USA v. Real Property located at 640 Leo Lane, Thornton, Colorado et al

Plaintiff: USA
Defendant: $6,134.00 in United States currency, $53,042.00 in United States currency, $1,100.00 in United States currency, $53,849.00 in United States currency, Real Property located at 1125 Spangler Drive, Northglenn, Colorado, $9,290.00 in United States currency, 2002 Porsche 911, VIN: WP0AB29902S686480, $2,620.00 in United States currency, $5,634.00 in United States currency, 2014 Toyota FJ Cruiser, VIN: JTEBU4BFXEK190094, Real Property located at 13759 Steele Court, Thornton, Colorado, $24,119.00 in United States currency, $93,050.00 in United States currency, $14,254.00 in United States currency, $69,490.00 in United States currency, Real Property located at 7914 Kettle Drum Street, Colorado Springs, Colorado, $8,000.00 in United States currency, $18,950.00 in United States currency, Real Property located at 12895 Clarkson Circle, Thornton, Colorado, $29,063.00 in United States currency, $4,265.00 in United States currency, Real Property located at 4056 E. 130th Way, Thornton, Colorado, $1,269.00 in United States currency, Real Property located at 783 Milky Way, Thornton, Colorado, $2,490.00 in United States currency, Real Property located at 12352 W. Iowa Drive, Lakewood, Colorado, $51,510.00 in United States currency, 2012 Toyota Tundra, VIN: 5TFDY5F12CX259267, Real Property located at 5227 Gentle Wind Road, Colorado Springs, Colorado, $4,613.00 in United States currency, Real Property located at 5786 W. 2nd Avenue, Lakewood, Colorado, Real Property located at 2360 W. 74th Avenue, Denver, Colorado, $16,200.00 in United States currency, $9,092.00 in United States currency, $31,188.00 in United States currency, 2012 Honda Pilot, VIN: 5FNYF4H99CB040658, $22,076.00 in United States currency, 2016 BMW X5 SUV, VIN: 5YMKT6C59G0R77777, 2012 Toyota RAV4, VIN: 2T3BK4DV6CW089914, Real Property located at 7866 Vallejo Street, Denver, Colorado, $2,000.00 in United States currency, Real Property located at 13103 Bellaire Drive, Thornton, Colorado, $2,500.00 in United States currency, Real Property located at 14575 High Street, Thornton, Colorado, Real Property Located At 890 E. 129th Avenue, Thornton, Colorado, $5,810.00 in United States currency, $28,443.00 in United States currency, 2012 Toyota Highlander, VIN: 5TDBK3EH7CS127963, Real Property located at 12911 Clarkson Circle, Thornton, Colorado, 2015 Toyota Sienna, VIN: 5TDJK3DCXFS126621, Real Property located at 11139 W. Tennessee Court, Lakewood, Colorado, $3,160.00 in United States currency, Real Property located at 18670 E. Ida Avenue, Aurora, Colorado, $6,991.00 in United States currency, $18,440.00 in United States currency, $62,008.00 in United States currency, $27,838.00 in United States currency, 2015 Scion TC, VIN: JTKJF5C72FJ003406, Real Property located at 10452 Dale Circle, Westminster Colorado, $6,880.00 In United States currency, $4,523.00 in United States currency, $3,972.00 in United States currency, 2014 Subaru Legacy, VIN: 4S4BRDLC1E2307535, Real Property located at 8911 W. Cooper Avenue, Littleton, Colorado, Real Property located at 640 Leo Lane, Thornton, Colorado, Real Property Located At 13865 Milwaukee Street, Thornton, Colorado, Real Property located at 1913 S. Michigan Place, Denver, Colorado, 2018 Toyota 4runner, VIN: JTEBU5JR8J5519773, $3,340.00 in United States currency, 2001 Mercedes-Benz, VIN: WDBFA68F51F200369 and 2011 Toyota Sienna, VIN: 5TDDK3DC5BS005910
Case Number: 1:2018cv02734
Filed: October 25, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Wiley Y Daniel
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 6, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 6, 2018 Filing 32 NOTICE of Lis Pendens 1913 South Michigan Way by Plaintiff USA (Andrews, Tonya)
November 6, 2018 Filing 31 NOTICE of Lis Pendens Release of Lis Pendens - 1713 S. Michigan Way by Plaintiff USA (Andrews, Tonya)
October 31, 2018 Filing 30 WARRANT FOR ARREST OF PROPERTY IN REM issued (evana, )
October 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER FOR WARRANT for Arrest of Property IN REM, by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 10/30/2018. (evana, )
October 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER that United States' Motion for Leave to Restrict the Verified Complaint for Forfeiture In Rem (ECF No. 2), filed October 25, 2018, is GRANTED, by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 10/30/2018. (evana, )
October 25, 2018 Filing 27 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (cmadr, )
