Chestnut v. Lane et al
Petitioner: Hermie Chestnut
Respondent: Attorney General of the State of Colorado, The and Kathy P. Lane
Case Number: 1:2018cv02699
Filed: October 23, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Lewis T Babcock
Referring Judge: Gordon P Gallagher
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 7, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER that Applicant's Consolidated Motion For, and Brief in Support of: F.R.Civ.P., Rule 59(e) to Alter and Amend Order of Dismissal of Applicant's 28 U.S.C. 2241 Petition Dated 11/02/18; or in the Alternative F.R.Civ.P., Rule 60(b) to Reconsider (ECF No. #11 ) is denied, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 12/7/2018. (evana, )
November 30, 2018 Filing 11 Consolidated MOTION for, and Brief in Support of: F.R.C.P/, Rule 59(e) to Alter and Amend #9 Order Dismissing Case, #10 Clerk's Judgment, of Applicant's 28 U.S.C. 2241 Petition dated 11/2/2018; Or in the Alternative R.R.C.P., Rule 60(b) to Reconsider, by Petitioner Hermie Chestnut. (evana, )
November 2, 2018 Filing 10 JUDGMENT by Clerk re: #9 Order Of Dismissal (evana, )
November 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER OF DISMISSAL. That the Application Under 28 U.S.C. 2241 for Writ of Habeas Corpus by a Person in State or Federal Custody (ECF No. #1 ) is DISMISSED and this action is dismissed for failure to state a violation of Applicant' s rights under federal law. It is FURTHER ORDERED that no certificate of appealability will issue. IFP on Appeal is Denied, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 11/2/2018. (evana, )
October 23, 2018 Filing 8 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. Text Only Entry. (cmadr, )
October 23, 2018 Filing 7 Case transferred in from District of Pennsylvania Middle; Case Number 3:18-cv-01142. File, transfer order and docket sheet received.
October 23, 2018 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM and ORDER TRANSFERRING #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus to the District of Colorado; Clerk of Court is directed to CLOSE this case. Signed by Honorable James M. Munley on 10/23/18. (sm) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 10/23/2018.]
August 27, 2018 Filing 5 TRAVERSE by Hermie Chestnut to #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, #4 Response to Petition for Habeas Corpus. (bg) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 10/23/2018.]
August 14, 2018 Filing 4 RESPONSE TO PETITION FOR HABEAS CORPUS by Kathy P. Lane by Kathy P. Lane. (Simpson, Donald) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 10/23/2018.]
July 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Response due by 8/14/2018. This Order and Doc. 1 have been Noticed to the Respondents and the US Atty hard copy via First Class Mail.Signed by Honorable James M. Munley on 7/24/2018. (bg) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 10/23/2018.]
July 12, 2018 Receipt of payment from HERMIE CHESTNUT in the amount of $5.00 for WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS. Transaction posted on 7/11/2018. Receipt number 111022385 processed by bdanilow. (jjs, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 10/23/2018.]
June 7, 2018 Filing 2 30 DAY ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER directing the petitioner to pay the filing fee or file a signed Application to Proceed IFP within 30 days or case will be dismissed. Signed by LP on 06/07/2018. (Attachments: #1 IFP (Habeas Corpus))(lp) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 10/23/2018.]
June 5, 2018 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Hermie Chestnut.(bg) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 10/23/2018.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chestnut v. Lane et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Attorney General of the State of Colorado, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Kathy P. Lane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Hermie Chestnut
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?