court is directed to mail to Applicant, together with a copy of this minute order, blank copies of the following forms: Application for a Writ of Habeas Corpus Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2241, Prisoner's Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915 in a Habeas Corpus Action, and Information and Instructions for Filing an Application for a Writ of Habeas Corpus Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2241, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 10/30/2018. (evana, ) (Mailed as Ordered) (Modified on 10/30/2018 to indicate "Mailed as Ordered" in the text)(evana, ).
October 29, 2018 Filing 4 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Esteban Benito Lara.(agarc, )
October 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Directing Applicant to Cure Definiteness. If Applicant fails to cure all of the designated deficiencies within thirty (30) days from the date of this order, the action will be dismissed without further notice. The dismissal shall be without prejudice, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 10/10/2018. (angar, )
October 9, 2018 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. Text Only Entry. (rroge, )
October 9, 2018 Filing 1 LETTER by Petitioner Esteban Benito Lara. (rroge, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lara v. Arizona Maricopa County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: No Named Defendants
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: No Named Respondents
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Arizona Maricopa County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Esteban Benito Lara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?