Williams v. Attorney General of the State of Colorado et al
Plaintiff: Tommy Williams
Defendant: Parole/Probation Office El Paso County, John Timmins, 4th Judicial District Probation Department and Attorney General of the State of Colorado
Respondent: State of Colorado, McHenry and Fourth Judicial District Court, The
Case Number: 1:2019cv00345
Filed: February 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Gordon P Gallagher
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Second ORDER Directing Applicant to File Amended Pleading. If Applicant fails within the time allowed to file an amended pleading on the appropriate Court approved form that complies with this order, the action will be dismissed without further notice, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 3/27/2019. (angar, )
February 28, 2019 Filing 7 AMENDED APPLICATION for Writ of Habeas Corpus Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2254, filed by Tommy Williams, Fourth Judicial District Court, The.(angar, )
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER. Plaintiff is reminded that he has until March 13, 2019, to file an amended complaint or an application for a writ of habeas corpus as directed in the Court's February 11, 2019, order. Plaintiff also is reminded that if he fails to file an amended complaint or an application for a writ of habeas corpus as directed by the Court within the time allowed, the action will be dismissed without further notice, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 2/19/2019. (angar, )
February 11, 2019 Filing 5 AMENDED DECLARATION in support of Petitioner's Writ of Habeas Corpus #1 by Plaintiff Tommy Williams. (evana, )
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS AND DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT. That Plaintiff file, within thirty (30) days from the date of this order, an amended complaint as directed in this order. That, if Plaintiff fails to file an amended complaint that complies with this order within the time allowed, the action will be dismissed without further notice. that the Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs (Long Form) (ECF No. #3 ) is granted, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 2/11/2019. (evana, )
February 8, 2019 Filing 3 Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs. by Plaintiff Tommy Williams. (rroge, )
February 8, 2019 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. Text Only Entry. (rroge, )
February 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against 4th Judicial District Probation Department, Attorney General of the State of Colorado, Parole/Probation Office El Paso County, John Timmins, filed by Tommy Williams. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(rroge, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Attorney General of the State of Colorado et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tommy Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Parole/Probation Office El Paso County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Timmins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 4th Judicial District Probation Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Attorney General of the State of Colorado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: State of Colorado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: McHenry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Fourth Judicial District Court, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?