Provencher v. US Bank National Association
Plaintiff: Robert Provencher
Defendant: U.S. Bank National Association, US Bank National Association and US Bank National Association doing business as US Bank
Case Number: 1:2018cv03291
Filed: December 21, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Richard P Matsch
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 29:621
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 11, 2019 Filing 7 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Answer or Respond to the Complaint by Plaintiff Robert Provencher. Robert Provencher answer due 2/12/2019. (Gomez, Michelle)
January 25, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Robert Provencher. US Bank National Association served on 1/22/2019, answer due 2/12/2019. (Collison, Madeline)
January 22, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (evana, )
January 22, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS REQUEST as to U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, d/b/a US Bank re #1 Complaint, by Plaintiff Robert Provencher. (Collison, Madeline)
December 21, 2018 Filing 3 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). No Summonses Issued. (rsams, )
December 21, 2018 Filing 2 Case assigned to Judge Richard P. Matsch and drawn to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Text Only Entry. (rsams, )
December 21, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against U.S. Bank National Association d/b/a US Bank (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6453068)Attorney Madeline A. Collison added to party Robert Provencher(pty:pla), filed by Robert Provencher. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Collison, Madeline)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Provencher v. US Bank National Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank National Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Bank National Association
Represented By: Michelle Lynn Gomez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Bank National Association doing business as US Bank
Represented By: Michelle Lynn Gomez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Provencher
Represented By: Madeline A. Collison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?