O'Connor et al v. Colorado Supreme Court et al
Plaintiff: Mary E. Henry and Andrew J. O'Connor
Defendant: Attorney Regulation Counsel, Colorado Attorney General's Office, Justin Moore, Melody Mirbaba, Colorado Secretary of State's Office, Cynthia Coffman, Jason Dunn, Colorado Supreme Court and Suzanne Staiert
Case Number: 1:2019cv00217
Filed: January 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Lewis T Babcock
Referring Judge: Gordon P Gallagher
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 5, 2019 Filing 16 JUDGMENT by Clerk re: #15 Order of Dismissal on 3/5/2019. (angar, )
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER of Dismissal. Leave to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal is denied without prejudice to the filing of a motion seeking leave to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal in the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. Plaintiffs' Motion to File Without Payment of Filing Fee (ECF No. #2 ), Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs (Long Form) (ECF No. #14 ), and "Motion to Disqualify Magistrate Judge Gallagher Pursuant to 28 455 USC" (ECF No. #13 ), are denied as moot, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 3/5/2019. (angar, )
February 11, 2019 Filing 14 Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs (Long Form), by Plaintiffs Mary E. Henry, Andrew J. O'Connor. (angar, )
February 7, 2019 Filing 13 Plaintiffs' MOTION to Disqualify Magistrate Gallagher Pursuant to 28 455 U.S.C., by Plaintiffs Mary E. Henry, Andrew J. O'Connor. (angar, ) Modified on 2/7/2019 to correct filing date (angar, ).
January 31, 2019 Filing 12 Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint upon Colorado Attorney General's Office on 1/31/2019 (angar, ) Modified on 2/5/2019 to correct filing date (angar, ).
January 31, 2019 Filing 11 Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint upon Colorado Supreme Court on 1/31/2019 (angar, ) Modified on 2/5/2019 to correct filing date (angar, ).
January 31, 2019 Filing 10 Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint upon Colorado Secretary of State's Office on 1/31/2019 (angar, ) Modified on 2/5/2019 to correct filing date (angar, ).
January 31, 2019 Filing 9 Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint upon Cynthia Coffman on 1/31/2019 (angar, ) Modified on 2/5/2019 to correct filing date (angar, ).
January 31, 2019 Filing 8 Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint upon Jason Dunn on 1/31/2019 (angar, ) Modified on 2/5/2019 to correct filing date (angar, ).
January 31, 2019 Filing 7 Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint upon Justin Moore on 1/31/2019 (angar, ) Modified on 2/5/2019 to correct filing date (angar, ).
January 31, 2019 Filing 6 Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint upon Melody Mirbaba on 1/31/2019 (angar, ) Modified on 2/5/2019 to correct filing date (angar, ).
January 31, 2019 Filing 5 Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint upon Suzanne Staiert on 1/31/2019 (angar, ) Modified on 2/5/2019 to correct filing date (angar, ).
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Directing Plaintiffs to Cure Deficiencies. If Plaintiffs fails to cure the designated deficiencies within thirty days from the date of this Order, the action will be dismissed without further notice, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 1/28/2019. (angar, )
January 25, 2019 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. Text Only Entry. (cmadr, )
January 25, 2019 Filing 2 Motion to File Without Payment of Filing Fee, Waive Other Costs Owed, and Supporting Financial Affidavit by Plaintiffs Mary E. Henry, Andrew J. O'Connor. (cmadr, )
January 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Damages Pursuant to 42 U.S.C. 1201 et seq. against Attorney Regulation Counsel, Cynthia Coffman, Colorado Attorney General's Office, Colorado Secretary of State's Office, Colorado Supreme Court, Jason Dunn, Melody Mirbaba, Justin Moore, Suzanne Staiert, filed by Mary E. Henry, Andrew J. O'Connor.(cmadr, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: O'Connor et al v. Colorado Supreme Court et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Attorney Regulation Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colorado Attorney General's Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justin Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melody Mirbaba
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colorado Secretary of State's Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cynthia Coffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Dunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colorado Supreme Court
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Suzanne Staiert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary E. Henry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew J. O'Connor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?