Zvelo, Inc. v. Akamai Technologies, Inc.

Plaintiff: zvelo, Inc.
Defendant: Akamai Technologies, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00097
Filed: January 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
0 Judge: Philip A Brimmer
1 Judge: S Kato Crews
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 40 SCHEDULING ORDER: by Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 3/4/19. (amont, )
March 4, 2019 Filing 39 COURTROOM MINUTES for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews: Scheduling Conference held on 3/4/2019. Discovery due by 10/4/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 11/4/2019. Joint Status Report due by 6/3/2019. Telephone Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/21/2020 10:00 AM in Courtroom C204 before Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. Counsel participating in the conference shall jointly call the Court (303.335.2124) at the scheduled time. FTR: Courtroom C-204. (amont, )
March 1, 2019 Filing 38 RESPONSE to #28 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Plaintiff Zvelo, Inc.. (Nitta, Chad)
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER granting #31 Motion for Leave. Attorney Michael Strapp of DLA Piper LLP may appear at the forthcoming scheduling conference telephonically by calling 303.335.2124 at the scheduled time. By Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 2/26/2019. Text Only Entry (skclc1)
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER granting #29 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Blair Elizabeth Kanis is terminated as counsel of record for Plaintiff. The Clerk of Court shall remove Ms. Kanis from the electronic notification system for this case. By Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 2/26/2019. Text Only Entry (skclc1)
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 35 MINUTE ORDER Pursuant to a conflict on the Court's calendar, the Scheduling Conference set for 3/4/2019 is moved up and will be held at 09:30 AM in Courtroom C204 before Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. By Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 2/26/19. Text Only Entry (amont, )
February 25, 2019 Filing 34 MEMORANDUM regarding #31 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Appear at Scheduling Conference by Telephone filed by Akamai Technologies, Inc. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 2/25/19. Text Only Entry (pabsec)
February 25, 2019 Filing 33 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiff Zvelo, Inc. All parties do not consent.. (Nitta, Chad)
February 25, 2019 Filing 32 Proposed Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Zvelo, Inc.. (Nitta, Chad)
February 25, 2019 Filing 31 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Appear at Scheduling Conference by Telephone by Defendant Akamai Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Strapp, Michael)
February 22, 2019 Filing 30 MEMORANDUM regarding #29 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Blair E. Kanis filed by Zvelo, Inc. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 2/22/19. Text Only Entry (pabsec)
February 22, 2019 Filing 29 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Blair E. Kanis by Plaintiff Zvelo, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Nitta, Chad)
February 8, 2019 Filing 28 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Defendant Akamai Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Strapp, Michael)
February 5, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Christopher Bryan Donovan on behalf of Akamai Technologies, Inc.Attorney Christopher Bryan Donovan added to party Akamai Technologies, Inc.(pty:dft) (Donovan, Christopher)
February 5, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Allissa A.R. Pollard on behalf of Akamai Technologies, Inc.Attorney Allissa A.R. Pollard added to party Akamai Technologies, Inc.(pty:dft) (Pollard, Allissa)
February 5, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Michael G. Strapp on behalf of Akamai Technologies, Inc.Attorney Michael G. Strapp added to party Akamai Technologies, Inc.(pty:dft) (Strapp, Michael)
February 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 AMENDED ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews for non-dispositive matters. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, and (4) conduct a pretrial conference and enter a pretrial order. Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, this court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. By Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 2/4/19. Text Only Entry (pabsec)
January 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER DIRECTING REASSIGNMENT The case is REASSIGNED to Judge Brimmer and allfuture filings in Civil Action 19-cv-00097-RM-KLM shall be docketed under case number 19-cv-00097-PAB-SKC. ORDERED by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 1/31/2019. (cthom, )
January 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 1/30/19. Unopposed Motion to Reschedule Scheduling Conference #20 is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Scheduling Conference set for April 24, 2019, at 11:00 a.m. is VACATED and RESET to 3/4/2019 10:30 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. (lgale, )
January 30, 2019 Filing 21 MEMORANDUM regarding #20 Unopposed MOTION to Reset Scheduling Conference filed by Akamai Technologies, Inc. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. Entered by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 1/30/2019. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec )
