Banks v. Commissioner, Social Security Administration

Plaintiff: Annie Louise Banks
Defendant: Commissioner, Social Security Administration
Interested Party: USAO-SS-Noticing and SSA Noticing
Case Number: 1:2018cv03309
Filed: December 24, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Robert E Blackburn
Nature of Suit: Social Security - DIWC/DIWW (405(g))
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 21, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Christina J. Valerio on behalf of Commissioner, Social Security AdministrationAttorney Christina J. Valerio added to party Commissioner, Social Security Administration(pty:dft) (Valerio, Christina)
January 31, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by J. Benedict Garcia on behalf of Commissioner, Social Security AdministrationAttorney J. Benedict Garcia added to party Commissioner, Social Security Administration(pty:dft) (Garcia, J.)
December 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REGARDING INSTRUCTIONS FOR JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 12/27/2018. (Attachments: #1 Case Management Form) (athom, )
December 24, 2018 Filing 8 Utility Setting Deadlines: Commissioner, Social Security Administration answer due 2/22/2019. Text Only Entry (athom, )
December 24, 2018 Filing 7 Administrative Notice: Social Security Case Service. Pursuant to the Letter of Agreement signed by the Clerk, U.S. District Court;U.S. Attorneys Office for the District of Colorado (USAO), and Social Security Administration (SSA), service of the initiating document(s) by the plaintiff to the SSA, the U.S. Attorney General, and USAO in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(i) is not necessary unless the court otherwise orders. A summons is not required and will not be issued. (Text Only Entry). (rsams, )
December 24, 2018 Filing 6 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). No Summons Issued. (rsams, )
December 24, 2018 Filing 5 Case assigned to Judge Robert E. Blackburn. Text Only Entry. (rsams, )
December 24, 2018 Filing 4 Administrative Notice: Duplicate document filing. No action required. (Text Only Entry) (rsams, )
December 24, 2018 Filing 3 Administrative Notice: Duplicate filing fee received. Financial notified and a refund is pending. (Text Only Entry). (rsams, )
December 24, 2018 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Nancy A Berryhill (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6454961), filed by Annie Banks. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Exhibit Social Security Decision dated 12/21/18)(Newall, Frederick)
December 24, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Nancy A Berryhill (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6454796)Attorney Frederick W. Newall added to party Annie Banks(pty:pla), filed by Annie Banks. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Summons, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Newall, Frederick)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Banks v. Commissioner, Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Annie Louise Banks
Represented By: Frederick W. Newall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: USAO-SS-Noticing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA Noticing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner, Social Security Administration
Represented By: Christina J. Valerio
Represented By: J. Benedict Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?