Kobler v. Wells Fargo Bank N.A. et al
Plaintiff: Brenda Kobler
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank N.A. and Wells Fargo Home Mortgage
Case Number: 1:2018cv03074
Filed: November 30, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Lewis T Babcock
Referring Judge: Kathleen M Tafoya
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 18, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 18, 2018 Filing 19 Civil Case Terminated pursuant to #18 ORDER. Text Only Entry (jgonz, )
December 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #17 Motion to Dismiss. This case is dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(2). By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 12/18/18. Text Only Entry (kmtlc1)
December 17, 2018 Filing 17 MOTION to Dismiss by Plaintiff Brenda Kobler. (Hill, Steven)
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 1/28/2019 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 101 (Colorado Springs) before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Consent Form due by 1/21/2019. by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 12/06/2018. (ksena)
December 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MINUTE ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. Wells Fargo Bank N.A. shall file its responsive pleading no later than 12/21/2018. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 12/5/2018. Text Only Entry (kmtlc2)
December 4, 2018 Filing 14 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #10 Memorandum Returning Case. This case is randomly reassigned to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. All future pleadings should be designated as 18-cv-03074 KMT. (Text Only Entry) (evana, )
December 4, 2018 Filing 13 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #4 Complaint by Defendants Wells Fargo Bank N.A., Wells Fargo Home Mortgage. (Elliott, Rebekah)
December 4, 2018 Filing 12 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (evana, )
December 4, 2018 Filing 11 DOCKET ENTRY ERROR CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #10 Memorandum Returning Case. This case is randomly reassigned to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. All future pleadings should be designated as 18-cv-03074 KLM. (Text Only Entry) (evana, ) (Modified on 12/5/2018 DOCKET ENTRY ERROR, please see entry 14 for corrected Entry to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya) (evana, ).
December 4, 2018 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE for reassignment by Senior Judge Lewis T. Babcock (evana, )
November 30, 2018 Filing 9 FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawls of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (dbera, )
November 30, 2018 Filing 8 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (dbera, )
November 30, 2018 Filing 7 STATE COURT ORDER GRANTING Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. By David Scott Prince, District Court Judge, El Paso County on 11/26/2018(dbera, )
November 30, 2018 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT/RETURN of Service of Civil Case Cover Sheet, Complaint, Civil Summons upon Derek Nelson for Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. on 11/01/2018 (dbera, )
November 30, 2018 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT/RETURN of Service of Civil Case Cover Sheet, Complaint, Civil Summons upon Derek Nelson for Wells Fargo Home Mortgage on 11/01/2018 (dbera, )
November 30, 2018 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against Wells Fargo Bank N.A., Wells Fargo Home Mortgage, filed by Brenda Kobler.(dbera, )
November 30, 2018 Filing 3 Case assigned to Judge Lewis T. Babcock and drawn to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Text Only Entry (dbera, )
November 30, 2018 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Wells Fargo & Company for Wells Fargo Bank N.A.. (Elliott, Rebekah)
November 30, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Wells Fargo Home Mortgage, Wells Fargo Bank N.A. from El Paso County District Court, Case Number 2018CV32465. (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 1082-6418277), filed by Wells Fargo Home Mortgage, Wells Fargo Bank N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Docket, #2 Exhibit 2 - Complaint, #3 Exhibit 3 - State Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Exhibit 4 - Summons, #5 Exhibit 5 - Notice of Change of Law Firm, #6 Exhibit 6 - Return of Service, #7 Exhibit 7 - Return of Service, #8 Exhibit 8 - Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, #9 Exhibit 9 - Order Granting Motion for Extension of Time, #10 Civil Cover Sheet)(Elliott, Rebekah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kobler v. Wells Fargo Bank N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank N.A.
Represented By: Rebekah Lee Wallace Elliott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Home Mortgage
Represented By: Rebekah Lee Wallace Elliott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda Kobler
Represented By: Steven Louis Hill, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?