Bunch v. United States Department of Education
Plaintiff: Peg Bunch
Defendant: United States Department of Education
Case Number: 1:2018cv03214
Filed: December 14, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Robert E Blackburn
Referring Judge: Scott T Varholak
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act of 1974
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER of Dismissal. Plaintiff's Notice of Dismissal with Prejudice [#9 ] is approved. Plaintiff's claims against defendant in this action are dismissed with prejudice. This case is closed. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 02/11/2019. (athom, )
February 11, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Case by Plaintiff Peg Bunch (Vedra, Daniel)
January 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time Due to Lapse in Appropriations. The Court finds good cause to grant an extension of the deadline and thus extends the deadline for Defendant to respond to the operative complaint until 2/19/2019. The Court cautions Defendant, however, that the granting of this limited extension does not guarantee that the Court will grant additional continuances if appropriations are not restored in advance of the reset deadline. SO ORDERED, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 1/16/2019. Text Only Entry (stvlc1, )
January 16, 2019 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 1/16/19 regarding #6 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #1 Complaint, filed by United States Department of Education. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak Text Only Entry (rebsec)
January 16, 2019 Filing 6 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #1 Complaint, by Defendant United States Department of Education. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Traskos, Kevin)
December 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER By Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 12/18/2018. Scheduling Conference set for 2/20/2019 09:00 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. (jgonz, )
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. IT IS ORDERED that pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this matter is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge:(1) To convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b), enter a Scheduling Order that satisfies the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, and enter such orders as appropriate to enforce the Scheduling order and resolve discovery matters; provided, further that the scheduling conference, the Magistrate Judge shall advise the parties of Judge Blackburns practice standards found at www.cod.uscourts.gov.;(2) To hear and finally determine non-dispositive matters that have been referred, subject to the exceptions found in 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A); and(3) To hear and make recommendations on dispositive matters that have been referred as defined in 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLOLCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, this court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 12/17/18. Text Only Entry (rebsec)
December 14, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (cmadr, )
December 14, 2018 Filing 2 Case assigned to Judge Robert E. Blackburn and drawn to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Text Only Entry. (cmadr, )
December 14, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Department of Education (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6440418)Attorney Daniel James Vedra added to party Peg Bunch(pty:pla), filed by Peg Bunch. (Attachments: #1 Summons Department of Education, #2 Summons US Attorney, #3 Summons Attorney General, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Vedra, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bunch v. United States Department of Education
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peg Bunch
Represented By: Daniel James Vedra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Education
Represented By: Kevin Thomas Traskos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?