Metropolitan Transportation Authority v. Molson Coors Brewing Company et al
Plaintiff: Gene Segalis, Manhattan and Bronx Surface Transit Operating Authority Pension Plan and Metropolitan Transportation Authority Defined Benefit Pension Plan Master Trust
Defendant: Molson Coors Brewing Company, Tracey I Joubert, Mark R Hunter, Douglas D. Tough, Andrew T. Molson, Charles M. Herington, Franklin W. Hobbs, Louis Vachon, H. Sanford Riley, Geoffrey E. Molson, Mary Lynn Ferguson-McHugh, Betty K. Devita, Peter J. Coors, Iain J.G. Napier, Roger G. Eaton and Peter H. Coors
Petitioner: Iron Workers Local 580 Joint Funds, Electrical Workers Pension Fund, Local 103 I.B.E.W. and George Murr
Consolidated Plaintiff: Larry Sussberg
Case Number: 1:2019cv00455
Filed: February 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: David M Ebel
Referring Judge: Michael E Hegarty
Nature of Suit: Securities, Commodities, Exchange
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 23, 2020 Filing 77 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint by Defendants Peter J. Coors, Peter H. Coors, Betty K. Devita, Roger G. Eaton, Mary Lynn Ferguson-McHugh, Charles M. Herington, Franklin W. Hobbs, Mark R Hunter, Tracey I Joubert, Andrew T. Molson, Geoffrey E. Molson, Molson Coors Brewing Company, Iain J.G. Napier, H. Sanford Riley, Douglas D. Tough, Louis Vachon. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R, #19 Exhibit S, #20 Exhibit T, #21 Exhibit U, #22 Exhibit V, #23 Exhibit W)(Jacobsen, Joni)
January 23, 2020 Filing 76 NOTICE OF CORPORATE DEFENDANT NAME CHANGE by Defendant Molson Coors Brewing Company (Jacobsen, Joni)
January 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER Granting #74 Unopposed Motion to Exceed Page Limit for Brief in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. Defendants may file a brief up to twenty-five (25) pages in length. By Judge David M. Ebel on 01/10/2020. (athom, )
January 9, 2020 Filing 74 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Defendants Peter J. Coors, Peter H. Coors, Betty K. Devita, Roger G. Eaton, Mary Lynn Ferguson-McHugh, Charles M. Herington, Franklin W. Hobbs, Mark R Hunter, Tracey I Joubert, Andrew T. Molson, Geoffrey E. Molson, Molson Coors Brewing Company, Iain J.G. Napier, H. Sanford Riley, Douglas D. Tough, Louis Vachon. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Kistenbroker, David)
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 73 MINUTE ORDER granting #70 Motion for Order to Set Schedule Regarding Responsive Briefing of New Defendants, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 12/19/2019.(tsher, )
December 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 72 MEMORANDUM regarding #70 Joint MOTION for Order to Set Schedule Regarding Responsive Briefing of New Defendants filed by H. Sanford Riley, Peter H. Coors, Mary Lynn Ferguson-McHugh, Iain J.G. Napier, Roger G. Eaton, Tracey I Joubert, Louis Vachon, Franklin W. Hobbs, Geoffrey E. Molson, Douglas D. Tough, Molson Coors Brewing Company, Charles M. Herington, Peter J. Coors, Betty K. Devita, Andrew T. Molson, Mark R Hunter. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. By Judge David M. Ebel on 12/18/2019. Text Only Entry (athom, )
December 18, 2019 Filing 71 ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES: re: #70 Joint MOTION for Order to Set Schedule Regarding Responsive Briefing of New Defendants filed by attorney David H. Kistenbroker. The s/signature did not match the filers name on the account for which the login and password are registered. DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. Action to take - future documents must be filed pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 5.1(a) and 4.3(c) of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases). (Text Only Entry) (athom, )
