Board of County Comissioners of the County of Jefferson, State of Colorado v. Sawyer et al
Plaintiff: Board of County Comissioners of the County of Jefferson, State of Colorado
Defendant: Jonathan Sawyer and Kimberly Sawyers
Case Number: 1:2018cv02999
Filed: November 21, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Philip A Brimmer
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 14, 2019 Filing 21 REPLY to Response to #15 MOTION to Remand filed by Plaintiff Board of County Comissioners of the County of Jefferson, State of Colorado, Counter Defendant Board of County Comissioners of the County of Jefferson, State of Colorado. (Soronson, Jason)
January 2, 2019 Filing 20 RESPONSE to #15 MOTION to Remand filed by Defendants Jonathan Sawyer, Kimberly Sawyers, Counter Claimants Jonathan Sawyer, Kimberly Sawyers. (LeRoux, Paul)
January 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MINUTE ORDER denying defendants' Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Motion to Remand #18 . The motion makes no showing of good cause for the requested extension of time (see I.G.1. of this Court's Practice Standards), is untimely (see I.G.2, which provides that "[a]ny motion for extension of time shall be filed no later than three business days before the date the motion, response, reply, or other paper is due"), and, although defendants state that the motion is "unopposed," the motion does not state sufficient grounds for compliance with D.C.COLO.LCivR 7.1(a), requiring the moving party to confer or make reasonable good-faith efforts to confer with opposing counsel and to "describe... the specific efforts to fulfill this duty." Therefore, the Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Motion to Remand #18 is denied.By Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 1/2/19. Text Only Entry (pabsec)
December 31, 2018 Filing 18 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #15 MOTION to Remand by Defendants Jonathan Sawyer, Kimberly Sawyers, Counter Claimants Jonathan Sawyer, Kimberly Sawyers. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only) Order)(LeRoux, Paul)
December 12, 2018 Filing 17 MEMORANDUM regarding #16 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond filed by Kimberly Sawyers, Jonathan Sawyer. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 12/12/18. Text Only Entry (pabsec)
December 12, 2018 Filing 16 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond by Defendants Jonathan Sawyer, Kimberly Sawyers, Counter Claimants Jonathan Sawyer, Kimberly Sawyers. (LeRoux, Paul)
December 12, 2018 Filing 15 MOTION to Remand by Plaintiff Board of County Comissioners of the County of Jefferson, State of Colorado, Counter Defendant Board of County Comissioners of the County of Jefferson, State of Colorado. (Butler, Eric)
November 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #10 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond. Defendants' deadline to answer or otherwise respond to the Amended Complaint is extended to 12/12/2018. SO ORDERED, by Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 11/27/2018. Text Only Entry (skclc2, )
November 26, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Jason William Soronson on behalf of Board of County Comissioners of the County of Jefferson, State of ColoradoAttorney Jason William Soronson added to party Board of County Comissioners of the County of Jefferson, State of Colorado(pty:pla), Attorney Jason William Soronson added to party Board of County Comissioners of the County of Jefferson, State of Colorado(pty:cd) (Soronson, Jason)
November 26, 2018 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM regarding #10 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond filed by Kimberly Sawyers, Jonathan Sawyer. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 11/26/2018. Text Only Entry. (sphil, )
November 26, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Eric Thomas Butler on behalf of Board of County Comissioners of the County of Jefferson, State of ColoradoAttorney Eric Thomas Butler added to party Board of County Comissioners of the County of Jefferson, State of Colorado(pty:pla), Attorney Eric Thomas Butler added to party Board of County Comissioners of the County of Jefferson, State of Colorado(pty:cd) (Butler, Eric)
