Solis v. Stancil et al
Petitioner: Arturo Solis
Respondent: Carl M. Miedich, S. Maes, Munoz, Bolings, Medina, Kyle, M.A. Stancil, S. Anaya, Vails, C. Goodwin, Vigil, J. Butkovich, G. Romain, Weise, Rodriguez and Hawkins
Case Number: 1:2018cv02842
Filed: November 5, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Gordon P Gallagher
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 2, 2019 Filing 18 AFFIDAVIT by Petitioner Arturo Solis. (evana, )
January 2, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION for Extension of Time by Petitioner Arturo Solis. (evana, )
December 19, 2018 Filing 16 MOTION for Ninety (90) Day Extension of Time in which to timely file an Amended 2241 Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus, by Petitioner Arturo Solis. (evana, )
December 13, 2018 Filing 15 LETTER re: documents submitted for filing 12/13/2018 by Petitioner Arturo Solis. (agarc, )
December 13, 2018 Filing 14 Applicant's Second AFFIDAVIT as to the Date of Mailing the Second Rewritten Motion for T.R.O. by Petitioner Arturo Solis. (agarc, )
December 13, 2018 Filing 13 Applicant's MOTION for an Immediate Temporary Restraining Order (T.R.O.) Followed by a Preliminary and Permanent Injunction by Petitioner Arturo Solis. (agarc, )
December 7, 2018 Filing 12 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Article III Judge for Class Certification Purposes by Petitioner Arturo Solis. (evana, )
December 7, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION for Severance, by Article III judge of 2241 Claims Deemed Deficient, for Interlocutory Appeal thereof and to Proceed on Individual Claims that are Applicable to the Execution of this sentence, by Petitioner Arturo Solis. (evana, )
November 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER that the "Objections to the Magistrate's Order to File Amended 2241 Application and Motion Hereby Requesting Reconsideration by a Constitutionally Vested Article III United States District Judge, of Said Magistrate's Order" (ECF No. #7 ) are OVERRULED and the Motion for Class Certification (ECF No. #8 ) is DENIED. That, within thirty (30) days from the date of this Order, Applicant must file an Amended Application that complies with the Order Directing Applicant to File Amended Application (ECF No. #6 ). That if Applicant fails to file an Amended Application as directed within the time allowed, the action may be dismissed without further notice, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 11/28/2018. (evana, )
November 19, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of filings re #8 MOTION to Certify Class, #7 OBJECTION/Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision to District Court re #6 Order, by Petitioner Arturo Solis. (evana, )
November 19, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION for Class Certification, by Petitioner Arturo Solis. (evana, )
November 19, 2018 Filing 7 OBJECTION/Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision to District Court re #6 Order on Motion by Petitioner Arturo Solis. (evana, )
November 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER DIRECTING APPLICANT TO FILE AMENDED APPLICATION within thirty (30) days from the date of this Order, Applicant must file an Amended Application that complies with this Order.That the Clerk of Court is directed to mail to Applicant, with a copy of this Order, a copy of the current Court-approved form Application for a Writ of Habeas Corpus Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2241 and applicable instructions. That if Applicant fails to file an Amended Application as directed within the time allowed, the action may be dismissed without further notice. that the "Applicant's Motion for Waiver of Filing Fee in the Interest of Justice" (ECF No. #4 ) is DENIED as moot because Applicant paid the $5.00 filing fee (ECF No. #5 ), by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 11/8/2018. (evana, )
November 6, 2018 Filing 5 PAYMENT RECEIVED from Arturo Solis in the amount of $ 5.00; Receipt Number COX087499; Monthly Payment. (evana, )
November 5, 2018 Filing 4 Applicant's MOTION for Waiver of Filing Fee in the Interest of Justice by Petitioner Arturo Solis. (rsams, )
November 5, 2018 Filing 3 Applicant Sworn AFFIDAVIT as to the Date of Mailing Previous Pleadings re #1 Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Petitioner Arturo Solis. (rsams, )
November 5, 2018 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. Text Only Entry. (rsams, )
November 5, 2018 Filing 1 APPLICATION for Writ of Habeas Corpus Pursuant to 28 USC 2241, filed by Arturo Solis. (Attachments: #1 Attachment, #2 Envelope)(rsams, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Solis v. Stancil et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Carl M. Miedich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: S. Maes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Munoz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Bolings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Medina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Kyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: M.A. Stancil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: S. Anaya
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Vails
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: C. Goodwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Vigil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: J. Butkovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: G. Romain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Weise
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Hawkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Arturo Solis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?