Nekouee v. GKT Fox Creek Village, L.L.C. et al

Plaintiff: Fred Nekouee
Defendant: Walgreen Co., GKT Fox Creek Village, L.L.C. and Dillon Companies, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00115
Filed: January 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Kristen L Mix
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 11, 2019 Filing 21 Defendant Walgreen Co.'s ANSWER to #1 Complaint, and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by Walgreen Co..(Combs, Daniel)
March 11, 2019 Filing 20 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Dillon Companies, LLC.(Larson, Ashley)
March 4, 2019 Filing 19 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by GKT Fox Creek Village, L.L.C..(Lessmann, Ryan)
February 19, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Melisa Hallie Panagakos on behalf of GKT Fox Creek Village, L.L.C.Attorney Melisa Hallie Panagakos added to party GKT Fox Creek Village, L.L.C.(pty:dft) (Panagakos, Melisa)
February 19, 2019 Filing 17 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Answer or Respond to the Complaint by Defendant GKT Fox Creek Village, L.L.C.. GKT Fox Creek Village, L.L.C. answer due 2/11/2019. (Lessmann, Ryan)
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 2/8/19 GRANTING #13 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond. Walgreen Co. answer due 3/11/2019. (nmarb, )
February 8, 2019 Filing 15 Scheduling Conference set for 4/22/2019 11:00 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix pursuant to #11 . Text Only Entry (lgale, )
February 7, 2019 Filing 14 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Other Affiliate Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc., Other Affiliate Farmacias Ahumada S.A., Other Affiliate Farmacias Benavides S.A.B. de C.V., Other Affiliate Nanjing Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd. for Walgreen Co.. (Combs, Daniel)
February 7, 2019 Filing 13 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #1 Complaint, Defendant Walgreen Co.'s Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time to Answer or Respond to Complaint by Defendant Walgreen Co.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only) Proposed Order)(Combs, Daniel)
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 1/28/19. Unopposed Motion for 30-Day Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint #9 is GRANTED. Defendant Dillon Companies, LLC shall answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint #1 on or beforeMarch 11, 2019. (lgale, )
January 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 4/22/2019 11:00 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 1/25/20019. (Attachments: #1 Continuation of Main Document, #2 Continuation of Main Document) (jgonz, ) Modified on 2/8/2019 to correct hearing date (lgale, ).
January 25, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Ashley Ricketson Larson on behalf of Dillon Companies, LLCAttorney Ashley Ricketson Larson added to party Dillon Companies, LLC(pty:dft) (Larson, Ashley)
January 25, 2019 Filing 9 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Defendant Dillon Companies, LLC. (Sutton, Debra)
January 25, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Debra K. Sutton on behalf of Dillon Companies, LLCAttorney Debra K. Sutton added to party Dillon Companies, LLC(pty:dft) (Sutton, Debra)
January 22, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Fred Nekouee. Walgreen Co. served on 1/18/2019, answer due 2/8/2019. (Vincze, Robert)
January 22, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Fred Nekouee. Dillon Companies, LLC served on 1/18/2019, answer due 2/8/2019. (Vincze, Robert)
January 14, 2019 Filing 5 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (athom, )
January 14, 2019 Filing 4 MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE by Senior Judge Blackburn. This case is randomly reassigned to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. All future pleadings should be designated as 19-cv-00115-KLM. (athom, )
January 14, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (rvill, )
January 11, 2019 Filing 2 Case assigned to Judge Robert E. Blackburn and drawn to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Text Only Entry. (rvill, )
January 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Dillon Companies, LLC, GKT Fox Creek Village, L.L.C., Walgreen Co. (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6481045)Attorney Robert Joseph Vincze added to party Fred Nekouee(pty:pla), filed by Fred Nekouee. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons GKT Fox Creek Village, L.L.C., #3 Summons Dillon Companies, LLC, #4 Summons Walgreen Co.)(Vincze, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nekouee v. GKT Fox Creek Village, L.L.C. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreen Co.
Represented By: Daniel Mitchell Combs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GKT Fox Creek Village, L.L.C.
Represented By: Melisa Hallie Panagakos
Represented By: Ryan Paul Lessmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dillon Companies, LLC
Represented By: Debra K. Sutton
Represented By: Ashley Ricketson Larson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fred Nekouee
Represented By: Robert Joseph Vincze
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?