USA v. Bhappu et al

Plaintiff: USA
Defendant: Candy Bhappu and Ross Bhappu
Case Number: 1:2018cv03287
Filed: December 21, 2018
Court: Colorado District Court
0 Judge: Wiley Y Daniel
1 Judge: Michael E Hegarty
Nature of Suit: Tax Suits
Cause of Action: 26:7405
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order 7 MINUTE ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 01/07/2019. Scheduling Conference set for 2/26/2019 10:45 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. (mdave, )
January 4, 2019 6 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (rkeec)
January 4, 2019 5 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #4 Memorandum Returning Case. This case is randomly reassigned to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. All future pleadings should be designated as 18-cv-03287-MEH. (Text Only Entry) (rkeec)
January 4, 2019 4 MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel. (rkeec)
December 21, 2018 3 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (rsams, )
December 21, 2018 2 Case assigned to Judge Wiley Y. Daniel and drawn to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. Text Only Entry. (rsams, )
December 21, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against Candy Bhappu, Ross R. Bhappu Attorney Alex Ryan Halverson added to party United States of America(pty:pla), filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Summons for Ross Bhappu, #4 Summons for Candy Bhappu, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Halverson, Alex)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA v. Bhappu et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Candy Bhappu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ross Bhappu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: USA
Represented By: Alex Ryan Halverson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?