Hasan Majmaie v. Nielsen et al
Plaintiff: Ahmed Saleh Hasan Majmaie
Defendant: Andrew Lambrecht, Kirstjen Nielsen, Angela K. Goldinger and Lee F. Cissna
Case Number: 1:2019cv00177
Filed: January 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: S Kato Crews
Referring Judge: Raymond P Moore
Nature of Suit: Naturalization Application
Cause of Action: 08:1447
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 11, 2019 Filing 9 Civil Case Terminated pursuant to the #8 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed in this case. Text Only Entry. (cthom, )
March 11, 2019 Filing 8 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiff Ahmed Saleh Hasan Majmaie. (Casey, Jennifer) Modified to correct title on 3/12/2019 (cthom, ).
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER Setting Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference. The Scheduling Conference is set for 3/25/2019 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom C204 before Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. The parties shall file their proposed scheduling order, and email a copy in Word format to Crews_Chambers@cod.uscourts.gov, on or before 3/18/2019. The Magistrate Judge Consent Form (ECF. #4-1) is due 3/18/2019. SO ORDERED, by Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 1/23/2019. Text Only Entry (skclc2, )
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER: With the assignment of this matter, the parties are advised that throughout this case they are expected to be familiar and comply with not only the Local Rules of this District, but also Judge Raymond P. Moore's Civil Practice Standards, which may be found at: http://www.cod.uscourts.gov/JudicialOfficers/ActiveArticleIIIJudges/HonRaymondPMoore.aspx. SO ORDERED by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 1/23/2019. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec )
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, (4) conduct a pretrial conference and enter a pretrial order, and (5) conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions. Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, this court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. Entered by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 1/23/2019. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec )
January 22, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (rroge, )
January 22, 2019 Filing 3 Case assigned to Judge Raymond P. Moore and drawn to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. Text Only Entry. (rroge, )
January 22, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS REQUEST as to DHS Secretary Kirstjen NIELSEN, USCIS Director Lee F. CISSNA, USCIS Rocky Mountain District Director Angela K. GOLDINGER, USCIS Denver Field Office Director Andrew LAMBRECHT, Acting U.S. Attorney General Matthew WHITAKER, U.S. Attorney for Colorado Jason R. DUNN by Plaintiff AHMED SALEH HASAN MAJMAIE. (Attachments: #1 Summons Summons Request Cissna, #2 Summons Summons Request Goldinger, #3 Summons Summons Request Lambrecht, #4 Summons Summons Request Whitaker, #5 Summons Summons Request Dunn)(Kolko, David)
January 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6493815)Attorney Jennifer Rilen Casey added to party AHMED SALEH HASAN MAJMAIE(pty:pla), filed by AHMED SALEH HASAN MAJMAIE. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 4)(Casey, Jennifer)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hasan Majmaie v. Nielsen et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Lambrecht
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kirstjen Nielsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angela K. Goldinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lee F. Cissna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ahmed Saleh Hasan Majmaie
Represented By: David Lawrence Kolko
Represented By: Jennifer Rilen Casey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?