Centrix Financial Liquidating Trust et al v. Sutton et al
Plaintiff: Jeffrey A. Weinman and Centrix Financial Liquidating Trust
Defendant: Kate Sutton, Nano Formulas, LLC, Julie (I) L. Sutton, Nano IP, LLC, Julie L Sutton Revocable Trust, Robert Sutton, Williston Holding Group, Heritage Advisors, LLC, Williston Trust, Doug Symons, Patrick Baker, A Fortiori, LLC, Nanosphere Health Sciences, Inc, Freedom Fund Holdings, University Irrevocable Trust, Michael Connolly, Orchard Lane, LLC, Nanosphere Health Science, LLC, Foundation Fund, LLC, The Orchard, LLC, Prime Health, LLC, Preferred Holding Group, LLC, Williston Trust Group, LLC, Williston Holdings, Ltd., David Sutton, Polo Place, LLC, Hampden Irrevocable Trust, Julie Sutton and Orchard, LLC, The
Case Number: 1:2018cv02769
Filed: October 29, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: R Brooke Jackson
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2018 Filing 69 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(B)(6) by Defendant Michael Connolly. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Nesland, James)
December 21, 2018 Filing 68 NOTICE of Filing Amended Pleading re #67 Amended Complaint,, by Plaintiffs Centrix Financial Liquidating Trust, Jeffrey A. Weinman (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Vellone, Patrick)
December 20, 2018 Filing 67 AMENDED COMPLAINT against A Fortiori, LLC, Patrick Baker, Michael Connolly, Foundation Fund, LLC, Freedom Fund Holdings, Hampden Irrevocable Trust, Heritage Advisors, LLC, Julie L Sutton Revocable Trust, Nano Formulas, LLC, Nano IP, LLC, Nanosphere Health Science, LLC, Nanosphere Health Sciences, Inc, Orchard Lane, LLC, Orchard, LLC, The, Polo Place, LLC, Preferred Holding Group, LLC, Prime Health, LLC, David Sutton, Julie Sutton, Kate Sutton, Robert Sutton, Doug Symons, University Irrevocable Trust, Williston Holding Group, Williston Holdings, Ltd., Williston Trust, Williston Trust Group, LLC, filed by Jeffrey A. Weinman, Centrix Financial Liquidating Trust.(Vellone, Patrick)
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 66 MINUTE ORDER Re: Joint MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and Request for Emergency Forthwith Consideration. The request for expedited consideration is denied. Most if not all cases would have to received accelerated treatment if a defendant's claim that the complaint is lacking in merit were grounds for acceleration. Particularly when the duty to confer has not been completed, and we are in the midst of the holidays, it is not appropriate. Once the plaintiff has responded and you have replied, we will schedule an oral argument as you have requested as quickly as we reasonably can on our docket. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 12/19/18. Text Only Entry (rbjsec. )
December 18, 2018 Filing 65 Joint MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and Request for Emergency Forthwith Condsideration by Defendants Nano Formulas, LLC, Nano IP, LLC, Nanosphere Health Science, LLC, Nanosphere Health Sciences, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only) Granting Expedited Briefing, #2 Proposed Order (PDF Only) Granting Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.12(B)(6), #3 Exhibit A - Settlement Agreement, #4 Exhibit B - Motion for Order Authorizing Rule 2004 Examinations, #5 Affidavit James Ewing, #6 Exhibit to Affidavit)(Christensen, Shaun)
December 11, 2018 Filing 64 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jeffrey A. Weinman, Centrix Financial Liquidating Trust. Heritage Advisors, LLC served on 12/11/2018, answer due 1/2/2019. (Sears, Carissa)
December 11, 2018 Filing 63 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jeffrey A. Weinman, Centrix Financial Liquidating Trust. Nano Formulas, LLC served on 12/11/2018, answer due 1/2/2019. (Sears, Carissa)
December 11, 2018 Filing 62 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jeffrey A. Weinman, Centrix Financial Liquidating Trust. A Fortiori, LLC served on 12/11/2018, answer due 1/2/2019. (Sears, Carissa)
December 11, 2018 Filing 61 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Jeffrey A. Weinman, Centrix Financial Liquidating Trust. Nanosphere Health Science, LLC waiver sent on 12/6/2018, answer due 2/4/2019. (Sears, Carissa)
