USA v. $57,910.00 in United States currency et al

Plaintiff: USA
Defendant: $57,910.00 in United States currency and 3 assorted firearms
Claimant: Adam Zuniga
Case Number: 1:2018cv03274
Filed: December 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Wiley Y Daniel
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 8, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Non-Opposition to Claimant's Motion for Stay by Plaintiff USA (Young, Elizabeth)
February 7, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Stay Proceedings by Claimant Adam Zuniga. (Cox, Ryan)
January 24, 2019 Filing 7 CLAIM Statement by Claimant Adam Zuniga (Cox, Ryan) (Modified on 1/25/2019 edited to correct party filer as Claimant)(evana, ).
January 8, 2019 Filing 6 WARRANT FOR ARREST OF PROPERTY IN REM pursuant to the #5 Order. (evana, )
January 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER FOR WARRANT for Arrest of Property IN REM: a. $57,910.00 in United States currency b. 3 Assorted Firearms. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall enter a Warrant for Arrest of Property In Rem and that the United States Marshals Service and/or any other duly authorized law enforcement officer is directed to arrest and seize the above referenced defendant assets as soon as practicable, and to use whatever means may be appropriate to protect and maintain it in your custody until further order of this Court, by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 1/8/2019. (evana, )
December 21, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Complaint for Forfeiture by Plaintiff USA (Young, Elizabeth)
December 20, 2018 Filing 3 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (rvill, )
December 20, 2018 Filing 2 Case assigned to Judge Wiley Y. Daniel and drawn to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Text Only Entry. (rvill, )
December 20, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR FORFEITURE IN REM against $57,910.00 in United States currency, 3 assorted firearms Attorney Elizabeth Jane Young added to party USA(pty:pla), filed by USA. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only), #2 Warrant for Arrest of Property, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Young, Elizabeth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA v. $57,910.00 in United States currency et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $57,910.00 in United States currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3 assorted firearms
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: USA
Represented By: Elizabeth Jane Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Adam Zuniga
Represented By: Ryan Thomas Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?