January 30, 2019 Filing 20 Unopposed MOTION to Reset Scheduling Conference by Defendant Akamai Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Reilly, Kathryn)
January 30, 2019 Filing 19 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Reilly, Kathryn)
January 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the stipulation to extend time #17 , the Court finds the stipulation fails to show compliance with D.C.COLO.LCivR 6.1(c) ("When a stipulation or motion for extension of time or continuance is filed, it shall be served contemporaneously by counsel on his or her client."). The Court will accept the stipulation in this instance, but directs the parties to comply with this requirement. Future stipulations or requests for extensions, however, may be summarily denied absent such showing. See D.C.COLO.LCivR 6.1(a) (A properly filed stipulation "shall be effective on filing, unless otherwise ordered."). SO ORDERED by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 1/29/2019. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec )
January 29, 2019 Filing 17 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Answer or Respond to the Complaint by Defendant Akamai Technologies, Inc.. Akamai Technologies, Inc. answer due 2/8/2019. (Reilly, Kathryn)
January 29, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Melissa Lawson Romero on behalf of Akamai Technologies, Inc.Attorney Melissa Lawson Romero added to party Akamai Technologies, Inc.(pty:dft) (Romero, Melissa)
January 29, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Kathryn A. Reilly on behalf of Akamai Technologies, Inc.Attorney Kathryn A. Reilly added to party Akamai Technologies, Inc.(pty:dft) (Reilly, Kathryn)
January 24, 2019 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE of Mailing/Service re 10 Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge,,,,, 11 Minute Order, #12 Order, by Plaintiff Zvelo, Inc.. (Nitta, Chad)
January 14, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Zvelo, Inc.. Akamai Technologies, Inc. served on 1/14/2019, answer due 2/4/2019. (Nitta, Chad)
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 4/24/2019 11:00 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 1/11/2019. (Attachments: #1 Continuation of Main Document, #2 Continuation of Main Document, #3 Continuation of Main Document) (jgonz, )
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MINUTE ORDER: With the assignment of this matter, the parties are advised that throughout this case they are expected to be familiar and comply with not only the Local Rules of this District, but also Judge Raymond P. Moore's Civil Practice Standards, which may be found at: http://www.cod.uscourts.gov/JudicialOfficers/ActiveArticleIIIJudges/HonRaymondPMoore.aspx. SO ORDERED by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 1/11/2019. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec)
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, (4) conduct a pretrial conference and enter a pretrial order, and (5) conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions. Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, this court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. Entered by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 1/11/2019. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec )
January 11, 2019 Filing 9 CASE REASSIGNED. Pursuant to #8 Memorandum Returning Case. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Raymond P. Moore. All future pleadings should be designated as 19-cv-00097 RM. (Text Only Entry) (evana, )
January 11, 2019 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE for reassignment by Senior Judge Wiley Y. Daniel (evana, )
January 11, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (rvill, )
January 10, 2019 Filing 6 Case assigned to Judge Wiley Y. Daniel and drawn to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. Text Only Entry. (rvill, )
January 10, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Elizabeth Julianne Field on behalf of zvelo, Inc.Attorney Elizabeth Julianne Field added to party zvelo, Inc.(pty:pla) (Field, Elizabeth)
January 10, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Blair Elizabeth Kanis on behalf of zvelo, Inc.Attorney Blair Elizabeth Kanis added to party zvelo, Inc.(pty:pla) (Kanis, Blair)
January 10, 2019 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Nitta, Chad)
January 10, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF CASE ASSOCIATION (Notice of Related Case) by Chad Takashi Nitta on behalf of zvelo, Inc. (Nitta, Chad)
January 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against Akamai Technologies, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6477985)Attorney Chad Takashi Nitta added to party zvelo, Inc.(pty:pla), filed by zvelo, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Nitta, Chad)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zvelo, Inc. v. Akamai Technologies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: zvelo, Inc.
Represented By: Chad Takashi Nitta
Represented By: Elizabeth Julianne Field
Represented By: Blair Elizabeth Kanis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Akamai Technologies, Inc.
Represented By: Michael G. Strapp
Represented By: Allissa A.R. Pollard
Represented By: Kathryn A. Reilly
Represented By: Christopher Bryan Donovan
Represented By: Melissa Lawson Romero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?