Durrah v. JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A., et al

Plaintiff: John R. Durrah
Defendant: JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A. and Bank of America, N.A.
Case Number: 1:2018cv02755
Filed: October 29, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Philip A Brimmer
Referring Judge: N Reid Neureiter
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 20, 2019 Filing 43 MEMORANDUM regarding #42 MOTION for Leave to Appear AT SCHEDULING CONFERENCE BY TELEPHONE AND REQUEST FOR EXPEDITED RULING filed by JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A., Bank of America, N.A. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 2/20/19. Text Only Entry (pabsec)
February 20, 2019 Filing 42 MOTION for Leave to Appear AT SCHEDULING CONFERENCE BY TELEPHONE AND REQUEST FOR EXPEDITED RULING by Defendants Bank of America, N.A., JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Aspinwall, William)
February 19, 2019 Filing 41 MEMORANDUM regarding #40 MOTION to Dismiss filed by JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A., Bank of America, N.A. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 2/19/19. Text Only Entry (pabsec)
February 15, 2019 Filing 40 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendants Bank of America, N.A., JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Aspinwall, William)
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 39 MINUTE ORDER granting #37 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 2/8/2019. Bank of America, N.A. answer due 2/15/2019; JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A. answer due 2/15/2019. (tsher, )
February 8, 2019 Filing 38 MEMORANDUM regarding #37 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #34 Amended Complaint filed by JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A., Bank of America, N.A. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 2/8/19. Text Only Entry (pabsec)
February 8, 2019 Filing 37 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #34 Amended Complaint by Defendants Bank of America, N.A., JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Aspinwall, William)
January 17, 2019 Filing 36 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Answer or Respond to the Complaint by Defendants Bank of America, N.A., JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A.. Bank of America, N.A. answer due 2/8/2019; JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A. answer due 2/8/2019. (Elliott, Rebekah)
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 35 MINUTE ORDER denying as moot #12 Defendants Motion to Dismiss, by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 1/09/2019. (slibi, )
January 4, 2019 Filing 34 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by John R. Durrah. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit HELOC Agreement, #2 Exhibit SD Directive)(Webb, Joseph)
December 19, 2018 Filing 33 COURTROOM MINUTES for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter: Telephonic Status Conference held on 12/19/2018. ORDER withdrawing #11 Plaintiffs Emergency Request for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction or Ex-parte Temporary Restraining Order. Scheduling Conference set for 2/21/2019 10:30 AM in Courtroom C205 before Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. FTR: Courtroom C205. (slibi, )
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 32 MINUTE ORDER granting #30 Unopposed Motion for 10-Day Extension of Time Until December 27, 2018 to Respond to Defendants Motion to Dismiss, by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 12/17/2018. Plaintiff shall respond to Defendants Motion to Dismiss Dkt. #12 on or before December 27, 2018. (slibi, )
December 17, 2018 Filing 31 MEMORANDUM regarding #30 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #12 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed by John R. Durrah. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 12/17/18. Text Only Entry (pabsec)
December 14, 2018 Filing 30 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #12 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by Plaintiff John R. Durrah. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Webb, Joseph)
December 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 29 MINUTE ORDER granting #27 Defendants Unopposed Motion to Appear Telephonically at the December 19, 2018 Status Conference, by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 12/13/2018. (slibi, )
December 12, 2018 Filing 28 MEMORANDUM regarding #27 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Appear Telephonically at the December 19, 2018 Status Conference filed by JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A., Bank of America, N.A. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 12/12/18. Text Only Entry (pabsec)
December 12, 2018 Filing 27 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Appear Telephonically at the December 19, 2018 Status Conference by Defendants Bank of America, N.A., JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Aspinwall, William)
December 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MINUTE ORDER granting #24 Motion to Continue By Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 12/12/2018. Plaintiff's counsel is given leave to appear at the 12/19/2018 Status Conference by telephone. (tsher, )
December 12, 2018 Filing 25 MEMORANDUM regarding #24 Unopposed MOTION to Continue Status Conference or Particiate Telephonically filed by John R. Durrah. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter By Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 12/12/18. Text Only Entry (pabsec)
December 12, 2018 Filing 24 Unopposed MOTION to Continue Status Conference or Particiate Telephonically by Plaintiff John R. Durrah. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Webb, Joseph)
December 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MINUTE ORDER granting #21 Unopposed Motion to Cancel the Hearing on Plaintiffs Emergency Request for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction or Ex-Parte Temporary Restraining Order, by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 12/05/2018. The Motion Hearing set for December 7, 2018 at 1:00 p.m. is VACATED. It is further ORDERED that Plaintiff should be prepared to advise the Court at the Status Conference set for December 19, 2018 at 9:30 a.m. as to whether Plaintiff means to pursue or withdraw his TRO request. (slibi, )
