Immel v. Union Pacific Railroad Company
Plaintiff: Kim Immel
Defendant: Union Pacific Railroad Company
Case Number: 1:2018cv02631
Filed: October 15, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Wiley Y Daniel
Referring Judge: Kathleen M Tafoya
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 45:51
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 SCHEDULING ORDER: By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 12/10/2018. (ksena) (Main Document 16 replaced on 12/11/2018) (ksena, ).
December 10, 2018 Filing 15 COURTROOM MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya: Scheduling Conference held on 12/10/2018, ( Discovery due by 8/23/2019., Dispositive Motions due by 9/23/2019.). FTR: courtroom 101. (ksena)
December 5, 2018 Filing 14 Proposed Scheduling Order by Defendant Union Pacific Railroad Company. (Goman, Keith)
November 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MINUTE ORDER granting #10 Motion for Leave to Appear Telephonically at Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference and Planning Conference. Plaintiff shall contact chambers, 719-575-0328, at the scheduled time. The parties shall use a LAND LINE; NO CELLULAR, CORDLESS OR SPEAKER PHONES ARE PERMITTED. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 11/28/2018. Text Only Entry (kmtlc2)
November 27, 2018 Filing 12 PROPOSED Order re #10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Telephonically at the Rule 16(b) Scheduling and Planning Conference by Plaintiff Kim Immel (Vucinovich, James) (Modified on 11/30/2018 this is a Proposed Order)(evana, ).
November 27, 2018 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM regarding #10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Telephonically at the Rule 16(b) Scheduling and Planning Conference filed by Kim Immel. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 11/27/18. Text Only Entry (rkeec)
November 27, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Telephonically at the Rule 16(b) Scheduling and Planning Conference by Plaintiff Kim Immel. (Vucinovich, James)
November 8, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Ayshan Ibrahim on behalf of Union Pacific Railroad CompanyAttorney Ayshan Ibrahim added to party Union Pacific Railroad Company(pty:dft) (Ibrahim, Ayshan)
November 8, 2018 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Goman, Keith)
November 8, 2018 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, Attorney Keith M. Goman added to party Union Pacific Railroad Company(pty:dft) by Union Pacific Railroad Company.(Goman, Keith)
October 25, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. All Defendants. (Vucinovich, James)
October 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 12/10/2018 at 09:15 AM in Courtroom 101 (Colorado Springs) before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 10/22/2018. (ksena)
October 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya for non-dispositive matters. That pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this matter is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge is designated to conduct proceedings in this civil action as follows: (1) Convene a scheduling conference under Fed.R.Civ.P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2. (2) Conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause. (3) Hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions. (4) Alternative Dispute Resolution Authority: Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLOLCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge, or on the request of the parties by motion, the court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. It is further ORDERED that parties and counsel shall be familiar and comply with the above judge's requirements found at www.cod.uscourts.gov. By Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 10/16/18. Text Only Entry (rkeec)
October 15, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (rroge, )
October 15, 2018 Filing 2 Case assigned to Judge Wiley Y. Daniel and drawn to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Text Only Entry. (rroge, )
October 15, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Union Pacific Railroad Company (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6345399)Attorney James K. Vucinovich added to party Kim Immel(pty:pla), filed by Kim Immel. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Vucinovich, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Immel v. Union Pacific Railroad Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Pacific Railroad Company
Represented By: Ayshan Ibrahim
Represented By: Keith M. Goman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kim Immel
Represented By: James K. Vucinovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?