Commercial Industrial Building Owners et al v. Vail Corporation, The
Plaintiff: Commercial Industrial Building Owners, Great Lakes Insurance SE and Commercial Industrial Building Owners Alliance
Defendant: Vail Corporation, The
Case Number: 1:2018cv03202
Filed: December 13, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Michael E Hegarty
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER granting #6 the Stipulated Motion to Extend Time for Defendant The Vail Corporation to Answer the Complaint and to Continue Scheduling Conference by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 01/24/2019. The Vail Corporation answer due 2/20/2019. Scheduling Conference set for 2/19/2019 is vacated and reset to 3/21/2019 10:30 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. (mdave, )
January 17, 2019 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Vail Resorts Inc. for Vail Corporation, The. (Walker, Edward)
January 16, 2019 Filing 6 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #1 Complaint,, and to Continue Scheduling Conference by Defendant Vail Corporation, The. (Walker, Edward)
January 3, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Commercial Industrial Building Owners Alliance, Great Lakes Insurance SE. Vail Corporation, The served on 12/21/2018, answer due 1/11/2019. (O'Brian Williams, Geri)
December 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 12/14/2018. Scheduling Conference set for 2/19/2019 10:15 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. (tsher, )
December 13, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (cmadr, )
December 13, 2018 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Text Only Entry. (cmadr, )
December 13, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against The Vail Corporation (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6438991)Attorney Geri Ann O'Brian Williams added to party Commercial Industrial Building Owners(pty:pla), Attorney Geri Ann O'Brian Williams added to party Great Lakes Insurance SE, as subrogee of Oxford Court Condominium Association, et al.(pty:pla), filed by Commercial Industrial Building Owners, Great Lakes Insurance SE, as subrogee of Oxford Court Condominium Association, et al.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(O'Brian Williams, Geri)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Commercial Industrial Building Owners et al v. Vail Corporation, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vail Corporation, The
Represented By: Edward Timothy Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Commercial Industrial Building Owners
Represented By: Geri Ann O'Brian Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Great Lakes Insurance SE
Represented By: Geri Ann O'Brian Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Commercial Industrial Building Owners Alliance
Represented By: Geri Ann O'Brian Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?