USA v. All funds held in Partner Colorado Credit Union Bank account #124899-80, in the name of Acoma Property Partners, LLC et al
Plaintiff: USA
Defendant: $14,627.81 in U.S. currency located at 2609 Walnut Street, Denver, CO, All funds held in Partner Colorado Credit Union Bank account #115797-01, in the name of Christian Johnson, $14,065.76 in U.S. currency located at 7200 East Smith Road, Denver, CO, $14,863.91 in U.S. currency seized from Blue Line, that was held on behalf of 4125 North Elati Street, Denver, CO, $47,464.92 in U.S. currency seized from Blue Line, that was held on behalf of Tejon Property Partners, All funds held in partner Colorado Credit Union Bank account #115591-80, in the name of 4400 Holdings, LLC, All funds held in Partner Colorado Credit Union Bank account #114926-80, in the name of AJS Holdings LLC, $13,682.10 in U.S. currency seized from Blue Line, that was held on behalf of 468 South Federal, Denver, CO, All funds held in Partner Colorado Credit Union Bank account #127688-80, in the name of AJS CA MGMT LLC, $38.306.91 in U.S. currency seized from Blue Line, that was held on behalf of 15200 East 6th Avenue, Denver, CO, $25,189.10 in U.S. currency seized from Blue Line, that was held on behalf of 2647 West 38th Avenue, Denver, CO, $51,524.96 in U.S. currency located at 4400 East Evans Avenue, Denver, CO, $20,040.51 in U.S. currency seized from Blue Line, that was held on behalf of 7200 East Smith Road, Denver, CO, $25,944.52 in U.S. currency seized from Blue Line, that was held on behalf of 5100 West 38th Avenue, Denver, CO, $30,356.29 in U.S. currency seized from Blue Line, that was held on behalf of 9462 Federal Boulevard, Denver, CO, $18,162.73 in U.S. currency located at 2647 West 38th Avenue, Denver, CO, All funds held in Partner Colorado Credit Union Bank account #124902-80, in the name of Tejon Property Partners, LLC, $10,798.01 in U.S. currency located at 4125 North Elati Street, Denver, CO, $75,783.97 in U.S. currency seized from Blue Line, that was held on behalf of 4400 East Evans Avenue, Denver, CO, $25,540.73 in U.S. currency seized from Blue Line, that was held on behalf of 2609 Walnut Street, Denver, CO, $22,064.00 in U.S. currency located at 15200 east 6th Avenue, Denver, CO, All funds held in Partner Colorado Credit Union Bank account #115797-80, in the name of Christian Johnson, $14,215.01 in U.S. currency located at 5100 west 38th avenue, Denver, CO, $51,966.00 in U.S. currency located at 1475 S. Acoma Street, Denver, CO and All funds held in Partner Colorado Credit Union Bank account #124899-80, in the name of Acoma Property Partners, LLC
Claimant: The Receivers, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00223
Filed: January 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Robert E Blackburn
Referring Judge: R Brooke Jackson
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 25, 2019 Filing 10 CLAIM by Claimant The Receivers, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Trent, Julie)
February 26, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Complaint for Forfeiture by Plaintiff USA (Andrews, Tonya)
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 AMENDED ORDER FOR WARRANT for Arrest of Property In Rem by Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 2/20/19. (Attachments: #1 Amended Warrant for Arrest of Property In Rem) (dkals, )
February 15, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Amend/Correct/Modify #6 Order for Warrant for Arrest of Property by Plaintiff USA. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only), #2 Amended Warrant for Arrest of Property)(Andrews, Tonya)
February 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER FOR WARRANT FOR ARREST OF PROPERTY IN REM by Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 2/1/19. (Attachments: #1 Warrant for Arrest of Property In Rem) (dkals, )
January 28, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE re #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,,,, Notice of Errata by Plaintiff USA (Attachments: #1 Strikethrough Complaint, #2 Complaint)(Andrews, Tonya)
January 28, 2019 Filing 4 MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE by Senior Judge Blackburn. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge R. Brooke Jackson. All future pleadings should be designated as 19-cv-00223-RBJ. (athom, )
January 25, 2019 Filing 3 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (rvill, )
January 25, 2019 Filing 2 Case assigned to Judge Robert E. Blackburn and drawn to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. Text Only Entry. (rvill, )
January 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR FORFEITURE IN REM against $10,798.01 in U.S. currency located at 4125 North Elati Street, Denver, CO, $13,682.10 in U.S. currency seized from Blue Line, that was held on behalf of 468 South Federal, Denver, CO, $14,065.76 in U.S. currency located at 7200 East Smith Road, Denver, CO, $14,215.01 in U.S. currency located at 5100 west 38th avenue, Denver, CO, $14,627.81 in U.S. currency located at 2609 Walnut Street, Denver, CO, $14,863.91 in U.S. currency seized from Blue Line, that was held on behalf of 4125 North Elati Street, Denver, CO, $18,162.73 in U.S. currency located at 2647 West 38th Avenue, Denver, CO, $20,040.51 in U.S. currency seized from Blue Line, that was held on behalf of 7200 East Smith Road, Denver, CO, $22,064.00 in U.S. currency located at 15200 east 6th Avenue, Denver, CO, $25,189.10 in U.S. currency seized from Blue Line, that was held on behalf of 2647 West 38th Avenue, Denver, CO, $25,540.73 in U.S. currency seized from Blue Line, that was held on behalf of 2609 Walnut Street, Denver, CO, $25,944.52 in U.S. currency seized from Blue Line, that