October 25, 2018 Filing 26 Case assigned to Judge Wiley Y. Daniel and drawn to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Text Only Entry. (cmadr, )
October 25, 2018 Filing 25 NOTICE of Lis Pendens 783 Milky Way by Plaintiff USA (Andrews, Tonya)
October 25, 2018 Filing 24 NOTICE of Lis Pendens 890 East 129th Avenua by Plaintiff USA (Andrews, Tonya)
October 25, 2018 Filing 23 NOTICE of Lis Pendens 18670 East Ida Avenua by Plaintiff USA (Andrews, Tonya)
October 25, 2018 Filing 22 NOTICE of Lis Pendens 7914 Kettle Drum Street by Plaintiff USA (Andrews, Tonya)
October 25, 2018 Filing 21 NOTICE of Lis Pendens 5227 Gentle Wind Road by Plaintiff USA (Andrews, Tonya)
October 25, 2018 Filing 20 NOTICE of Lis Pendens 14575 High Street by Plaintiff USA (Andrews, Tonya)
October 25, 2018 Filing 19 NOTICE of Lis Pendens 12895 Clarkson Circle by Plaintiff USA (Andrews, Tonya)
October 25, 2018 Filing 18 NOTICE of Lis Pendens 2360 West 74th Avenue by Plaintiff USA (Andrews, Tonya)
October 25, 2018 Filing 17 NOTICE of Lis Pendens 13103 Bellaire Drive by Plaintiff USA (Andrews, Tonya)
October 25, 2018 Filing 16 NOTICE of Lis Pendens 7866 Vallejo Street by Plaintiff USA (Andrews, Tonya)
October 25, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE of Lis Pendens 1913 S. Michigan Way by Plaintiff USA (Andrews, Tonya)
October 25, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE of Lis Pendens 5786 W 2nd Avenue by Plaintiff USA (Andrews, Tonya)
October 25, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE of Lis Pendens 12352 W Iowa Drive by Plaintiff USA (Andrews, Tonya)
October 25, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE of Lis Pendens 4056 E. 130th by Plaintiff USA (Andrews, Tonya)
October 25, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of Lis Pendens 12911 Clarkson Circle by Plaintiff USA (Andrews, Tonya)
October 25, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Lis Pendens 11139 Tennessee Court by Plaintiff USA (Andrews, Tonya)
October 25, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Lis Pendens 13865 Milwaukee Street by Plaintiff USA (Andrews, Tonya)
October 25, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Lis Pendens 13759 Steele Court by Plaintiff USA (Andrews, Tonya)
October 25, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Lis Pendens 1125 Spangler Drive by Plaintiff USA (Andrews, Tonya)
October 25, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Lis Pendens 8911 West Cooper by Plaintiff USA (Andrews, Tonya)
October 25, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Lis Pendens 10452 Dale Circle by Plaintiff USA (Andrews, Tonya)
October 25, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Lis Pendens 640 Leo Lane by Plaintiff USA (Andrews, Tonya)
October 25, 2018 Filing 3 RESTRICTED DOCUMENT - Level 2: by Plaintiff USA.. (Andrews, Tonya)
October 25, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Restrict by Plaintiff USA. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Andrews, Tonya)
October 25, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR FORFEITURE IN REM against $1,100.00 in United States currency, $1,269.00 in United States currency, $14,254.00 in United States currency, $16,200.00 in United States currency, $18,440.00 in United States currency, $18,950.00 in United States currency, $2,000.00 in United States currency, $2,490.00 in United States currency, $2,500.00 in United States currency, $2,620.00 in United States currency, $22,076.00 in United States currency, $24,119.00 in United States currency, $27,838.00 in United States currency, $28,443.00 in United States currency, $29,063.00 in United States currency, $3,160.00 in United States currency, $3,340.00 in United States currency, $3,972.00 in United States currency, $31,188.00 in United States currency, $4,265.00 in United States currency, $4,523.00 in United States currency, $4,613.00 in United States currency, $5,634.00 in United States currency, $5,810.00 in United States currency, $51,510.00 in United States currency, $53,042.00 in United States currency, $53,849.00 in United States currency, $6,134.00 in United States currency, $6,880.00 In United States currency, $6,991.00 in United States currency, $62,008.00 in United States currency, $69,490.00 in United States currency, $8,000.00 in United States currency, $9,092.00 in United States currency, $9,290.00 in United States currency, $93,050.00 in United States currency, 2001 Mercedes-Benz, VIN: WDBFA68F51F200369, 2002 Porsche 911, VIN: WP0AB29902S686480, 2011 Toyota Sienna, VIN: 5TDDK3DC5BS005910, 2012 Honda Pilot, VIN: 5FNYF4H99CB040658, 2012 Toyota