Hanover Insurance Company v. Burnett Custom Builders, Inc.
Plaintiff: Hanover Insurance Company
Defendant: Burnett Custom Builders, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00346
Filed: February 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Kristen L Mix
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28:1332t
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 15, 2019 Filing 9 Civil Case Terminated pursuant to the notice of dismissal or stipulation to dismiss filed in this case Text Only Entry (lgale, )
March 15, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Case Without Prejudice by Plaintiff Hanover Insurance Company (Kushnir, Vladislav)
February 20, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS issued by Clerk to Burnett Custom Builders, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (nmarb, )
February 18, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS REQUEST as to BURNETT CUSTOM BUILDERS, INC. by Plaintiff Hanover Insurance Company. (Kushnir, Vladislav)
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING/PLANNING CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 2/11/19. Scheduling Conference set for 5/23/2019 10:30 AM in Courtroom A401 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1, #2 Attachment 2) (lgale, )
February 11, 2019 Filing 4 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. No Summons Issued. (rvill, )
February 9, 2019 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. Text Only Entry. (rvill, )
February 9, 2019 Filing 2 ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES re: #1 Complaint filed by attorney Vladislav Kushnir. Attorney has used an incorrect signature format in violation of D.C.COLO.LCivR 5.1(a) and 4.3(a) of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases). DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. In the future, the filer must affix an electronic s/signature and s/followed by a typed, not an inked, signature to all future documents.(Text Only Entry) (rvill, )
February 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BURNETT CUSTOM BUILDERS, INC. (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6526270), filed by HANOVER INSURANCE COMPANY.(Kushnir, Vladislav)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hanover Insurance Company v. Burnett Custom Builders, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Burnett Custom Builders, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hanover Insurance Company
Represented By: Vladislav Kushnir
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?