Intermountain Electric Service, Inc. v. La Plata Electric Association, Inc.
Plaintiff: Intermountain Electric Service, Inc.
Defendant: La Plata Electric Association, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv02772
Filed: October 30, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: S Kato Crews
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 6, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Leave to Appear. Counsel for Defendant La Plata Electric Association, Inc. may appear at the scheduling conference by phone by calling 303.335.2124 at the scheduled time. By Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 12/6/2018. Text Only Entry (skclc1)
December 5, 2018 Filing 11 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Appear by Telephone at Scheduling Conference by Defendant La Plata Electric Association, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only) Order to Appear by Telephone)(Denning, Shay)
November 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Hearing/Conference. The Scheduling Conference is RESET for 1/22/2019 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom C204 before Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. The parties shall submit their consent form and the proposed scheduling order on or before 1/15/2019. By Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 11/27/2018. Text Only Entry (skclc1)
November 27, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION for Hearing/Conference re #8 Order, to be Rescheduled by Plaintiff Intermountain Electric Service, Inc.. (Bartlett, Dennis)
November 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND SETTING DEADLINE FOR FILING CONSENT/NONCONSENT FORM Scheduling Conference set for 1/16/2019 10:00 AM in Courtroom C204 before Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. Consent Form due by 1/9/2019. By Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 11/2/18. (amont, )
November 1, 2018 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Intermountain Electric Service, Inc.. La Plata Electric Association, Inc. waiver sent on 10/31/2018, answer due 12/31/2018. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued Summons)(Bartlett, Dennis)
October 31, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS issued by Clerk to La Plata Electric Association, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (nmarb, )
October 30, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS REQUEST as to La Plata Electric Association, Inc. re #1 Complaint, by Plaintiff Intermountain Electric Service, Inc.. (Bartlett, Dennis)
October 30, 2018 Filing 4 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. No Summons Issued. (rvill, )
October 30, 2018 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. Text Only Entry. (rvill, )
October 30, 2018 Filing 2 ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES re: #1 Complaint, filed by attorney Dennis J. Bartlett. The document was scanned and not converted directly to portable document format (PDF) and has used an incorrect signature format in violation of D.C.COLO.LCivR 5.1(a) and 4.3(a) of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases). DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. Action to take - future documents must be filed pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 5.1(a) and 1.3(f) of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures and the filer must affix an electronic s/signature and s/followed by a typed, not an inked, signature to all future documents.(Text Only Entry) (rvill, )
October 30, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment, Other Relief and Jury Demand against La Plata Electric Association, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6370253)Attorney Dennis J. Bartlett added to party Intermountain Electric Service, Inc.(pty:pla), filed by Intermountain Electric Service, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Complaint, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 to Complaint, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Exhibit IME Corporate Disclosure)(Bartlett, Dennis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Intermountain Electric Service, Inc. v. La Plata Electric Association, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Intermountain Electric Service, Inc.
Represented By: Dennis J. Bartlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: La Plata Electric Association, Inc.
Represented By: Shay Lynn Denning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?