November 21, 2018 Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond by Defendants Jonathan Sawyer, Kimberly Sawyers. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(LeRoux, Paul)
November 21, 2018 Filing 9 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (rvill, )
November 21, 2018 Filing 8 Case assigned to Judge Philip A. Brimmer and drawn to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. Text Only Entry. (rvill, )
November 21, 2018 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against Jonathan Sawyer and Kimberly Sawyers, filed by Board of County Comissioners of the County of Jefferson, State of Colorado.(rvill, )
November 21, 2018 Filing 6 ANSWER to #5 Complaint and COUNTERCLAIM against Board of County Comissioners of the County of Jefferson, State of Colorado by Kimberly Sawyers and Jonathan Sawyer.(rvill, )
November 21, 2018 Filing 5 COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF against Jonathan Sawyer, Kimberly Sawyers, filed by Board of County Comissioners of the County of Jefferson, State of Colorado.(rvill, )
November 21, 2018 Filing 4 FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawls of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (rvill, )
November 21, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE Civil Cover Sheet by Defendants Jonathan Sawyer, Kimberly Sawyers (LeRoux, Paul)
November 21, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Paul LeRoux, II on behalf of Jonathan Sawyer, Kimberly Sawyers (LeRoux, Paul)
November 21, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Kimberly Sawyers, Jonathan Sawyer from Jefferson County District Court, Case Number 2018cv030493. (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 1082-6406829), filed by Kimberly Sawyers, Jonathan Sawyer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit, #16 Exhibit, #17 Exhibit, #18 Exhibit, #19 Exhibit, #20 Exhibit, #21 Exhibit, #22 Exhibit, #23 Exhibit, #24 Exhibit, #25 Exhibit, #26 Exhibit, #27 Exhibit, #28 Exhibit, #29 Exhibit, #30 Exhibit, #31 Exhibit, #32 Exhibit, #33 Exhibit, #34 Exhibit, #35 Exhibit, #36 Exhibit, #37 Exhibit, #38 Exhibit, #39 Exhibit, #40 Exhibit, #41 Exhibit, #42 Exhibit, #43 Exhibit, #44 Exhibit, #45 Exhibit, #46 Exhibit, #47 Exhibit, #48 Exhibit, #49 Exhibit, #50 Exhibit, #51 Exhibit, #52 Exhibit, #53 Exhibit, #54 Exhibit, #55 Exhibit, #56 Exhibit, #57 Exhibit, #58 Exhibit, #59 Exhibit, #60 Exhibit, #61 Exhibit, #62 Exhibit, #63 Exhibit, #64 Exhibit, #65 Exhibit, #66 Exhibit, #67 Exhibit, #68 Exhibit, #69 Exhibit, #70 Exhibit, #71 Exhibit, #72 Exhibit, #73 Exhibit, #74 Exhibit, #75 Exhibit, #76 Exhibit, #77 Exhibit, #78 Exhibit, #79 Exhibit, #80 Exhibit, #81 Exhibit, #82 Exhibit, #83 Exhibit, #84 Exhibit, #85 Exhibit, #86 Exhibit, #87 Exhibit, #88 Exhibit, #89 Exhibit, #90 Exhibit, #91 Exhibit, #92 Exhibit, #93 Exhibit, #94 Exhibit, #95 Exhibit, #96 Exhibit, #97 Exhibit, #98 Exhibit, #99 Exhibit, #100 Exhibit, #101 Exhibit, #102 Exhibit, #103 Exhibit, #104 Exhibit, #105 Exhibit, #106 Exhibit, #107 Exhibit, #108 Exhibit, #109 Exhibit, #110 Exhibit, #111 Exhibit, #112 Exhibit, #113 Exhibit, #114 Exhibit, #115 Exhibit, #116 Exhibit, #117 Exhibit, #118 Exhibit, #119 Exhibit, #120 Exhibit, #121 Exhibit, #122 Exhibit, #123 Exhibit, #124 Exhibit)(LeRoux, Paul)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Board of County Comissioners of the County of Jefferson, State of Colorado v. Sawyer et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan Sawyer
Represented By: Scott David Albertson
Represented By: Paul LeRoux, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kimberly Sawyers
Represented By: Scott David Albertson
Represented By: Paul LeRoux, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Board of County Comissioners of the County of Jefferson, State of Colorado
Represented By: Jason William Soronson
Represented By: Eric Thomas Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?