Leonard v. Lucas
Plaintiff: Kyle W. Leonard
Defendant: Douglas E Lucas
Case Number: 1:2019cv00161
Filed: January 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Robert E Blackburn
Referring Judge: Nina Y Wang
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MINUTE ORDER : The Scheduling Conference originally set by the Order dated February 7, 2019 #4 is RESET for 4/18/2019 11:00 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Proposed Scheduling Order due one week before, on 4/11/2019. By Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 3.17.2019. Text Only Entry (nywlc1, )
March 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REFERRING CASE by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 3/11/19 to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. IT IS ORDERED that pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this matter is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge:(1) To convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b), enter a Scheduling Order that satisfies the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, and enter such orders as appropriate to enforce the Scheduling order and resolve discovery matters; provided, further that the scheduling conference, the Magistrate Judge shall advise the parties of Judge Blackburns practice standards found at www.cod.uscourts.gov.;(2) To hear and finally determine non-dispositive matters that have been referred, subject to the exceptions found in 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A); and(3) To hear and make recommendations on dispositive matters that have been referred as defined in 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLOLCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, this court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. Text Only Entry (rebsec)
March 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MINUTE ORDER vacating the 3/18/2019 Scheduling Conference before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang given 10 Case Reassigned. By Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 3/7/2019. Text Only Entry (nywlc2, )
March 5, 2019 Filing 10 CASE REASSIGNED. pursuant to #8 Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge. All parties do not consent. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Robert E. Blackburn. All future pleadings should be designated as 19-cv-00161-REB. (Text Only Entry) (nmarb, )
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER vacating 3/7/2019 Status Conference given #8 Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge filed by Kyle W. Leonard. By Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 3/5/2019. Text Only Entry (nywlc2, )
March 5, 2019 Filing 8 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiff Kyle W. Leonard All parties do not consent.. (Pearson, Phil)
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to #4 Order, the Parties' Consent Form was due 3/4/2019. Having not received a signed Consent Form, a Status Conference is set for 3/7/2019 02:00 PM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. The Parties or their counsel must appear in person to sign the Consent Form; however, the court will automatically vacate the Status Conference upon the filing of a completed Consent Form. By Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 3/5/2019. Text Only Entry (nywlc2, )
March 5, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS issued by Clerk to Douglas E. Lucas, D.O.. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (nmarb, )
March 4, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Douglas E. Lucas D.O. by Plaintiff Kyle W. Leonard. (Pearson, Phil)
February 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING/PLANNING CONFERENCE AND SETTING DEADLINE FOR FILING OF CONSENT/NONCONSENT FORM by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 2/7/2019. A Scheduling Conference is set for 3/18/2019 09:30 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. The parties shall submit their proposed scheduling order, including a copy of the proposed order in Word format sent via email to Wang_Chambers@cod.uscourts.gov, on or before 3/11/2019. The parties shall complete and file the Consent/Nonconsent Form by 3/4/2019. (bwilk, )
January 18, 2019 Filing 3 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (dbera, )
January 18, 2019 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Text Only Entry (dbera, )
January 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Douglas E Lucas (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6491103)Attorney Phil Cody Pearson added to party Kyle William Leonard(pty:pla), filed by Kyle William Leonard. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Pearson, Phil)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Leonard v. Lucas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kyle W. Leonard
Represented By: Phil Cody Pearson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas E Lucas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?