December 11, 2018 Filing 60 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Jeffrey A. Weinman, Centrix Financial Liquidating Trust. Nanosphere Health Sciences, Inc waiver sent on 12/6/2018, answer due 2/4/2019. (Sears, Carissa)
December 11, 2018 Filing 59 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Jeffrey A. Weinman, Centrix Financial Liquidating Trust. Williston Trust waiver sent on 11/28/2018, answer due 1/28/2019. (Sears, Carissa)
December 11, 2018 Filing 58 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Jeffrey A. Weinman, Centrix Financial Liquidating Trust. Williston Trust Group, LLC waiver sent on 11/28/2018, answer due 1/28/2019. (Sears, Carissa)
December 11, 2018 Filing 57 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Jeffrey A. Weinman, Centrix Financial Liquidating Trust. Williston Holdings, Ltd. waiver sent on 11/28/2018, answer due 1/28/2019. (Sears, Carissa)
December 11, 2018 Filing 56 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Jeffrey A. Weinman, Centrix Financial Liquidating Trust. Williston Holding Group waiver sent on 11/28/2018, answer due 1/28/2019. (Sears, Carissa)
December 11, 2018 Filing 55 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Jeffrey A. Weinman, Centrix Financial Liquidating Trust. Polo Place, LLC waiver sent on 12/5/2018, answer due 2/4/2019. (Sears, Carissa)
December 11, 2018 Filing 54 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Jeffrey A. Weinman, Centrix Financial Liquidating Trust. Patrick Baker waiver sent on 11/28/2018, answer due 1/28/2019. (Sears, Carissa)
December 11, 2018 Filing 53 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Jeffrey A. Weinman, Centrix Financial Liquidating Trust. Orchard Lane, LLC waiver sent on 12/5/2018, answer due 2/4/2019. (Sears, Carissa)
December 11, 2018 Filing 52 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Jeffrey A. Weinman, Centrix Financial Liquidating Trust. Freedom Fund Holdings waiver sent on 11/28/2018, answer due 1/28/2019. (Sears, Carissa)
December 11, 2018 Filing 51 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Jeffrey A. Weinman, Centrix Financial Liquidating Trust. Foundation Fund, LLC waiver sent on 11/28/2018, answer due 1/28/2019. (Sears, Carissa)
December 11, 2018 Filing 50 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Jeffrey A. Weinman, Centrix Financial Liquidating Trust. Doug Symons waiver sent on 11/28/2018, answer due 1/28/2019. (Sears, Carissa)
December 11, 2018 Filing 49 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jeffrey A. Weinman, Centrix Financial Liquidating Trust. Nano IP, LLC served on 12/6/2018, answer due 12/27/2018. (Sears, Carissa)
December 11, 2018 Filing 48 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jeffrey A. Weinman, Centrix Financial Liquidating Trust. Hampden Irrevocable Trust served on 12/6/2018, answer due 12/27/2018. (Sears, Carissa)
December 11, 2018 Filing 47 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jeffrey A. Weinman, Centrix Financial Liquidating Trust. University Irrevocable Trust served on 12/6/2018, answer due 12/27/2018. (Sears, Carissa)
December 11, 2018 Filing 46 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Jeffrey A. Weinman, Centrix Financial Liquidating Trust. Robert Sutton waiver sent on 11/28/2018, answer due 1/28/2019. (Sears, Carissa)
December 11, 2018 Filing 45 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Jeffrey A. Weinman, Centrix Financial Liquidating Trust. Kate Sutton waiver sent on 11/28/2018, answer due 1/28/2019. (Sears, Carissa)
December 11, 2018 Filing 44 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Jeffrey A. Weinman, Centrix Financial Liquidating Trust. Julie L Sutton Revocable Trust waiver sent on 11/28/2018, answer due 1/28/2019. (Sears, Carissa)
December 11, 2018 Filing 43 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Jeffrey A. Weinman, Centrix Financial Liquidating Trust. Julie Sutton waiver sent on 11/28/2018, answer due 1/28/2019. (Sears, Carissa)
December 11, 2018 Filing 42 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Jeffrey A. Weinman, Centrix Financial Liquidating Trust. David Sutton waiver sent on 11/28/2018, answer due 1/28/2019. (Sears, Carissa)
December 11, 2018 Filing 41 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Jeffrey A. Weinman, Centrix Financial Liquidating Trust. Orchard, LLC, The waiver sent on 11/28/2018, answer due 1/28/2019. (Sears, Carissa)