December 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MEMORANDUM regarding #21 Unopposed MOTION to Vacate #16 Minute Order December 7, 2018 hearing filed by John R. Durrah. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 12/5/18. Text Only Entry (pabsec)
December 5, 2018 Filing 21 Unopposed MOTION to Vacate #16 Minute Order December 7, 2018 hearing by Plaintiff John R. Durrah. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only) Proposed Order)(Webb, Joseph)
December 4, 2018 Filing 20 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance Webb Law Group, LLC by Joseph G. Webb on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Joseph G. Webb added to party John R. Durrah(pty:pla) (Webb, Joseph)
December 3, 2018 Filing 19 BRIEF in Opposition to #11 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order And Preliminary Injunction or Ex-Parte Temporary Restraining Order filed by Defendants Bank of America, N.A., JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Aspinwall, William)
December 3, 2018 Filing 18 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Rebekah Lee Wallace Elliott on behalf of JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A.Attorney Rebekah Lee Wallace Elliott added to party JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A.(pty:dft) (Elliott, Rebekah)
November 30, 2018 Filing 17 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Rebekah Lee Wallace Elliott on behalf of Bank of America, N.A.Attorney Rebekah Lee Wallace Elliott added to party Bank of America, N.A.(pty:dft) (Elliott, Rebekah)
November 29, 2018 Filing 16 MINUTE ORDER re: #11 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by John R. Durrah. Motion Hearing set for 12/7/2018 01:00 PM in Courtroom C205 before Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. (tsher, )
November 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MEMORANDUM regarding #11 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by John R. Durrah. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 11/28/18. Text Only Entry (pabsec)
November 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MINUTE ORDER. Defendants shall respond to plaintiff's Emergency Request for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction #11 on or before Monday, December 3, 2018. By Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 11/28/18. Text Only Entry (pabsec)
November 27, 2018 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM regarding #12 MOTION to Dismiss filed by JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A., Bank of America, N.A.. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 11/27/2018. Text Only Entry. (sphil, )
November 26, 2018 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendants Bank of America, N.A., JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Aspinwall, William)
November 26, 2018 Filing 11 WITHDRAWN Plaintiff's Emergency Request for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction or Ex-Parte Temporary Restraining Order by Plaintiff John R. Durrah. (Attachments: #1 Information Sheet for TRO)(sphil, ) Modified on 12/19/2018 to withdraw without prejudice pursuant to #11 (slibi, ).
November 5, 2018 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by John R. Durrah. Bank of America, N.A. served on 11/5/2018, answer due 11/26/2018. (sphil, )
November 5, 2018 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by John R. Durrah. JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A. served on 11/5/2018, answer due 11/26/2018. (sphil, )
October 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 10/31/2018. Status Conference set for 12/19/2018 09:30 AM in Courtroom C205 before Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. (tsher, )
October 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter for all motions. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, (4) conduct a pretrial conference and enter a pretrial order, and (5) conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions. Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, this court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding.By Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 10/30/18. Text Only Entry (pabsec)
October 29, 2018 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of Service by Mail by Clerk of Court re #4 Memorandum Returning Case, 5 Case Reassigned to John R. Durrah; 26671 East Clifton Drive; Aurora, CO 80016. Text Only Entry (rkeec)
October 29, 2018 Filing 5 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #4 Memorandum Returning Case. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Philip A. Brimmer. All future pleadings should be designated as 18-cv-02755-PAB. (Text Only Entry) (rkeec)
October 29, 2018 Filing 4 MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel. (rkeec)
October 29, 2018 Filing 3 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). No Summonses issued. Form mailed to filer. (dbera, ) Modified to correct docket text on 10/29/2018 (dbera, ).
October 29, 2018 Filing 2 Case assigned to Judge Wiley Y. Daniel and drawn to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. Text Only Entry (dbera, )
October 29, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Detrimental Reliance, Fraud in the Concealment, Fraud in the Inducement, Unconscionable Contracts, Breach of Contract, Breach of Fiduciary Duty, Quiet Title, Slander of Title against Bank of America, N.A., JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A. Filing Fee: $400.00; Receipt Number:COX087344, filed by John R. Durrah. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(dbera, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Durrah v. JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Represented By: William A. Aspinwall
Represented By: Rebekah Lee Wallace Elliott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A.
Represented By: William A. Aspinwall
Represented By: Rebekah Lee Wallace Elliott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John R. Durrah
Represented By: Joseph G. Webb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?