Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. v. Stateline Bar & Grill LLC et al
Plaintiff: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.
Defendant: Shelley Poole, Timothy Meyer, Stateline Bar & Grill LLC and Stateline Bar & Grill LLC doing business as Stateline Bar & Grill
Case Number: 1:2018cv02789
Filed: October 31, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Robert E Blackburn
Referring Judge: Nina Y Wang
Nature of Suit: Cable/Satellite TV
Cause of Action: 47:0605
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER REFERRING MOTION(S): #21 First MOTION for Default Judgment as to All Defendants filed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 03/06/2019. Text Only Entry (reblc2)
March 6, 2019 Filing 21 First MOTION for Default Judgment as to All Defendants by Plaintiff Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Affidavit of Joe Hand, #3 UFC Distributorship Agreement, #4 UFC Commercial Licensing Agreement, #5 Mayweather-McGregor Agreement, #6 2015 UFC Rate Card, #7 2016 UFC Rate Card, #8 2017 UFC Rate Card, #9 2018 UFC Rate Card, #10 Mayweather-McGregor Rate Card, #11 Affidavit of Jacob Smith, #12 Declaration of Ryan R. Janis, #13 Exhibit A, #14 Exhibit B, #15 Exhibit C, #16 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Janis, Ryan)
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #18 Motion to Continue. The Scheduling Conference set for 2/12/2019 is VACATED, to be reset at a later date if necessary. By Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 2/8/2019. Text Only Entry (nywlc2, )
February 8, 2019 Filing 19 MEMORANDUM by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 2/8/19 regarding #18 Second MOTION to Continue Scheduling Conference filed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Text Only Entry (rebsec)
February 7, 2019 Filing 18 Second MOTION to Continue Scheduling Conference by Plaintiff Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Janis, Ryan)
January 28, 2019 Filing 17 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Timothy Meyer, Shelley Poole, Stateline Bar & Grill LLC re #15 First MOTION for Entry of Default, by Clerk. Text Only Entry (athom, )
January 28, 2019 Filing 16 ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES: re: #15 First MOTION for Entry of Default as to Stateline Bar & Grill LLC, Shelley Poole, and Timothy Meyer filed by attorney Ryan Richard Janis. The format for the attorneys signature block is not correct. DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. Action to take - future documents must be filed pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 5.1(a) and 4.3(d) of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil Cases). (Text Only Entry) (athom, )
January 24, 2019 Filing 15 First MOTION for Entry of Default as to Stateline Bar & Grill LLC, Shelley Poole, and Timothy Meyer by Plaintiff Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. (Janis, Ryan)
January 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #12 Motion to Continue. The Scheduling Conference set for 1/10/2019 is VACATED and RESET for 2/12/2019 09:30 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. The parties shall submit their proposed scheduling order, including a copy of the proposed order in Word format sent via email to Wang_Chambers@cod.uscourts.gov, seven days prior to the Scheduling Conference. By Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 1/4/2019. Text Only Entry (nywlc2, )
January 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER REFERRING MOTION(S): #12 First MOTION to Continue to Continue Scheduling Conference filed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 1/4/2019. Text Only Entry (reblc2)
January 4, 2019 Filing 12 First MOTION to Continue to Continue Scheduling Conference by Plaintiff Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Janis, Ryan)
January 4, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. Timothy Meyer served on 12/20/2018, answer due 1/10/2019; Shelley Poole served on 12/20/2018, answer due 1/10/2019; Stateline Bar & Grill LLC served on 12/20/2018, answer due 1/10/2019. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Affidavit)(Janis, Ryan)
November 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER SETTING RULE 16(b) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 11/13/2018. A Scheduling Conference is set for 1/10/2019 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. The parties shall submit their proposed scheduling order, including a copy of the proposed order in Word format sent via email to Wang_Chambers@cod.uscourts.gov, seven days prior to the Scheduling Conference. (bwilk, )
November 2, 2018 Filing 9 SUMMONSES issued by Clerk. (athom, )
November 2, 2018 Filing 8 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Timothy Meyer, Shelley Poole, and Stateline Bar & Grill LLC re 7 Administrative Notice, by Plaintiff Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Affidavit)(Janis, Ryan)
November 2, 2018 Filing 7 Administrative Notice: The #6 Summonses submitted are incomplete and will not be issued - they are missing the Defendant's names and addresses. Please refer to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and complete the forms for issuance using the event Summons Request. (Text Only Entry) (athom, )
November 2, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Timothy Meyer, Stateline Bar& Grill LLC, and Shelley Poole re #5 Magistrate Judge by Plaintiff Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Affidavit)(Janis, Ryan)
October 31, 2018 Filing 5 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). No Summons Issued, the Summons supplied are missing the Defendant's names and addresses. (rroge, )
October 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. IT IS ORDERED that pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this matter is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge:(1) To convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b), enter a Scheduling Order that satisfies the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, and enter such orders as appropriate to enforce the Scheduling order and resolve discovery matters; provided, further that the scheduling conference, the Magistrate Judge shall advise the parties of Judge Blackburns practice standards found at www.cod.uscourts.gov.;(2) To hear and finally determine non-dispositive matters that have been referred, subject to the exceptions found in 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A); and(3) To hear and make recommendations on dispositive matters that have been referred as defined in 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLOLCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, this court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 10/31/18. Text Only Entry (rebsec)
October 31, 2018 Filing 3 Case assigned to Judge Robert E. Blackburn and drawn to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Text Only Entry. (rroge, )
October 31, 2018 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Janis, Ryan)
October 31, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Timothy Meyer, Shelley Poole, Stateline Bar & Grill LLC (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6373918)Attorney Ryan Richard Janis added to party Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.(pty:pla), filed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Janis, Ryan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. v. Stateline Bar & Grill LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shelley Poole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stateline Bar & Grill LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stateline Bar & Grill LLC doing business as Stateline Bar & Grill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.
Represented By: Ryan Richard Janis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?