December 11, 2018 Filing 40 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Jeffrey A. Weinman, Centrix Financial Liquidating Trust. Prime Health, LLC waiver sent on 11/28/2018, answer due 1/28/2019. (Sears, Carissa)
December 11, 2018 Filing 39 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Jeffrey A. Weinman, Centrix Financial Liquidating Trust. Preferred Holding Group, LLC waiver sent on 11/28/2018, answer due 1/28/2019. (Sears, Carissa)
December 11, 2018 Filing 38 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Jeffrey A. Weinman, Centrix Financial Liquidating Trust. Michael Connolly waiver sent on 11/28/2018, answer due 1/28/2019. (Sears, Carissa)
November 27, 2018 Filing 37 SUMMONSES issued by Clerk. (dkals, )
November 26, 2018 Filing 36 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Williston Trust re #7 Summons Request,,,,,, #1 Complaint, by Plaintiffs Centrix Financial Liquidating Trust, Jeffrey A. Weinman. (Sears, Carissa)
November 26, 2018 Filing 35 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Williston Trust Group LLC re #7 Summons Request,,,,,, #1 Complaint, by Plaintiffs Centrix Financial Liquidating Trust, Jeffrey A. Weinman. (Sears, Carissa)
November 26, 2018 Filing 34 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Williston Holdings Ltd re #7 Summons Request,,,,,, #1 Complaint, by Plaintiffs Centrix Financial Liquidating Trust, Jeffrey A. Weinman. (Sears, Carissa)
November 26, 2018 Filing 33 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Williston Holding Group re #7 Summons Request,,,,,, #1 Complaint, by Plaintiffs Centrix Financial Liquidating Trust, Jeffrey A. Weinman. (Sears, Carissa)
November 26, 2018 Filing 32 SUMMONS REQUEST as to University Irrevocable Trust re #7 Summons Request,,,,,, #1 Complaint, by Plaintiffs Centrix Financial Liquidating Trust, Jeffrey A. Weinman. (Sears, Carissa)
November 26, 2018 Filing 31 SUMMONS REQUEST as to The Orchard LLC re #7 Summons Request,,,,,, #1 Complaint, by Plaintiffs Centrix Financial Liquidating Trust, Jeffrey A. Weinman. (Sears, Carissa)
November 26, 2018 Filing 30 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Robert Sutton re #7 Summons Request,,,,,, #1 Complaint, by Plaintiffs Centrix Financial Liquidating Trust, Jeffrey A. Weinman. (Sears, Carissa)
November 26, 2018 Filing 29 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Prime Health LLC re #7 Summons Request,,,,,, #1 Complaint, by Plaintiffs Centrix Financial Liquidating Trust, Jeffrey A. Weinman. (Sears, Carissa)
November 26, 2018 Filing 28 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Preferred Holding Group LLC re #7 Summons Request,,,,,, #1 Complaint, by Plaintiffs Centrix Financial Liquidating Trust, Jeffrey A. Weinman. (Sears, Carissa)
November 26, 2018 Filing 27 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Polo Place LLC re #7 Summons Request,,,,,, #1 Complaint, by Plaintiffs Centrix Financial Liquidating Trust, Jeffrey A. Weinman. (Sears, Carissa)
November 26, 2018 Filing 26 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Orchard Lane LLC re #7 Summons Request,,,,,, #1 Complaint, by Plaintiffs Centrix Financial Liquidating Trust, Jeffrey A. Weinman. (Sears, Carissa)
November 26, 2018 Filing 25 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Nano IP LLC re #7 Summons Request,,,,,, #1 Complaint, by Plaintiffs Centrix Financial Liquidating Trust, Jeffrey A. Weinman. (Sears, Carissa)
November 26, 2018 Filing 24 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Nanosphere Health Sciences LLC re #7 Summons Request,,,,,, #1 Complaint, by Plaintiffs Centrix Financial Liquidating Trust, Jeffrey A. Weinman. (Sears, Carissa)
November 26, 2018 Filing 23 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Nanosphere Health Sciences Inc re #7 Summons Request,,,,,, #1 Complaint, by Plaintiffs Centrix Financial Liquidating Trust, Jeffrey A. Weinman. (Sears, Carissa)
November 26, 2018 Filing 22 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Nano Formulas LLC re #7 Summons Request,,,,,, #1 Complaint, by Plaintiffs Centrix Financial Liquidating Trust, Jeffrey A. Weinman. (Sears, Carissa)
November 26, 2018 Filing 21 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Michael Connelly re #7 Summons Request,,,,,, #1 Complaint, by Plaintiffs Centrix Financial Liquidating Trust, Jeffrey A. Weinman. (Sears, Carissa)