December 18, 2019 Filing 70 Joint MOTION for Order to Set Schedule Regarding Responsive Briefing of New Defendants by Defendants Peter J. Coors, Peter H. Coors, Betty K. Devita, Roger G. Eaton, Mary Lynn Ferguson-McHugh, Charles M. Herington, Franklin W. Hobbs, Mark R Hunter, Tracey I Joubert, Andrew T. Molson, Geoffrey E. Molson, Molson Coors Brewing Company, Iain J.G. Napier, H. Sanford Riley, Douglas D. Tough, Louis Vachon. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jacobsen, Joni)
December 18, 2019 Filing 69 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Joni Sue Jacobsen on behalf of Peter J. Coors, Peter H. Coors, Betty K. Devita, Roger G. Eaton, Mary Lynn Ferguson-McHugh, Charles M. Herington, Franklin W. Hobbs, Andrew T. Molson, Geoffrey E. Molson, Iain J.G. Napier, H. Sanford Riley, Douglas D. Tough, Louis VachonAttorney Joni Sue Jacobsen added to party Peter J. Coors(pty:dft), Attorney Joni Sue Jacobsen added to party Peter H. Coors(pty:dft), Attorney Joni Sue Jacobsen added to party Betty K. Devita(pty:dft), Attorney Joni Sue Jacobsen added to party Roger G. Eaton(pty:dft), Attorney Joni Sue Jacobsen added to party Mary Lynn Ferguson-McHugh(pty:dft), Attorney Joni Sue Jacobsen added to party Charles M. Herington(pty:dft), Attorney Joni Sue Jacobsen added to party Franklin W. Hobbs(pty:dft), Attorney Joni Sue Jacobsen added to party Andrew T. Molson(pty:dft), Attorney Joni Sue Jacobsen added to party Geoffrey E. Molson(pty:dft), Attorney Joni Sue Jacobsen added to party Iain J.G. Napier(pty:dft), Attorney Joni Sue Jacobsen added to party H. Sanford Riley(pty:dft), Attorney Joni Sue Jacobsen added to party Douglas D. Tough(pty:dft), Attorney Joni Sue Jacobsen added to party Louis Vachon(pty:dft) (Jacobsen, Joni)
December 18, 2019 Filing 68 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Angela Marie Liu on behalf of All Defendants Attorney Angela Marie Liu added to party Peter J. Coors(pty:dft), Attorney Angela Marie Liu added to party Peter H. Coors(pty:dft), Attorney Angela Marie Liu added to party Betty K. Devita(pty:dft), Attorney Angela Marie Liu added to party Roger G. Eaton(pty:dft), Attorney Angela Marie Liu added to party Mary Lynn Ferguson-McHugh(pty:dft), Attorney Angela Marie Liu added to party Charles M. Herington(pty:dft), Attorney Angela Marie Liu added to party Franklin W. Hobbs(pty:dft), Attorney Angela Marie Liu added to party Mark R Hunter(pty:dft), Attorney Angela Marie Liu added to party Tracey I Joubert(pty:dft), Attorney Angela Marie Liu added to party Andrew T. Molson(pty:dft), Attorney Angela Marie Liu added to party Geoffrey E. Molson(pty:dft), Attorney Angela Marie Liu added to party Molson Coors Brewing Company(pty:dft), Attorney Angela Marie Liu added to party Iain J.G. Napier(pty:dft), Attorney Angela Marie Liu added to party H. Sanford Riley(pty:dft), Attorney Angela Marie Liu added to party Douglas D. Tough(pty:dft), Attorney Angela Marie Liu added to party Louis Vachon(pty:dft) (Liu, Angela)
December 18, 2019 Filing 67 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by David H. Kistenbroker on behalf of Peter J. Coors, Peter H. Coors, Betty K. Devita, Roger G. Eaton, Mary Lynn Ferguson-McHugh, Charles M. Herington, Franklin W. Hobbs, Andrew T. Molson, Geoffrey E. Molson, Iain J.G. Napier, H. Sanford Riley, Douglas D. Tough, Louis VachonAttorney David H. Kistenbroker added to party Peter J. Coors(pty:dft), Attorney David H. Kistenbroker added to party Peter H. Coors(pty:dft), Attorney David H. Kistenbroker added to party Betty K. Devita(pty:dft), Attorney David H. Kistenbroker added to party Roger G. Eaton(pty:dft), Attorney David H. Kistenbroker added to party Mary Lynn Ferguson-McHugh(pty:dft), Attorney David H. Kistenbroker added to party Charles M. Herington(pty:dft), Attorney David H. Kistenbroker added to party Franklin W. Hobbs(pty:dft), Attorney David H. Kistenbroker added to party Andrew T. Molson(pty:dft), Attorney David H. Kistenbroker added to party Geoffrey E. Molson(pty:dft), Attorney David H. Kistenbroker added to party Iain J.G. Napier(pty:dft), Attorney David H. Kistenbroker added to party H. Sanford Riley(pty:dft), Attorney David H. Kistenbroker added to party Douglas D. Tough(pty:dft), Attorney David H. Kistenbroker added to party Louis Vachon(pty:dft) (Kistenbroker, David)
