Walcott v. USA

Plaintiff: Janet L. Walcott
Defendant: United States of America Department of the Treasury and USA
Case Number: 1:2019cv00100
Filed: January 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Kathleen M Tafoya
Nature of Suit: Tax Suits
Cause of Action: 26:7422
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 AMENDED ORDER SETTING Scheduling Conference for 6/4/2019 at 09:45 AM in Courtroom 101 (Colorado Springs) before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Consent Form due by 5/28/2019. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 03/06/2019. (ksena)
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint. Defendant USA shall respond no later than 5/28/2019. The 4/8/2019 Scheduling Conference is VACATED, to be reset by separate order. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 3/5/2019. Text Only Entry (kmtlc2)
March 5, 2019 Filing 11 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #1 Complaint, by Defendant USA. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Halverson, Alex)
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 4/8/2019 at 10:15 AM in Courtroom 101 (Colorado Springs) before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Consent Form due by 4/1/2019. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 01/23/2019. (ksena)
January 22, 2019 Filing 9 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (rkeec)
January 22, 2019 Filing 8 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #7 Memorandum Returning Case. This case is randomly reassigned to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. All future pleadings should be designated as 19-cv-00100-KMT. (Text Only Entry) (rkeec)
January 22, 2019 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel. (rkeec)
January 14, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (evana, )
January 12, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS REQUEST as to United States of America by Plaintiff Janet L. Walcott. (Attachments: #1 Summons Request to Issue Summons, #2 Summons Request to Issue Summons)(Hopkins, James)
January 10, 2019 Filing 4 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). No Summons Issued. (cmadr, )
January 10, 2019 Filing 3 Case assigned to Judge Wiley Y. Daniel and drawn to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Text Only Entry. (cmadr, )
January 10, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF CASE ASSOCIATION by James David Hopkins on behalf of Janet L. Walcott (Hopkins, James)
January 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against United States of America Department of the Treasury (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6478216)Attorney James David Hopkins added to party Janet L. Walcott(pty:pla), filed by Janet L. Walcott. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Hopkins, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Walcott v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America Department of the Treasury
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Represented By: Alex Ryan Halverson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janet L. Walcott
Represented By: James David Hopkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?