KeyBank National Association. v. Brazos Valley Travel, LLC et al

Plaintiff: KeyBank National Association
Defendant: Robert Safley, Ruby Safley, Brazos Valley Travel, LLC and Ruby Rice
Case Number: 1:2019cv00105
Filed: January 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Lewis T Babcock
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 4, 2019 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by KeyBank National Association. Robert Safley served on 2/13/2019, answer due 3/6/2019. (Fleming, Daniel)
February 25, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by KeyBank National Association. Brazos Valley Travel, LLC served on 2/1/2019, answer due 2/22/2019. (Fleming, Daniel)
January 31, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by KeyBank National Association. Ruby Safley served on 1/23/2019, answer due 2/13/2019. (Fleming, Daniel)
January 14, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS issued by Clerk on 1/14/2019 (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons) (angar, )
January 14, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS REQUEST as to ROBERT SAFLEY re #2 Notice (Other), #7 Notice (Other), #6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff KeyBank National Association. (Fleming, Daniel)
January 14, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS REQUEST as to RUBY SAFLEY re #2 Notice (Other), #7 Notice (Other), #6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff KeyBank National Association. (Fleming, Daniel)
January 14, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Brazos Valley Travel, LLC. re #2 Notice (Other), #7 Notice (Other), #6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff KeyBank National Association. (Fleming, Daniel)
January 14, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE re #2 Notice (Other) Civil Cover Sheet by Plaintiff KeyBank National Association (Fleming, Daniel)
January 14, 2019 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent KeyCorp for KeyBank National Association. (Fleming, Daniel)
January 11, 2019 Filing 5 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (rroge, )
January 11, 2019 Filing 4 Case assigned to Judge Lewis T. Babcock and drawn to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. Text Only Entry. (rroge, )
January 11, 2019 Filing 3 ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES:re: #2 Notice (Other) filed by attorneyJames K. Haney.The s/signature did not match the filers name on the account for which the login and password are registered. DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. Action to take - future documents must be filed pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 5.1(a) and 4.3(c) of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases).(Text Only Entry) (rroge, )
January 11, 2019 Filing 2 Complaint,, by Plaintiff KeyBank National Association, successor by merger to Key Equipment Finance Inc. (Fleming, Daniel) Modified on 1/15/2019 (rroge, ) to correct docket text.
January 11, 2019 Filing 1 WRONG DOCUMENT UPLOADEDCOMPLAINT against Brazos Valley Travel, LLC, Robert Safley, Ruby Safley (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6479885)Attorney James Kevin Haney added to party KeyBank National Association, successor by merger to Key Equipment Finance Inc.(pty:pla), filed by KeyBank National Association, successor by merger to Key Equipment Finance Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Lease Agreement and Payment Schedule, #2 Exhibit B - The Guaranty, #3 Exhibit C - Delivery and Acceptance Certificate, #4 Exhibit D - Extension Agreement, #5 Exhibit E - Notices of Deficiency, #6 Exhibit F - Demand Letter)(Haney, James) Modified on 1/15/2019 to add text stating that the main document is incorrect.(rroge, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KeyBank National Association. v. Brazos Valley Travel, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Safley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ruby Safley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brazos Valley Travel, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ruby Rice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KeyBank National Association
Represented By: James Kevin Haney
Represented By: Daniel C. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?