December 10, 2019 Filing 66 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (athom, )
December 10, 2019 Filing 65 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Peter J. Coors, Peter H. Coors, Betty K. Devita, Does 1-10, inclusive, Roger G. Eaton, Mary Lynn Ferguson-McHugh, Charles M. Herington, Franklin W. Hobbs, Mark R Hunter, Tracey I Joubert, Andrew T. Molson, Geoffrey E. Molson, Molson Coors Brewing Company, Iain J.G. Napier, H. Sanford Riley, Douglas D. Tough, Louis Vachon, filed by Metropolitan Transportation Authority, Manhattan and Bronx Surface Transit Operating Authority.(Manifold, Betsy)
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER re: #62 Amended Complaint. For purposes of the Amended Complaint only, Plaintiffs shall refile it to include the entire caption. By Judge David M. Ebel on 12/10/2019. (athom, )
December 9, 2019 Filing 63 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Peter H. Coors, Peter J. Coors, Betty K. Devita, Mary Lynn Ferguson-McHugh, Franklin W. Hobbs, Andrew T. Molson, Geoffrey E. Molson, Iain J.G. Napier, Douglas D. Tough, Louis Vachon, Roger G. Eaton, Charles M. Herington, H. Sanford Riley, and Does 1 though 10, inclusive re #62 Amended Complaint, by Interested Party Manhattan and Bronx Surface Transit Operating Authority, Plaintiff Metropolitan Transportation Authority. (Manifold, Betsy)
December 9, 2019 Filing 62 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Mark R Hunter, Tracey I Joubert, Molson Coors Brewing Company, Peter H. Coors, Peter J. Coors, Betty K. Devita, Mary Lynn Ferguson-McHugh, Franklin W. Hobbs, Andrew T. Molson, Geoffrey E. Molson, Iain J.G. Napier, Douglas D. Tough, Louis Vachon, Roger G. Eaton, Charles M. Herington, H. Sanford Riley, Does 1-10, inclusive, filed by Metropolitan Transportation Authority, Manhattan and Bronx Surface Transit Operating Authority.(Manifold, Betsy)
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 61 MINUTE ORDER granting #59 Motion for Order to Set Schedule Regarding the Filing of Amended Complaint and Responsive Briefing, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 10/22/2019.(tsher, )
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 60 MEMORANDUM regarding #59 Joint MOTION for Order to Set Schedule Regarding the Filing of Amended Complaint and Responsive Briefing filed by Metropolitan Transportation Authority, Manhattan and Bronx Surface Transit Operating Authority. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty by Judge David M. Ebel on 10/15/2019. Text Only Entry (angar, )
October 11, 2019 Filing 59 Joint MOTION for Order to Set Schedule Regarding the Filing of Amended Complaint and Responsive Briefing by Interested Party Manhattan and Bronx Surface Transit Operating Authority, Plaintiff Metropolitan Transportation Authority. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Manifold, Betsy)
October 11, 2019 Filing 58 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Marisa C. Livesay on behalf of Manhattan and Bronx Surface Transit Operating Authority, Metropolitan Transportation AuthorityAttorney Marisa C. Livesay added to party Manhattan and Bronx Surface Transit Operating Authority(pty:ip), Attorney Marisa C. Livesay added to party Metropolitan Transportation Authority(pty:pla) (Livesay, Marisa)
