Neely v. DePuy Orthopaedics, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Betty L Neely
Defendant: DePuy Orthopaedics, Inc., KYZ Corp, Johnson & Johnson and XYZ Corporation
Case Number: 1:2018cv02701
Filed: October 23, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: N Reid Neureiter
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 20, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2018 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Betty L Neely. DePuy Orthopaedics, Inc. waiver sent on 11/20/2018, answer due 1/22/2019; Johnson & Johnson waiver sent on 11/20/2018, answer due 1/22/2019. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Waiver of Service by DePuy, #2 Affidavit Waiver of Service by Johnson & Johnson)(Orr, Janice)
November 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER granting #5 Motion to Stay by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 11/8/2018. Status Report due by 1/11/2019. This matter is STAYED. (tsher, )
November 7, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION to Stay by Plaintiff Betty L Neely. (Orr, Janice)
October 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Setting Scheduling/Planning Conference and Setting Deadline for Filing of Consent/Non-Consent Form, by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 10/24/2018. Consent/Non-Consent Form due on or before 1/2/2019. Scheduling/Planning Conference set for 1/16/2019 11:00 AM in Courtroom C205 before Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. (slibi, )
October 24, 2018 Filing 3 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. No Summons Issued. (cmadr, )
October 23, 2018 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. Text Only Entry. (cmadr, )
October 23, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6359092)Attorney Janice C. Orr added to party Betty L Neely(pty:pla), filed by Betty L Neely. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Orr, Janice)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Neely v. DePuy Orthopaedics, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DePuy Orthopaedics, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KYZ Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XYZ Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Betty L Neely
Represented By: Janice C. Orr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?