Abbondanza v. Weiss et al
Plaintiff: michael abbondanza and Tavin Foods, Inc.
Defendant: Brett Norman Huff, Huff & Leslie, LLP, Weiss Law Group, P.A., Peter Seth Leiner, Richard W. Leslie, Jason Stuart Weiss, Brett Huff, Weiss Law Group, PC, Jason Weiss, Peter Leiner, Giovania Paloni and Richard Leslie
Case Number: 1:2019cv00328
Filed: February 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Richard P Matsch
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1961
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 29, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Maral Shoaei on behalf of Brett Huff, Huff & Leslie, LLP, Richard LeslieAttorney Maral Shoaei added to party Brett Huff(pty:dft), Attorney Maral Shoaei added to party Huff & Leslie, LLP(pty:dft), Attorney Maral Shoaei added to party Richard Leslie(pty:dft) (Shoaei, Maral)
March 29, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Franz Hardy on behalf of Brett Huff, Huff & Leslie, LLP, Richard LeslieAttorney Franz Hardy added to party Brett Huff(pty:dft), Attorney Franz Hardy added to party Huff & Leslie, LLP(pty:dft), Attorney Franz Hardy added to party Richard Leslie(pty:dft) (Hardy, Franz)
March 16, 2019 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Michael Abbondanza, Tavin Foods, Inc.. Richard Leslie waiver sent on 2/14/2019, answer due 4/15/2019. (Patterson, Courtenay)
March 13, 2019 Filing 10 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiff Michael Abbondanza All parties do not consent.. (Patterson, Courtenay)
March 6, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Courtenay Leigh Patterson on behalf of Tavin Foods, Inc.Attorney Courtenay Leigh Patterson added to party Tavin Foods, Inc.(pty:pla) (Patterson, Courtenay)
February 28, 2019 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 15(a)(1)(A) against Brett Huff, Huff & Leslie, LLP, Peter Leiner, Richard Leslie, Giovania Paloni, Jason Weiss, Weiss Law Group, PC, filed by Michael Abbondanza. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Amended Complaint)(Patterson, Courtenay)
February 19, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Michael Lloyd Hutchinson on behalf of Peter Leiner, Jason Weiss, Weiss Law Group, PCAttorney Michael Lloyd Hutchinson added to party Peter Leiner(pty:dft), Attorney Michael Lloyd Hutchinson added to party Jason Weiss(pty:dft), Attorney Michael Lloyd Hutchinson added to party Weiss Law Group, PC(pty:dft) (Hutchinson, Michael)
February 19, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Michael Abbondanza. Peter Leiner waiver sent on 2/17/2019, answer due 4/18/2019; Jason Weiss waiver sent on 2/17/2019, answer due 4/18/2019; Weiss Law Group, PC waiver sent on 2/17/2019, answer due 4/18/2019. (Patterson, Courtenay)
February 14, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Michael Abbondanza. Brett Huff waiver sent on 2/12/2019, answer due 4/15/2019; Huff & Leslie, LLP waiver sent on 2/12/2019, answer due 4/15/2019. (Patterson, Courtenay)
February 8, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE re #1 Complaint,, Civil Case Cover Sheet by Plaintiff Michael Abbondanza (Patterson, Courtenay)
February 7, 2019 Filing 3 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (dbera, )
February 7, 2019 Filing 2 Case assigned to Judge Richard P. Matsch and drawn to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Text Only Entry (dbera, )
February 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Brett Norman Huff, Huff & Leslie, LLP, Peter Seth Leiner, Richard W. Leslie, Jason Stuart Weiss, Weiss Law Group, P.A. (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6523829)Attorney Courtenay Leigh Patterson added to party michael abbondanza(pty:pla), filed by michael abbondanza. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit, #16 Exhibit, #17 Exhibit, #18 Exhibit, #19 Exhibit)(Patterson, Courtenay)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Abbondanza v. Weiss et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brett Norman Huff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Huff & Leslie, LLP
Represented By: Franz Hardy
Represented By: Maral Shoaei
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Weiss Law Group, P.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter Seth Leiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard W. Leslie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Stuart Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brett Huff
Represented By: Franz Hardy
Represented By: Maral Shoaei
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Weiss Law Group, PC
Represented By: Michael Lloyd Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Weiss
Represented By: Michael Lloyd Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter Leiner
Represented By: Michael Lloyd Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Giovania Paloni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Leslie
Represented By: Franz Hardy
Represented By: Maral Shoaei
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: michael abbondanza
Represented By: Courtenay Leigh Patterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tavin Foods, Inc.
Represented By: Courtenay Leigh Patterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?