October 11, 2019 Filing 57 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Betsy C. Manifold on behalf of Manhattan and Bronx Surface Transit Operating Authority, Metropolitan Transportation AuthorityAttorney Betsy C. Manifold added to party Manhattan and Bronx Surface Transit Operating Authority(pty:ip), Attorney Betsy C. Manifold added to party Metropolitan Transportation Authority(pty:pla) (Manifold, Betsy)
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER granting #15 MOTION to Consolidate Cases, Motion for Appointment of Lead Plaintiff, MOTION to Appoint Counsel and denying as moot #20 Motion to Appoint Counsel As Lead Counsel, Motion for Appointment As Lead Plaintiff, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 10/3/2019. (tsher, )
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER Granting the Motion of Iron Workers Local 580 Joint Funds for Consolidating Related Actions (Doc. #20 ). The Motion is GRANTED in part as it pertains to consolidation of related actions. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 42(a), the above-captioned action and Sussberg v. Molson Coors Brewing Company, 1:19-cv-514 are consolidated. The files of the consolidated action shall be maintained in one file under Civil Action No. 1:19-cv-00455-DME-MEH. The remaining matters included in the Motion, pertaining to appointment of lead plaintiff and approval of selection of counsel, remain referred to Magistrate Judge Hegarty and will be ruled upon soon. By Judge David M. Ebel on 10/02/2019. (athom, )
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER Granting the Motion of MTA Funds for Consolidation of Related Actions (Doc. #15 ). The Motion is GRANTED in part as it pertains to (1) consolidation of related actions. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 42(a), the above-captioned action and Sussberg v. Molson Coors Brewing Company, 1:19-cv-514 are consolidated. The files of the consolidated action shall be maintained in one file under Civil Action No. 1:19-cv-00455-DME-MEH. The remaining matters included in the Motion, pertaining to (2) appointment of lead plaintiff and (3) approval of selection of counsel, remain referred to Magistrate Judge Hegarty and will be ruled upon soon. By Judge David M. Ebel on 10/02/2019. (athom, )
September 2, 2019 Filing 53 ADVISORY NOTICE TO ATTORNEY AND COURT: Under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3(a), GUILLAUME BUELL was administratively removed from the court's attorney roll and barred from filing electronically under CM/ECF for failing to pay the 2018 Biennial Fee by January 31, 2019. Counsel must complete a Bar/ECF application through counsel's Attorney Services Portal account and pay the full application fee to be restored to the attorney roll and CM/ECF. (Text Only Entry) (mfred)
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 52 MINUTE ORDER re: #50 Letter, filed by Metropolitan Transportation Authority, Manhattan and Bronx Surface Transit Operating Authority by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 8/29/2019. The Clerk of the Court is ordered to strike MTA Funds 8/8/2019 letter from the docket. (tsher, )
August 28, 2019 Filing 51 ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES: re: #50 Letter, filed by attorney Matthew M. Guiney. The document is incorrectly formatted. DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. Action to take - future documents must be filed pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 10.1 and (e) Spacing. All pleadings and documents shall be double spaced. (Text Only Entry) (evana, )
August 28, 2019 Filing 50 STRICKEN LETTER re: #37 Response to Motion, #45 Reply to Response to Motion,, #44 Reply to Response to Motion,, by Interested Parties Manhattan and Bronx Surface Transit Operating Authority, Metropolitan Transportation Authority. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Spreadsheet, #2 Exhibit B - 19-00754 Memorandum)(Cody-Hopkins, Karen) Modified on 8/29/2019 pursuant to #52 Minute ORder (tsher, ).
