DISH Network, LLC v. Commercial Satellite Communications, Inc.

Plaintiff: DISH Network, LLC
Defendant: Commercial Satellite Communications, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv02696
Filed: October 23, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Michael E Hegarty
Nature of Suit: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 09:0207
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 14, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 12/14/2018. Status Conference set for 2/19/2019 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. (tsher, )
December 14, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by DISH Network, LLC. Commercial Satellite Communications, Inc. served on 11/15/2018, answer due 12/6/2018. (Olsen, Richard)
October 25, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (tsher, )
October 24, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Commercial Satellite Communications, Inc. re #1 Petition/Application,, by Plaintiff DISH Network, LLC. (Olsen, Richard)
October 23, 2018 Filing 4 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. No Summons Issued. (cmadr, )
October 23, 2018 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Text Only Entry. (cmadr, )
October 23, 2018 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent DISH Network Corporation, Corporate Parent Dish DBS Corporation for DISH Network, LLC. (Olsen, Richard)
October 23, 2018 Filing 1 APPLICATION to Confirm Arbitration Award (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 1082-6358485)Attorney Richard Robert Olsen added to party DISH Network, LLC(pty:pla), filed by DISH Network, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A" in support of Application to Confirm Arbitration Award, #2 Exhibit "B" in support of Application to Confirm Arbitration Award, #3 Affidavit of Richard Olsen in support of Application to Confirm Arbitration Award, #4 Summons on Defendant Commercial Satellite Communications, Inc., #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Olsen, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DISH Network, LLC v. Commercial Satellite Communications, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commercial Satellite Communications, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DISH Network, LLC
Represented By: Richard Robert Olsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?