Highlander, VIN: 5TDBK3EH7CS127963, 2012 Toyota RAV4, VIN: 2T3BK4DV6CW089914, 2012 Toyota Tundra, VIN: 5TFDY5F12CX259267, 2014 Subaru Legacy, VIN: 4S4BRDLC1E2307535, 2014 Toyota FJ Cruiser, VIN: JTEBU4BFXEK190094, 2015 Scion TC, VIN: JTKJF5C72FJ003406, 2015 Toyota Sienna, VIN: 5TDJK3DCXFS126621, 2016 BMW X5 SUV, VIN: 5YMKT6C59G0R77777, 2018 Toyota 4runner, VIN: JTEBU5JR8J5519773, Real Property Located At 13865 Milwaukee Street, Thornton, Colorado, Real Property Located At 890 E. 129th Avenue, Thornton, Colorado, Real Property located at 10452 Dale Circle, Westminster Colorado, Real Property located at 11139 W. Tennessee Court, Lakewood, Colorado, Real Property located at 1125 Spangler Drive, Northglenn, Colorado, Real Property located at 12352 W. Iowa Drive, Lakewood, Colorado, Real Property located at 12895 Clarkson Circle, Thornton, Colorado, Real Property located at 12911 Clarkson Circle, Thornton, Colorado, Real Property located at 13103 Bellaire Drive, Thornton, Colorado, Real Property located at 13759 Steele Court, Thornton, Colorado, Real Property located at 14575 High Street, Thornton, Colorado, Real Property located at 18670 E. Ida Avenue, Aurora, Colorado, Real Property located at 1913 S. Michigan Place, Denver, Colorado, Real Property located at 2360 W. 74th Avenue, Denver, Colorado, Real Property located at 4056 E. 130th Way, Thornton, Colorado, Real Property located at 5227 Gentle Wind Road, Colorado Springs, Colorado, Real Property located at 5786 W. 2nd Avenue, Lakewood, Colorado, Real Property located at 640 Leo Lane, Thornton, Colorado, Real Property located at 783 Milky Way, Thornton, Colorado, Real Property located at 7866 Vallejo Street, Denver, Colorado, Real Property located at 7914 Kettle Drum Street, Colorado Springs, Colorado, Real Property located at 8911 W. Cooper Avenue, Littleton, Colorado Attorney Tonya Shotwell Andrews added to party USA(pty:pla), filed by USA. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only), #2 Warrant for Arrest of Property, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Andrews, Tonya)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA v. Real Property located at 640 Leo Lane, Thornton, Colorado et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $6,134.00 in United States currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $53,042.00 in United States currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $1,100.00 in United States currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $53,849.00 in United States currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Real Property located at 1125 Spangler Drive, Northglenn, Colorado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $9,290.00 in United States currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2002 Porsche 911, VIN: WP0AB29902S686480
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $2,620.00 in United States currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $5,634.00 in United States currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2014 Toyota FJ Cruiser, VIN: JTEBU4BFXEK190094
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Real Property located at 13759 Steele Court, Thornton, Colorado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $24,119.00 in United States currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $93,050.00 in United States currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $14,254.00 in United States currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $69,490.00 in United States currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Real Property located at 7914 Kettle Drum Street, Colorado Springs, Colorado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $8,000.00 in United States currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $18,950.00 in United States currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Real Property located at 12895 Clarkson Circle, Thornton, Colorado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $29,063.00 in United States currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $4,265.00 in United States currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Real Property located at 4056 E. 130th Way, Thornton, Colorado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $1,269.00 in United States currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Real Property located at 783 Milky Way, Thornton, Colorado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $2,490.00 in United States currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Real Property located at 12352 W. Iowa Drive, Lakewood, Colorado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $51,510.00 in United States currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2012 Toyota Tundra, VIN: 5TFDY5F12CX259267
