Silletto v. Commissioner, Social Security Administration

Plaintiff: Brandon Michael Silletto
Defendant: Commissioner, Social Security Administration
Interested Party: USAO-SS-Noticing and SSA Noticing
Case Number: 1:2019cv00092
Filed: January 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Wiley Y Daniel
Referring Judge: Gordon P Gallagher
Nature of Suit: Social Security - SSID Title XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REGARDING INSTRUCTIONS FOR JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN for Social Security Cases, by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 2/7/2019. (Attachments: #1 Case Management Form) (evana, )
February 6, 2019 Filing 10 Utility Setting Deadlines: Commissioner, Social Security Administration answer due 4/7/2019. Text Only Entry (evana, )
February 6, 2019 Filing 9 Administrative Notice: Social Security Case Service. Pursuant to the Letter of Agreement signed by the Clerk, U.S. District Court; U.S. Attorneys Office for the District of Colorado (USAO), and Social Security Administration (SSA), service of the initiating document(s) by the plaintiff to the SSA, the U.S. Attorney General, and USAO in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(i) is not necessary unless the court otherwise orders. A summons is not required and will not be issued. (Text Only Entry) (rvill, )
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Drawing Case by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 2/6/2019. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Wiley Y. Daniel for all further proceedings. All future pleadings should be designated as 19-cv-00092-WYD. (sphil, )
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #2 Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs (Long Form), by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 2/6/2019. (sphil, )
February 5, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by J. Benedict Garcia on behalf of Commissioner, Social Security AdministrationAttorney J. Benedict Garcia added to party Commissioner, Social Security Administration(pty:dft) (Garcia, J.)
February 4, 2019 Filing 5 Exhibits in Support of #1 Complaint by Plaintiff Brandon Michael Silletto. (sphil, )
January 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Directing Plaintiff to Cure Deficiencies by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 1/14/2019. ORDERED that, if Plaintiff fails to cure the designated deficiencies within thirty (30) days from the date of this order, the action will be dismissed without further notice. The dismissal shall be without prejudice. (sphil, )
January 10, 2019 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. Text Only Entry. (cmadr, )
January 10, 2019 Filing 2 Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs. by Plaintiff Brandon Michael Silletto. (cmadr, )
January 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Judicial Review of Social Security Decision against Commissioner, Social Security Administration, filed by Brandon Michael Silletto.(cmadr, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Silletto v. Commissioner, Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: USAO-SS-Noticing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA Noticing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner, Social Security Administration
Represented By: J. Benedict Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandon Michael Silletto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?