Metzger v. Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Chadrick Metzger
Defendant: Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2018cv03119
Filed: December 4, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Wiley Y Daniel
Referring Judge: Kristen L Mix
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 SCHEDULING ORDER: by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 1/30/19. (lgale, )
January 30, 2019 Filing 27 MINUTE ENTRY for Scheduling Conference held before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 1/30/2019. Discovery due by 11/15/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 12/20/2019. Final Pretrial/Trial Preparation and Jury Instructions Conference set for 5/28/2020 9:30 AM in Courtroom A401 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. Four Day Jury Trial set for 6/1/2020 9:00 AM in Courtroom A401 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. FTR: KLM Courtroom A401. (Attachments: #1 Discovery Procedures and Requirements of Practice) (lgale, )
January 30, 2019 Filing 26 ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES:re: #24 Notice of Entry of Appearance, #25 Notice of Entry of Appearance filed by attorney Robert K. Reimann and John-Michael Sorokolit. The s/signature did not match the filers name on the account for which the login and password are registered. DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. Action to take - future documents must be filed pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 5.1(a) and 4.3(c) of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases).(Text Only Entry) (nmarb, )
January 30, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance of John-Michael Sorokolit by James Edgar Freemyer on behalf of Chadrick Metzger (Freemyer, James)
January 30, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance Of Robert K. Reimann by James Edgar Freemyer on behalf of Chadrick Metzger (Freemyer, James)
January 23, 2019 Filing 23 Proposed Scheduling Order by Defendant Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company. (Joyce, Kyle)
January 22, 2019 Filing 22 KLM CIVIL MOTIONS PRACTICE STANDARDS by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 1/22/19. (lgale, )
January 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER OF REFERENCE PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 636(c) by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 1/21/19. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. (dkals, )
January 18, 2019 Filing 20 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendant Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company All parties consent.. (Jones, Max)
December 28, 2018 Filing 19 NOTICE of Filing Amended Pleading re #18 Answer to Complaint by Defendant Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Notice of Filing First Amended Answer)(Joyce, Kyle)
December 28, 2018 Filing 18 AMENDED ANSWER to #5 Complaint with Jury Demand by Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company.(Joyce, Kyle) Modified on 12/28/2018 to correct event text and create linkage (athom, ).
December 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING/PLANNING CONFERENCE By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 12/14/18. Scheduling Conference set for 1/30/2019 11:00 AM in Courtroom A401 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1, #2 Attachment 2, #3 Attachment 3) (lgale, )
December 14, 2018 Filing 16 NOTICE of Related Cases by Defendant Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company (Joyce, Kyle)
December 11, 2018 Filing 15 ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES: re: #14 Notice of Entry of Appearance filed by attorney James Edgar Freemyer. The document was scanned and not converted directly to portable document format (PDF). DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. Action to take - future documents must be filed pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 5.1(a) and 1.3(f) of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases). (Text Only Entry) (athom, )
December 11, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by James Edgar Freemyer on behalf of Chadrick MetzgerAttorney James Edgar Freemyer added to party Chadrick Metzger(pty:pla) (Freemyer, James)
December 10, 2018 Filing 13 Defendant The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company's ANSWER to #5 Complaint by Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company.(Joyce, Kyle)
December 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. Magistrate Judge Mix is designated to conduct NDISPO proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b). The parties should expect to be given a firm trial setting that is 90 to 120 days from the date of the final pretrial conference, and should be available for trial accordingly. FURTHER, Court-sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, the Court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. SO ORDERED by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 12/7/2018. Text Only Entry (cmasec)
December 6, 2018 Filing 11 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #10 Memorandum Returning Case. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Christine M. Arguello. All future pleadings should be designated as 18-cv-03119-CMA. (Text Only Entry) (rkeec)
December 6, 2018 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel. (rkeec)
December 4, 2018 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT/RETURN of Service of Summons and Complaint upon Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company on 11/5/2018 (rroge, )
December 4, 2018 Filing 8 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (rroge, )
December 4, 2018 Filing 7 Case assigned to Judge Wiley Y. Daniel and drawn to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. Text Only Entry. (rroge, )
December 4, 2018 Filing 6 FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawls of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (rroge, )
December 4, 2018 Filing 5 COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company, filed by Chadrick Metzger.(rroge, )
December 4, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance on Behalf of Defendant by Max K. Jones, Jr on behalf of Travelers Home and Marine Insurance CompanyAttorney Max K. Jones, Jr added to party Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company(pty:dft) (Jones, Max)
December 4, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Filing of State Court Docket Sheet by Defendant Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Notice of Filing State Docket)(Joyce, Kyle)
December 4, 2018 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent The Travelers Companies, Inc., Corporate Parent The Travelers Indemnity Company, Corporate Parent Travelers Property Casualty Corp., Corporate Parent Travelers Insurance Group Holdings, Inc. for Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company. (Joyce, Kyle)
December 4, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company from Denver District Court, Case Number 18-cv-34079. (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 1082-6423293), filed by Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit B to Notice of Removal, #3 Exhibit C to Notice of Removal, #4 Exhibit D to Notice of Removal, #5 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet)(Joyce, Kyle)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Metzger v. Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company
Represented By: Kyle Brandon Joyce
Represented By: Max K. Jones, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chadrick Metzger
Represented By: James Edgar Freemyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?