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 49 MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice #18 Motion by Electrical Workers Pension Fund, Local 103 I.B.E.W. for Consolidation, Appointment as Lead Plaintiff, and Approval of Lead Counsel, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 8/20/2019. In light of the Notice of Withdraw[al] of Motion for Appointment of Lead Plaintiff #22 , the motion is withdrawn.(tsher, )
August 19, 2019 Filing 48 NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION TO THE MOTIONS TO CONSOLIDATE by Defendants Mark R Hunter, Tracey I Joubert, Molson Coors Brewing Company (Jacobsen, Joni)
May 28, 2019 Filing 47 TRANSCRIPT of Status Conference held on April 17, 2019 before Magistrate Judge Hegarty. Pages: 1-14. NOTICE - REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Within seven calendar days of this filing, each party shall inform the Court, by filing a Notice of Intent to Redact, of the party's intent to redact personal identifiers from the electronic transcript of the court proceeding. If a Notice of Intent to Redact is not filed within the allotted time, this transcript will be made electronically available after 90 days. Please see the Notice of Electronic Availability of Transcripts document at www.cod.uscourts.gov. Transcript may only be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber prior to the 90 day deadline for electronic posting on PACER. (Patterson Transcription Company, )
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 46 MINUTE ORDER granting #42 Stipulation for Extension of Time for Movants to Reply to Competing Motions for Consolidation of the Related Actions; Appointment as Lead Plaintiff; and Approval of Counsel, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 05/23/2019. The parties may reply to the competing motions on or before 5/23/2019. (mdave, )
May 23, 2019 Filing 45 REPLY to Response to #20 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:19-cv-00455; 1:19-cv-00514 MOTION to Appoint Counsel As Lead Counsel MOTION for Appointment As Lead Plaintiff, #15 MOTION to Consolidate Cases MOTION for Appointment of Lead Plaintiff MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Interested Parties Manhattan and Bronx Surface Transit Operating Authority, Metropolitan Transportation Authority. (Cody-Hopkins, Karen) Modified on 5/24/2019 to correct format (jgonz, ).
May 23, 2019 Filing 44 REPLY to Response to #20 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:19-cv-00455; 1:19-cv-00514 MOTION to Appoint Counsel As Lead Counsel MOTION for Appointment As Lead Plaintiff, #15 MOTION to Consolidate Cases MOTION for Appointment of Lead Plaintiff MOTION to Appoint Counsel REPLY MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES (1) IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF MOTION OF IRON WORKERS LOCAL 580 JOINT FUNDS FOR CONSOLIDATION, APPOINTMENT AS LEAD PLAINTIFF AND APPROVAL OF COUNSEL, AND (2) IN OPPOSITION TO COMPETING MOTION filed by Movant Iron Workers Local 580 Joint Funds. (Lieberman, Jeremy)
May 22, 2019 Filing 43 MEMORANDUM regarding #42 STIPULATION for Extension of Time filed by Metropolitan Transportation Authority, and Manhattan and Bronx Surface Transit Operating Authority. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty by Judge David M. Ebel on 5/22/2019. Text Only Entry. (agarc, )
May 22, 2019 Filing 42 STIPULATION for Extension of Time - Joint Stipulation for Extension of Time for Movants to Reply to Competing Motions by Interested Parties Manhattan and Bronx Surface Transit Operating Authority, Metropolitan Transportation Authority. (Calcaterra, Regina)
May 15, 2019 Filing 41 MEMORANDUM regarding #20 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:19-cv-00455; 1:19- cv-00514 MOTION to Appoint Counsel As Lead Counsel MOTION for Appointment As Lead Plaintiff filed by Iron Workers Local 580 Joint Funds. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty, by Judge David M. Ebel on 5/15/2019. Text Only Entry (evana, )
May 15, 2019 Filing 40 MEMORANDUM regarding #18 MOTION to Consolidate Cases MOTION to Appoint Counsel MOTION for Appointment of Lead Plaintiff filed by Electrical Workers Pension Fund, Local 103 I.B.E.W.. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty, by Judge David M. Ebel on 5/15/2019. Text Only Entry (evana, )
May 15, 2019 Filing 39 MEMORANDUM regarding #15 MOTION to Consolidate Cases MOTION for Appointment of Lead Plaintiff MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Metropolitan Transportation Authority, Manhattan and Bronx Surface Transit Operating Authority. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty, by Judge David M. Ebel on 5/15/2019. Text Only Entry (evana, )
