In Re: DVR, LLC et al
Appellee: DVR, LLC, New Lake, LLC and Joli A. Lofstedt
Interested Party: U.S. Trustee and United States Bankruptcy Court for the District of Colorado
Appellant: Bruce Hamon
Case Number: 1:2018cv02922
Filed: November 14, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Robert E Blackburn
Referring Judge: Wiley Y Daniel
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER that the Unopposed Motion to Consolidate Related Appeals (ECF No. 6 ) is GRANTED. The case 18-cv-02922-REB is consolidated with 18-cv-02915- WYD. It is FURTHER ORDERED that 18-cv-02915-WYD shall be the lead case, and as of the date of this Order, all pleadings and other filings shall be filed in 18-cv-02915-WYD, using the caption appearing on this Order. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall docket this Order in 18-cv-02922-REB, By Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 12/11/2018, By Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 12/11/2018. (evana, )
December 7, 2018 Filing 10 BANKRUPTCY RECORD ON APPEAL. Number of Volumes: 7. Appellant Brief due by 1/6/2019. Appellee Brief due by 2/5/2019. Appellant Reply Brief due by 2/19/2019. (Attachments: #1 Volume I, #2 Volume II, #3 Volume III, #4 Volume IV, #5 Volume V, #6 Volume VI, #7 Volume VII) (athom, )
December 7, 2018 Filing 9 DESIGNATION of Record and Statement of Issues by Appellant Bruce Hamon re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal,. (athom, )
December 6, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Filing Unopposed Motion to Consolidate Related Appeals by Appellant Bruce Hamon (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Ray, Brian)
November 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Establishing Bankruptcy Appeal Briefing Requirements re: #1 Bankruptcy Appeal, filed by Bruce Hamon. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 11/16/2018. (athom, )
November 14, 2018 Filing 6 CASE OPENING. The above captioned case was opened on 11/14/2018 and assigned the case number referenced above. After docketing of the record on appeal from the U.S. Bankruptcy Court, briefing will proceed in accordance with Bankruptcy Rules 8014, 8015, and 8018, and any orders of the court. When referencing trial exhibits you must attach copies to your brief. If the court finds it necessary to have the originals presented it will issue an order. All filings with the United States District Court, unless otherwise permitted by our Electronic Case Filing Procedures, must be done electronically. Text Only Entry. (dbera, )
November 14, 2018 Filing 5 LETTER re: #1 Bankruptcy Appeal, (dbera, )
November 14, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE Pursuant to L.B.R. 9013 re #3 MOTION to Stay Judgment Pending re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal Pursuant to F.R.B.P. 8005, by Appellant Bruce Hamon (dbera, )
November 14, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION to Stay Judgment re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal Pursuant to F.R.B.P. 8005, by Appellant Bruce Hamon. (dbera, )
November 14, 2018 Filing 2 Case assigned to Judge Robert E. Blackburn. Text Only Entry (dbera, )
November 14, 2018 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL and Statement of Election FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT by Appellant Bruce Hamon in re: Judgment, Order Approving Settlement of 10/26/2018, Order Allowing Settlement Hearing to Proceed of 03/26/2018. (Attachments: #1 Docket Sheet)(dbera, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In Re: DVR, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: DVR, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: New Lake, LLC
Represented By: Harvey Sender
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Joli A. Lofstedt
Represented By: J. Brian Fletcher
Represented By: Gabrielle Palmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: U.S. Trustee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: United States Bankruptcy Court for the District of Colorado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Bruce Hamon
Represented By: Brian Thomas Ray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?