November 26, 2018 Filing 20 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Kate Sutton re #7 Summons Request,,,,,, #1 Complaint, by Plaintiffs Centrix Financial Liquidating Trust, Jeffrey A. Weinman. (Sears, Carissa)
November 26, 2018 Filing 19 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Julie L Sutton Revocable Trust re #7 Summons Request,,,,,, #1 Complaint, by Plaintiffs Centrix Financial Liquidating Trust, Jeffrey A. Weinman. (Sears, Carissa)
November 26, 2018 Filing 18 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Julie Sutton re #7 Summons Request,,,,,, #1 Complaint, by Plaintiffs Centrix Financial Liquidating Trust, Jeffrey A. Weinman. (Sears, Carissa)
November 26, 2018 Filing 17 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Heritage Advisors LLC re #7 Summons Request,,,,,, #1 Complaint, by Plaintiffs Centrix Financial Liquidating Trust, Jeffrey A. Weinman. (Sears, Carissa)
November 26, 2018 Filing 16 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Hampden Irrevocable Trust re #7 Summons Request,,,,,, #1 Complaint, by Plaintiffs Centrix Financial Liquidating Trust, Jeffrey A. Weinman. (Sears, Carissa)
November 26, 2018 Filing 15 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Freedom Fund Holdings LLC re #7 Summons Request,,,,,, #1 Complaint, by Plaintiffs Centrix Financial Liquidating Trust, Jeffrey A. Weinman. (Sears, Carissa)
November 26, 2018 Filing 14 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Foundation Fund LLC re #7 Summons Request,,,,,, #1 Complaint, by Plaintiffs Centrix Financial Liquidating Trust, Jeffrey A. Weinman. (Sears, Carissa)
November 26, 2018 Filing 13 SUMMONS REQUEST as to David Sutton re #7 Summons Request,,,,,, #1 Complaint, by Plaintiffs Centrix Financial Liquidating Trust, Jeffrey A. Weinman. (Sears, Carissa)
November 26, 2018 Filing 12 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Doug Symons re #7 Summons Request,,,,,, #1 Complaint, by Plaintiffs Centrix Financial Liquidating Trust, Jeffrey A. Weinman. (Sears, Carissa)
November 26, 2018 Filing 11 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Patrick Baker re #7 Summons Request,,,,,, #9 Summons Request, #1 Complaint, by Plaintiffs Centrix Financial Liquidating Trust, Jeffrey A. Weinman. (Sears, Carissa)
November 26, 2018 Filing 10 SUMMONS REQUEST as to A Fortiori LLC re #7 Summons Request,,,,,, #8 Summons Request, #1 Complaint, by Plaintiffs Centrix Financial Liquidating Trust, Jeffrey A. Weinman. (Sears, Carissa)
November 26, 2018 Filing 9 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Patrick Baker re #1 Complaint, by Plaintiffs Centrix Financial Liquidating Trust, Jeffrey A. Weinman. (Sears, Carissa)
November 26, 2018 Filing 8 SUMMONS REQUEST as to A Fortiori LLC re #1 Complaint, by Plaintiffs Centrix Financial Liquidating Trust, Jeffrey A. Weinman. (Sears, Carissa)
November 12, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS REQUEST as to A Fortiori LLC, David Sutton, Doug Symons, Foundation Fund, Freedom Fund, Hampden Irrevocable, Heritage Advisors, J Sutton Irrevocable Trust, Julie Sutton, Kate Sutton Wells, Michael Connelly, Nano Formulas, Nano IP, Nanosphere HS Corp, Nanosphere HS, Orchard Lane LLC, Patrick Baker, Polo Place, Preferred Holding Group, Prime Health, Robert Sutton, The Orchard, University Irrevocable Trust, Williston Holdings Group, Williston Holdings Ltd, Williston Trust Group, Williston Trust re #1 Complaint, by Plaintiffs Centrix Financial Liquidating Trust, Jeffrey A. Weinman. (Attachments: #1 Summons to David Sutton, #2 Summons to Doug Symons, #3 Summons to Foundation Fund, #4 Summons to Freedom Fund, #5 Summons to Hampden Irrevocable Trust, #6 Summons to Heritage Advisors, #7 Summons to J Sutton Revocable Trust, #8 Summons to Julie Sutton, #9 Summons to Kate Sutton Wells, #10 Summons to Michael Connelly, #11 Summons to Nano Formulas, #12 Summons to Nano IP, #13 Summons to Nanosphere HS Corp, #14 Summons to Nanosphere HS LLC, #15 Summons to Orchard Lane LLC, #16 Summons to Patrick Baker, #17 Summons to Polo Place, #18 Summons to Preferred Holding Group, #19 Summons to Prime Health, #20 Summons to Robert Sutton, #21 Summons to The Orchard LLC, #22 Summons to University Irrevocable Trust, #23 Summons to Williston Holding Grooup, #24 Summons to Williston Holdings Ltd, #25 Summons to Williston Trust Group, #26 Summons to Williston Trust)(Sears, Carissa)