May 15, 2019 Filing 38 MEMORANDUM regarding #16 MOTION to Appoint Counsel, Appoint Lead Plaintiff MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Gene Segalis. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty, by Judge David M. Ebel on 5/15/2019. Text Only Entry (evana, )
May 8, 2019 Filing 37 RESPONSE to #20 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:19-cv-00455; 1:19-cv-00514 MOTION to Appoint Counsel As Lead Counsel MOTION for Appointment As Lead Plaintiff -- Memorandum of Points and Authorities (1) in Further Support of Motion of Iron Workers Local 580 Joint Funds for Consolidation, Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Counsel, and (2) in Opposition to Competing Motions filed by Movant Iron Workers Local 580 Joint Funds. (Lieberman, Jeremy)
May 8, 2019 Filing 36 RESPONSE to #20 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:19-cv-00455; 1:19-cv-00514 MOTION to Appoint Counsel As Lead Counsel MOTION for Appointment As Lead Plaintiff, #15 MOTION to Consolidate Cases MOTION for Appointment of Lead Plaintiff MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Interested Parties Manhattan and Bronx Surface Transit Operating Authority, Metropolitan Transportation Authority. (Cody-Hopkins, Karen)
May 8, 2019 Filing 35 TRANSCRIPT of TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 04/17/2019 before Magistrate Judge Hegarty. Pages: 1-15. Prepared by: AB Court Reporting & Video, Inc.. NOTICE - REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Within seven calendar days of this filing, each party shall inform the Court, by filing a Notice of Intent to Redact, of the party's intent to redact personal identifiers from the electronic transcript of the court proceeding. If a Notice of Intent to Redact is not filed within the allotted time, this transcript will be made electronically available after 90 days. Please see the Notice of Electronic Availability of Transcripts document at www.cod.uscourts.gov. Transcript may only be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber prior to the 90 day deadline for electronic posting on PACER. (AB Court Reporting & Video, Inc., )
May 7, 2019 Filing 34 ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES: re: #33 Response to Motion, #32 Notice of Entry of Appearance filed by attorneyGuillaume Buell. DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. Action to take - counsel must submit a change of contact request through the, Attorney Services Portal Account pursuant to D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(c) and 3.5 of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases). (Text Only Entry) (evana, )
May 7, 2019 Filing 33 RESPONSE to #18 MOTION to Consolidate Cases MOTION to Appoint Counsel MOTION for Appointment of Lead Plaintiff, #15 MOTION to Consolidate Cases MOTION for Appointment of Lead Plaintiff MOTION to Appoint Counsel Notice of Non-Opposition filed by Movant Electrical Workers Pension Fund, Local 103 I.B.E.W.. (Buell, Guillaume)
May 7, 2019 Filing 32 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Guillaume Buell on behalf of Electrical Workers Pension Fund, Local 103 I.B.E.W.Attorney Guillaume Buell added to party Electrical Workers Pension Fund, Local 103 I.B.E.W.(pty:mov) (Buell, Guillaume)
May 2, 2019 Filing 31 COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty: Status Conference held on 5/2/2019. FTR: Courtroom A501. (mdave, )
May 1, 2019 Filing 30 Party George Murr terminated., Motions terminated: #19 MOTION to Consolidate Cases MOTION for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Lead Plaintiff's Selection of Counsel filed by George Murr. Pursuant to the filing of the #29 Notice of Withdrawal of #19 Motion (evana, ) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
May 1, 2019 Filing 29 NOTICE of Withdrawal of #19 MOTION to Consolidate Cases and MOTION for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Lead Plaintiff's Selection of Counsel and Withdrawal of Lead Plaintiff Motion by Movant George Murr (Glenn, Rusty)
April 25, 2019 Filing 28 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Matthew M. Guiney on behalf of Manhattan and Bronx Surface Transit Operating Authority, Metropolitan Transportation AuthorityAttorney Matthew M. Guiney added to party Manhattan and Bronx Surface Transit Operating Authority(pty:ip), Attorney Matthew M. Guiney added to party Metropolitan Transportation Authority(pty:ip) (Guiney, Matthew)
April 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 04/25/2019. The Status Conference set for 5/2/2019 will now commence at 09:45 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. All parties may appear by telephone. (mdave, )