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Real Property located at 5227 Gentle Wind Road, Colorado Springs, Colorado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $4,613.00 in United States currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Real Property located at 5786 W. 2nd Avenue, Lakewood, Colorado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Real Property located at 2360 W. 74th Avenue, Denver, Colorado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $16,200.00 in United States currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $9,092.00 in United States currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $31,188.00 in United States currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2012 Honda Pilot, VIN: 5FNYF4H99CB040658
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $22,076.00 in United States currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2016 BMW X5 SUV, VIN: 5YMKT6C59G0R77777
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2012 Toyota RAV4, VIN: 2T3BK4DV6CW089914
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Real Property located at 7866 Vallejo Street, Denver, Colorado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $2,000.00 in United States currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Real Property located at 13103 Bellaire Drive, Thornton, Colorado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $2,500.00 in United States currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Real Property located at 14575 High Street, Thornton, Colorado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Real Property Located At 890 E. 129th Avenue, Thornton, Colorado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $5,810.00 in United States currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $28,443.00 in United States currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2012 Toyota Highlander, VIN: 5TDBK3EH7CS127963
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Real Property located at 12911 Clarkson Circle, Thornton, Colorado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2015 Toyota Sienna, VIN: 5TDJK3DCXFS126621
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Real Property located at 11139 W. Tennessee Court, Lakewood, Colorado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $3,160.00 in United States currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Real Property located at 18670 E. Ida Avenue, Aurora, Colorado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $6,991.00 in United States currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $18,440.00 in United States currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $62,008.00 in United States currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $27,838.00 in United States currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2015 Scion TC, VIN: JTKJF5C72FJ003406
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Real Property located at 10452 Dale Circle, Westminster Colorado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $6,880.00 In United States currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $4,523.00 in United States currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $3,972.00 in United States currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2014 Subaru Legacy, VIN: 4S4BRDLC1E2307535
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Real Property located at 8911 W. Cooper Avenue, Littleton, Colorado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Real Property located at 640 Leo Lane, Thornton, Colorado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Real Property Located At 13865 Milwaukee Street, Thornton, Colorado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Real Property located at 1913 S. Michigan Place, Denver, Colorado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2018 Toyota 4runner, VIN: JTEBU5JR8J5519773
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $3,340.00 in United States currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2001 Mercedes-Benz, VIN: WDBFA68F51F200369
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2011 Toyota Sienna, VIN: 5TDDK3DC5BS005910
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: USA
Represented By: Tonya Shotwell Andrews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?