WildEarth Guardians v. Office of Surface Mining Reclamation and Enforcement et al

Plaintiff: WildEarth Guardians
Defendant: Office of Surface Mining Reclamation and Enforcement and US Department of the Interior
Case Number: 1:2019cv00132
Filed: January 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: William J Martinez
Referring Judge: Nina Y Wang
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act of 1974
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 7, 2019 Filing 23 COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ORDER for Status Conference held on 3/7/2019 before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Defendant shall have up to and including 4/17/2019, to refile dispositive motions pursuant to the Practice Standards of Judge William Martinez. The first production of documents shall be made by Defendant on or before 4/1/2019. The second production of documents shall be made on or before 5/30/2019. A further Status Conference is set for 6/27/2019 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. FTR: Courtroom A-502. (bwilk, )
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #20 Motion to Reset. Status Conference RESET for 3/7/2019 11:30 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. The court once again construes the Motion to Appear Telephonically as construed towards this new date and GRANTS it as such. Mr. Stills is to call 303.335.2600 at the designated time to participate. By Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 3.5.2019. Text Only Entry (nywlc1, )
March 5, 2019 Filing 21 MEMORANDUM regarding #20 Unopposed MOTION to Reset Status Conference filed by US Department of the Interior, Office of Surface Mining Reclamation and Enforcement. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang by Judge William J. Martinez on 3/5/2019. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, )
March 4, 2019 Filing 20 Unopposed MOTION to Reset Status Conference by Defendants Office of Surface Mining Reclamation and Enforcement, US Department of the Interior. (Aitchison, Chandra)
March 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER: The Status Conference set for Monday, March 4 is RESET for Wednesday, March 6 at 11:30 a.m. and the court construes the pending Motion to Appear Telephonically as construed towards this new date and GRANTS it as such. Mr. Stills is to call 303.335.2600 at the designated time to participate. By Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 3.1.2019. Text Only Entry (nywlc1, )
March 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER: This matter is before the Court on Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Claim One, in Part, and Claims Two and Three #9 . Notwithstanding the fact that Defendants filed their Motion before the case had been drawn to the undersigned, the Motion is hereby STRICKEN for non-compliance with the undersigned's Revised Practice Standard III.D.1. This Practice Standard requires counsel to confer prior to filing a motion pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6), in order to discuss whether the alleged deficiency in the operative complaint can be cured by amendment, and to exercise their best efforts to stipulate to such amendment. This Order is without prejudice to any parties filing appropriate motions on similar grounds, in compliance with all applicable federal rules and statutes, and the undersigned's Revised Practice Standards. SO ORDERED by Judge William J. Martinez on 3/1/2019. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, )
March 1, 2019 Filing 17 MEMORANDUM regarding #12 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Appear Telephonically filed by WildEarth Guardians. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang by Judge William J. Martinez on 3/1/2019. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, )
March 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER: Counsel for the parties and all counsel who may later enter an appearance shall review and familiarize themselves with the undersigned's Revised Practice Standards (as most recently revised effective December 1, 2018 and as they may be amended from time to time), which may be downloaded #here. SO ORDERED by Judge William J. Martinez on 3/ 1/2019. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, )
March 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Magistrate Judge Wang, or such other Magistrate Judge who may in the future be reassigned this case, is designated to conduct NDISPO proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 72(a) and (b). Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the Magistrate Judge or on the request of the parties by motion, the court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. SO ORDERED by Judge William J. Martinez on 3/1/2019. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, )
February 27, 2019 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE by Senior Judge Blackburn. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge William J. Martinez. All future pleadings should be designated as 19-cv-00132-WJM. (athom, )
February 27, 2019 Filing 13 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #11 Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge. All parties do not consent. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Robert E. Blackburn. All future pleadings should be designated as 19-cv-00132-REB. (Text Only Entry) (nmarb, )
February 27, 2019 Filing 12 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Appear Telephonically by Plaintiff WildEarth Guardians. (Stills, Travis)
February 27, 2019 Filing 11 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiff WildEarth Guardians All parties do not consent.. (Stills, Travis)
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER : This matter comes before the court sua sponte. The deadline to submit the Consent/Non-Consent Form is set for on or before Thursday, February 28, 2019. By Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 2.21.2019. Text Only Entry (nywlc1, )
February 21, 2019 Filing 9 STRICKEN MOTION to Dismiss Claim One In Part and Claims Two and Three by Defendants Office of Surface Mining Reclamation and Enforcement, US Department of the Interior. (Aitchison, Chandra) Modified on 3/1/2019 to strike pursuant to 18 Order (angar, ).
February 21, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Chandra Kurien Aitchison on behalf of Office of Surface Mining Reclamation and Enforcement, US Department of the InteriorAttorney Chandra Kurien Aitchison added to party Office of Surface Mining Reclamation and Enforcement(pty:dft), Attorney Chandra Kurien Aitchison added to party US Department of the Interior(pty:dft) (Aitchison, Chandra)
January 29, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon Freedom of Information Act defendant(s) Office of Surface Mining Reclamation and Enforcement served on 1/18/2019, answer due 3/19/2019; US Department of the Interior served on 1/18/2019, answer due 3/19/2019. (Stills, Travis)
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER : A Status Conference is SET for 3/4/2019 10:30 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. By Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 1.23.2019. Text Only Entry (nywlc1, )
January 18, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS issued by Clerk to Matthew G. Whitaker, Acting U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (nmarb, )
January 17, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS REQUEST as to US Attorney General re #1 Complaint, by Plaintiff WildEarth Guardians. (Stills, Travis)
January 15, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (rvill, )
January 15, 2019 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Text Only Entry. (rvill, )
January 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Department of the Interior, The, Office of Surface Mining Reclamation and Enforcement (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6485481)Attorney Travis Earl Stills added to party WildEarth Guardians(pty:pla), filed by WildEarth Guardians. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit Corporate Disclosure, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons)(Stills, Travis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WildEarth Guardians v. Office of Surface Mining Reclamation and Enforcement et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WildEarth Guardians
Represented By: Stuart Nicholas Wilcox
Represented By: Travis Earl Stills
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Office of Surface Mining Reclamation and Enforcement
Represented By: Chandra Kurien Aitchison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Department of the Interior
Represented By: Chandra Kurien Aitchison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?