was held on behalf of 5100 West 38th Avenue, Denver, CO, $30,356.29 in U.S. currency seized from Blue Line, that was held on behalf of 9462 Federal Boulevard, Denver, CO, $38.306.91 in U.S. currency seized from Blue Line, that was held on behalf of 15200 East 6th Avenue, Denver, CO, $47,464.92 in U.S. currency seized from Blue Line, that was held on behalf of Tejon Property Partners, $51,524.96 in U.S. currency located at 4400 East Evans Avenue, Denver, CO, $51,966.00 in U.S. currency located at 1475 S. Acoma Street, Denver, CO, $75,783.97 in U.S. currency seized from Blue Line, that was held on behalf of 4400 East Evans Avenue, Denver, CO, All funds held in Partner Colorado Credit Union Bank account #114926-80, in the name of AJS Holdings LLC, All funds held in Partner Colorado Credit Union Bank account #115797-01, in the name of Christian Johnson, All funds held in Partner Colorado Credit Union Bank account #115797-80, in the name of Christian Johnson, All funds held in Partner Colorado Credit Union Bank account #124899-80, in the name of Acoma Property Partners, LLC, All funds held in Partner Colorado Credit Union Bank account #124902-80, in the name of Tejon Property Partners, LLC, All funds held in Partner Colorado Credit Union Bank account #127688-80, in the name of AJS CA MGMT LLC, All funds held in partner Colorado Credit Union Bank account #115591-80, in the name of 4400 Holdings, LLC Attorney Tonya Shotwell Andrews added to party USA(pty:pla), filed by USA. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only), #2 Warrant for Arrest of Property, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Andrews, Tonya)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA v. All funds held in Partner Colorado Credit Union Bank account #124899-80, in the name of Acoma Property Partners, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $14,627.81 in U.S. currency located at 2609 Walnut Street, Denver, CO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: All funds held in Partner Colorado Credit Union Bank account #115797-01, in the name of Christian Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $14,065.76 in U.S. currency located at 7200 East Smith Road, Denver, CO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $14,863.91 in U.S. currency seized from Blue Line, that was held on behalf of 4125 North Elati Street, Denver, CO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $47,464.92 in U.S. currency seized from Blue Line, that was held on behalf of Tejon Property Partners
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: All funds held in partner Colorado Credit Union Bank account #115591-80, in the name of 4400 Holdings, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: All funds held in Partner Colorado Credit Union Bank account #114926-80, in the name of AJS Holdings LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $13,682.10 in U.S. currency seized from Blue Line, that was held on behalf of 468 South Federal, Denver, CO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: All funds held in Partner Colorado Credit Union Bank account #127688-80, in the name of AJS CA MGMT LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $38.306.91 in U.S. currency seized from Blue Line, that was held on behalf of 15200 East 6th Avenue, Denver, CO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $25,189.10 in U.S. currency seized from Blue Line, that was held on behalf of 2647 West 38th Avenue, Denver, CO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $51,524.96 in U.S. currency located at 4400 East Evans Avenue, Denver, CO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $20,040.51 in U.S. currency seized from Blue Line, that was held on behalf of 7200 East Smith Road, Denver, CO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $25,944.52 in U.S. currency seized from Blue Line, that was held on behalf of 5100 West 38th Avenue, Denver, CO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $30,356.29 in U.S. currency seized from Blue Line, that was held on behalf of 9462 Federal Boulevard, Denver, CO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $18,162.73 in U.S. currency located at 2647 West 38th Avenue, Denver, CO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: All funds held in Partner Colorado Credit Union Bank account #124902-80, in the name of Tejon Property Partners, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $10,798.01 in U.S. currency located at 4125 North Elati Street, Denver, CO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $75,783.97 in U.S. currency seized from Blue Line, that was held on behalf of 4400 East Evans Avenue, Denver, CO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $25,540.73 in U.S. currency seized from Blue Line, that was held on behalf of 2609 Walnut Street, Denver, CO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $22,064.00 in U.S. currency located at 15200 east 6th Avenue, Denver, CO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: All funds held in Partner Colorado Credit Union Bank account #115797-80, in the name of Christian Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $14,215.01 in U.S. currency located at 5100 west 38th avenue, Denver, CO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $51,966.00 in U.S. currency located at 1475 S. Acoma Street, Denver, CO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: All funds held in Partner Colorado Credit Union Bank account #124899-80, in the name of Acoma Property Partners, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: USA
Represented By: Tonya Shotwell Andrews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: The Receivers, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?