Hamon et al v. DVR, LLC et al

Appellee: DVR, LLC, New Lake, LLC, Janice A. Steinle and Joli A. Lofstedt
In Re: UTE Lake Ranch, Inc.
Interested Party: U.S. Trustee and United States Bankruptcy Court for the District of Colorado
Appellant: Bruce Hamon
Case Number: 1:2018cv02915
Filed: November 13, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Wiley Y Daniel
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 8, 2019 Filing 14 SUPPLEMENTAL BANKRUPTCY RECORD ON APPEAL. Number of Volumes: 2. Sealed/Restricted Volume Numbers:VII and IX. Appellant Brief due by 2/7/2019. Appellee Brief due by 3/11/2019. Appellant Reply Brief due by 3/25/2019. (Attachments: BKAPP Case Number 16-17064 EEB #1 Volume VIII Transcript of Evidentiary Hearing August 13, 2018 (restricted through March 21, 2019), BKAPP Case Number 17-17054 EEB #2 Volume Transcript of Evidentiary Hearing August 13, 2018 (Restricted through March 21, 2019))(evana, )
December 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER THE COURT, having reviewed Appellant Bruce Hamons Unopposed Motion to Terminate Briefing Schedule and Request for Extension of Time to Submit Opening Brief (ECF No. #12 ), and being fully advised in the premises, does hereby GRANT the Motion and ORDERS that the briefing schedule provided in F.R.B.P. 8018 shall commence when the clerk of the Bankruptcy Court notifies this Court that the transcript sought by the Appellant has been filed, By Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 12/13/2018. (evana, )
December 12, 2018 Filing 12 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Submit Opening Brief and Terminate Briefing Schedule by Appellant Bruce Hamon. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Ray, Brian)
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER ORDER ESTABLISHING BANKRUPTCY APPEAL BRIEFING REQUIREMENTS. This bankruptcy appeal was filed on November 13, 2018. The Bankruptcy Record on Appeal was filed on December 7, 2018. On December 11, 2018, upon an unopposed motion, this appeal was consolidated with 18-cv-02922-WYD. Accordingly, the parties shall timely file their briefs in the above-captioned consolidated action under the schedule provided in Bankruptcy Rule 8018, By Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 12/11/2018. (evana, )
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER that the Unopposed Motion to Consolidate Related Appeals (ECF No. #6 ) is GRANTED. The case 18-cv-02922-REB is consolidated with 18-cv-02915- WYD. It is FURTHER ORDERED that 18-cv-02915-WYD shall be the lead case, and as of the date of this Order, all pleadings and other filings shall be filed in 18-cv-02915-WYD, using the caption appearing on this Order. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall docket this Order in 18-cv-02922-REB, By Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 12/11/2018. (evana, )
December 7, 2018 Filing 9 BANKRUPTCY RECORD ON APPEAL Continuation of Main #8 Record, Volumes: Volume VII. (evana, )
December 7, 2018 Filing 8 BANKRUPTCY RECORD ON APPEAL Volume I. Number of Volumes: 2. Appellant Brief due by 1/6/2019. Appellee Brief due by 2/5/2019. Appellant Reply Brief due by 2/19/2019. (Attachments: #1 Volume II)(evana, ) #2 Volume III, #3 Volume IV) (evana, ) #4 Volume V, #5 Volume VI) (evana, ). Modified on 12/11/2018 (evana, ).
December 7, 2018 Filing 7 DESIGNATION of Record and Statement of Issues by Appellant Bruce Hamon re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal,. (evana, )
December 6, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Appellant Bruce Hamon. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Ray, Brian)
November 13, 2018 Filing 5 LETTER re: #1 Bankruptcy Appeal (dbera, )
November 13, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE Pursuant to L.B.R. 9013 re #3 Bruce Hamon's MOTION to Stay Judgment re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal Pursuant to R.R.B.P. 8005 by Appellant Bruce Hamon (dbera, )
November 13, 2018 Filing 3 Bruce Hamon's MOTION to Stay Judgment re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal Pursuant to F.R.B.P. 8005 by Appellant Bruce Hamon. (dbera, )
November 13, 2018 Filing 2 Case assigned to Judge Wiley Y. Daniel. Text Only Entry (dbera, )
November 13, 2018 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT by Appellant Bruce Hamon in re: Judgment of 10/26/2018, Order Approving Settlement of 10/26/2018, Order Allowing Settlement Hearing to Proceed of 3/26/2018. (dbera, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/14/2018: #1 Docket Sheet) (dbera, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hamon et al v. DVR, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: DVR, LLC
Represented By: Matthew T. Faga
Represented By: James T. Markus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: New Lake, LLC
Represented By: Harvey Sender
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Janice A. Steinle
Represented By: Philip A. Pearlman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Joli A. Lofstedt
Represented By: Gabrielle Palmer
Represented By: J. Brian Fletcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: UTE Lake Ranch, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: U.S. Trustee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: United States Bankruptcy Court for the District of Colorado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Bruce Hamon
Represented By: Brian Thomas Ray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?