October 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO SET SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: This matter comes before the Court sua sponte. The parties are ordered to set an initial scheduling conference in this Court (with Judge Jackson) pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.1 no later than 45 days after the answer, motion to dismiss or other response to the complaint is filed. The parties are directed to jointly contact Chambers by telephone at (303) 844-4694 or by email at Jackson_Chambers@cod.uscourts.gov to obtain a scheduling conference date. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 10/30/18. (rbjsec. )
October 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER re: 4 Minute Order. The Minute Order at ECF No. 4 was entered in error and the parties are directed to disregard. A scheduling conference hasn't yet been scheduled. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 10/30/18. Text Only Entry (rbjsec. )
October 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER: A Scheduling Conference set for 2/8/2019 at 8:30 AM in Courtroom A 902 before Judge R. Brooke Jackson. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 10/30/18. Text Only Entry (rbjsec.)
October 29, 2018 Filing 3 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). No Summons Issued. (cmadr, )
October 29, 2018 Filing 2 Case assigned to Judge R. Brooke Jackson and drawn to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. Text Only Entry. (cmadr, )
October 29, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6369852)Attorney Patrick D. Vellone added to party Centrix Financial Liquidating Trust(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick D. Vellone added to party Jeffrey A. Weinman(pty:pla), filed by Jeffrey A. Weinman, Centrix Financial Liquidating Trust. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Vellone, Patrick)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Centrix Financial Liquidating Trust et al v. Sutton et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kate Sutton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nano Formulas, LLC
Represented By: Shaun Allen Christensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julie (I) L. Sutton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nano IP, LLC
Represented By: Shaun Allen Christensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julie L Sutton Revocable Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Sutton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Williston Holding Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heritage Advisors, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Williston Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doug Symons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A Fortiori, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nanosphere Health Sciences, Inc
Represented By: Shaun Allen Christensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Freedom Fund Holdings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: University Irrevocable Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Connolly
Represented By: James E. Nesland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Orchard Lane, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nanosphere Health Science, LLC
Represented By: Shaun Allen Christensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foundation Fund, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Orchard, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prime Health, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Preferred Holding Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Williston Trust Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Williston Holdings, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Sutton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Polo Place, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hampden Irrevocable Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julie Sutton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Orchard, LLC, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey A. Weinman
Represented By: Patrick D. Vellone
Represented By: Carissa V. Sears
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Centrix Financial Liquidating Trust
Represented By: Patrick D. Vellone
Represented By: Carissa V. Sears
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?