USA v. $32,000.00 in United States currency
Plaintiff: USA
Defendant: $32,000.00 in United States currency
Claimant: Robert Deane
Case Number: 1:2019cv00304
Filed: February 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Wiley Y Daniel
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 11, 2019 Filing 10 DOCKETING ERROR CLAIM by Claimant Robert Deane. (Saint-Veltri, Joseph) (Modified on 3/11/2019 DUPLICATE of document #8 , Docketing Error)(evana, ).
March 11, 2019 Filing 9 DOCKETING ERROR NOTICE of Entry of Appearance for Claimant Robert Deane by Joseph Saint-Veltri on behalf of Robert Deane (Saint-Veltri, Joseph) (Modified on 3/11/2019 DUPLICATE of document #7 , Docketing Error)(evana, ).
March 11, 2019 Filing 8 CLAIM by Claimant Robert Deane. (Saint-Veltri, Joseph)
March 11, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Joseph Saint-Veltri on behalf of Robert DeaneAttorney Joseph Saint-Veltri added to party Robert Deane(pty:clm) (Saint-Veltri, Joseph)
February 6, 2019 Filing 6 WARRANT FOR ARREST OF PROPERTY IN REM issued (evana, )
February 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER FOR WARRANT for Arrest of Property IN REM, by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 2/5/2019. (evana, ) Modified on 2/6/2019 to reflect date of 2/5/2019 (rkeec).
February 5, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Complaint for Forfeiture by Plaintiff USA (Young, Elizabeth)
February 4, 2019 Filing 3 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (dbera, )
February 4, 2019 Filing 2 Case assigned to Judge Wiley Y. Daniel and drawn to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Text Only Entry (dbera, )
February 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR FORFEITURE IN REM against $32,000.00 in United States currency Attorney Elizabeth Jane Young added to party USA(pty:pla), filed by USA. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only), #2 Warrant for Arrest of Property, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Young, Elizabeth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA v. $32,000.00 in United States currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $32,000.00 in United States currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: USA
Represented By: Elizabeth Jane Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Robert Deane
Represented By: Joseph Saint-Veltri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?