Center for Biological Diversity v. U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service et al

Plaintiff: Center for Biological Diversity
Defendant: U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service and Ryan Zinke
Case Number: 1:2018cv02647
Filed: October 17, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Wiley Y Daniel
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 16:1531
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant(s) U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service served on 10/31/2018, answer due 12/31/2018; Ryan Zinke served on 10/31/2018, answer due 12/31/2018. (Segee, Brian)
October 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REGARDING INSTRUCTIONS FOR JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 10/18/2018. (evana, )
October 17, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Related Case by Plaintiff Center for Biological Diversity (Segee, Brian)
October 17, 2018 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Segee, Brian)
October 17, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (dbera, )
October 17, 2018 Filing 2 Case assigned to Judge Wiley Y. Daniel. Text Only Entry (dbera, )
October 17, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6348463)Attorney Brian Paul Segee added to party CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY(pty:pla), filed by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (60 day NOI), #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons FWS, #4 Summons DOI Sec'y, #5 Summons U.S. Att'y, #6 Summons Att'y General)(Segee, Brian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Center for Biological Diversity v. U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan Zinke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Center for Biological Diversity
Represented By: Brian Paul Segee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?