Larrieu v. Commissioner, Social Security Administration

Plaintiff: Melanie Larrieu
Defendant: NANCY A. BERRYHILL and Commissioner, Social Security Administration
Interested Party: USAO-SS-Noticing and SSA Noticing
Case Number: 1:2018cv03005
Filed: November 21, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Wiley Y Daniel
Nature of Suit: Social Security - RSI (405(g))
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 9, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by David I. Blower on behalf of Commissioner, Social Security AdministrationAttorney David I. Blower added to party Commissioner, Social Security Administration(pty:dft) (Blower, David)
December 12, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by J. Benedict Garcia on behalf of Commissioner, Social Security AdministrationAttorney J. Benedict Garcia added to party Commissioner, Social Security Administration(pty:dft) (Garcia, J.)
November 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REGARDING INSTRUCTIONS FOR JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN for Social Security Cases, by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 11/26/2018. (Attachments: #1 Case Management Form) (evana, )
November 21, 2018 Filing 5 Utility Setting Deadlines: Commissioner, Social Security Administration answer due 1/20/2019. Text Only Entry (evana, )
November 21, 2018 Filing 4 Administrative Notice: Social Security Case Service. Pursuant to the Letter of Agreement signed by the Clerk, U.S. District Court;U.S. Attorneys Office for the District of Colorado (USAO), and Social Security Administration (SSA), service of the initiating document(s) by the plaintiff to the SSA, the U.S. Attorney General, and USAO in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(i) is not necessary unless the court otherwise orders. A summons is not required and will not be issued. (Text Only Entry) (rroge, )
November 21, 2018 Filing 3 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (rroge, )
November 21, 2018 Filing 2 Case assigned to Judge Wiley Y. Daniel. Text Only Entry. (rroge, )
November 21, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT MELANIE LARRIEU against NANCY A. BERRYHILL (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6407559)Attorney Julie Lynn Kreutzer added to party Melanie Larrieu(pty:pla), filed by Melanie Larrieu. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover sheet)(Kreutzer, Julie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Larrieu v. Commissioner, Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melanie Larrieu
Represented By: Julie Lynn Kreutzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NANCY A. BERRYHILL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner, Social Security Administration
Represented By: J. Benedict Garcia
Represented By: David I. Blower
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: USAO-SS-Noticing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA Noticing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?