Live Face on Web, LLC v. Kirschbaum et al
Plaintiff: Live Face On Web, LLC
Defendant: Kim Kirschbaum, Quantum Group LLC, Quantum Branson LLC, Michael Kirschbaum and Allison Kirshbaum
Case Number: 1:2018cv03087
Filed: November 30, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Michael E Hegarty
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MINUTE ORDER granting #22 Defendant Quantum Group, LLC's Second Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 01/28/2019. Quantum Group LLC answer due 3/18/2019. (mdave, )
January 25, 2019 Filing 22 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond Unopposed by Defendant Quantum Group LLC. (Thompson, Lauren)
January 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MINUTE ORDER granting #20 Defendant Quantum Group, LLC's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 01/14/2019. Quantum Group LLC answer due 1/28/2019. (mdave, )
January 11, 2019 Filing 20 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #1 Complaint, by Defendant Quantum Group LLC. (Lambalot, Douglas)
January 11, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Douglas W. Lambalot on behalf of Quantum Group LLCAttorney Douglas W. Lambalot added to party Quantum Group LLC(pty:dft) (Lambalot, Douglas)
January 11, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Lauren Elizabeth Mosse Thompson on behalf of Quantum Group LLCAttorney Lauren Elizabeth Mosse Thompson added to party Quantum Group LLC(pty:dft) (Thompson, Lauren)
January 11, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Theodore Wells Rosen on behalf of Quantum Group LLCAttorney Theodore Wells Rosen added to party Quantum Group LLC(pty:dft) (Rosen, Theodore)
December 26, 2018 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Live Face On Web, LLC. Quantum Group LLC served on 12/17/2018, answer due 1/7/2019. (Collins, Johnathan)
December 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MINUTE ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 12/5/2018. Scheduling Conference set for 2/27/2019 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. (mdave, )
December 5, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE OF CASE ASSOCIATION by Johnathan Edward Collins on behalf of Live Face On Web, LLC (Collins, Johnathan)
December 5, 2018 Filing 13 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (rkeec)
December 5, 2018 Filing 12 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #11 Memorandum Returning Case. This case is randomly reassigned to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. All future pleadings should be designated as 18-cv-03087-MEH. (Text Only Entry) (rkeec)
December 5, 2018 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel. (rkeec)
December 4, 2018 Filing 10 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (evana, )
December 3, 2018 Filing 9 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Quantum Group LLC by Plaintiff Live Face On Web, LLC. (Collins, Johnathan)
December 3, 2018 Filing 8 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Quantum Branson LLC by Plaintiff Live Face On Web, LLC. (Collins, Johnathan)
December 3, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Michael Kirschbaum by Plaintiff Live Face On Web, LLC. (Collins, Johnathan)
December 3, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Kim Kirschbaum by Plaintiff Live Face On Web, LLC. (Collins, Johnathan)
December 3, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Allison Kirschbaum by Plaintiff Live Face On Web, LLC. (Collins, Johnathan)
December 3, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE OF CASE ASSOCIATION by Johnathan Edward Collins on behalf of Live Face On Web, LLC (Collins, Johnathan)
November 30, 2018 Filing 3 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (dbera, )
November 30, 2018 Filing 2 Case assigned to Judge Wiley Y. Daniel and drawn to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Text Only Entry (dbera, )
November 30, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kim Kirschbaum, Michael Kirschbaum, Quantum Branson LLC, Quantum Group LLC (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6419331)Attorney Johnathan Edward Collins added to party Live Face On Web, LLC(pty:dft), filed by Live Face On Web, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Collins, Johnathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Live Face on Web, LLC v. Kirschbaum et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kim Kirschbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quantum Group LLC
Represented By: Douglas W. Lambalot
Represented By: Lauren Elizabeth Mosse Thompson
Represented By: Theodore Wells Rosen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quantum Branson LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Kirschbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allison Kirshbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Live Face On Web, LLC
Represented By: Johnathan Edward Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?