April 19, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Regina Marie Calcaterra on behalf of Manhattan and Bronx Surface Transit Operating Authority, Metropolitan Transportation AuthorityAttorney Regina Marie Calcaterra added to party Manhattan and Bronx Surface Transit Operating Authority(pty:ip), Attorney Regina Marie Calcaterra added to party Metropolitan Transportation Authority(pty:ip) (Calcaterra, Regina)
April 19, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Kevin Gilbert Cooper on behalf of Manhattan and Bronx Surface Transit Operating Authority, Metropolitan Transportation AuthorityAttorney Kevin Gilbert Cooper added to party Manhattan and Bronx Surface Transit Operating Authority(pty:ip), Attorney Kevin Gilbert Cooper added to party Metropolitan Transportation Authority(pty:ip) (Cooper, Kevin)
April 17, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Joseph Alexander Hood, II on behalf of Iron Workers Local 580 Joint FundsAttorney Joseph Alexander Hood, II added to party Iron Workers Local 580 Joint Funds(pty:mov) (Hood, Joseph)
April 17, 2019 Filing 23 COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Status Conference held on 4/17/2019 Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 5/2/2019 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. All parties may appear by telephone. ORDERED: In the event that the parties reach an agreement as to consolidation and a lead party, Regina Calcaterra shall call Chambers prior to 5/2/2019 to cancel the Status Conference. If there is still a dispute among the parties and there are more than one Motion to Consolidate Cases pending, the Status Conference will occur. ORDERED: Plaintiff's counsel, Jacob Walker, is excused from the Status Conference. FTR: Courtroom A501. (mdave, )
April 17, 2019 Filing 22 RESPONSE to #16 MOTION to Appoint Counsel , Appoint Lead Plaintiff MOTION to Consolidate Cases - Notice of Withdraw of Motion filed by Plaintiff Gene Segalis. (Walker, Jacob)
April 16, 2019 Filing 21 BRIEF in Support of #20 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:19-cv-00455; 1:19-cv-00514 MOTION to Appoint Counsel As Lead Counsel MOTION for Appointment As Lead Plaintiff filed by Movant Iron Workers Local 580 Joint Funds. (Lieberman, Jeremy)
April 16, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:19-cv-00455; 1:19-cv-00514, MOTION to Appoint Counsel As Lead Counsel, MOTION for Appointment As Lead Plaintiff by Movant Iron Workers Local 580 Joint Funds. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Document Text of Proposed Order, #2 Affidavit Declaration of Jeremy A. Lieberman in Support of Motion, #3 Exhibit A to Lieberman Declaration - PSLRA Notice, #4 Exhibit B to Lieberman Declaration - certification, #5 Exhibit C to Lieberman Declaration - loss chart, #6 Exhibit D to Lieberman Declaration - Firm Resume)(Lieberman, Jeremy)
April 16, 2019 Filing 19 WITHDRAWN MOTION to Consolidate Cases , MOTION for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Lead Plaintiff's Selection of Counsel by Movant George Murr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Press Release, #2 Exhibit B, Certification, #3 Exhibit C, Loss Chart, #4 Exhibit D, Firm Resume, #5 Exhibit E, Firm Resume, #6 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Glenn, Rusty) (Modified on 10/2/2019 Pursuant to the #29 Notice to Withdraw)(evana, ).
April 16, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION to Consolidate Cases , MOTION to Appoint Counsel , MOTION for Appointment of Lead Plaintiff by Movant Electrical Workers Pension Fund, Local 103 I.B.E.W.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only), #2 Declaration of Paul R. Wood, #3 Ex. 1 to Wood Decl., #4 Ex. 2 to Wood Decl., #5 Ex. 3 to Wood Decl., #6 Ex. 4 to Wood Decl., #7 Ex. 5 to Wood Decl., #8 Ex. 6 to Wood Decl., #9 Ex. 7 to Wood Decl.)(Wood, Paul)
April 16, 2019 Filing 17 DECLARATION of Jacob A. Walker regarding MOTION to Appoint Counsel , Appoint Lead Plaintiff MOTION to Consolidate Cases #16 by Plaintiff Gene Segalis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Press Release, #2 Exhibit B - Certification, #3 Exhibit C - Firm Resume)(Walker, Jacob)
April 16, 2019 Filing 16 WITHDRAWN MOTION to Appoint Counsel , Appoint Lead Plaintiff, MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Plaintiff Gene Segalis. (Walker, Jacob) Modified on 8/20/2019 pursuant to #49 Minute Order (tsher, ).
April 16, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to Consolidate Cases , MOTION for Appointment of Lead Plaintiff, MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Interested Parties Metropolitan Transportation Authority, Manhattan and Bronx Surface Transit Operating Authority. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Matthew Guirey, #2 Exhibit Guirey Decl Ex. A - Notice, #3 Exhibit Guirey Decl Ex. 2 - Certifications, #4 Exhibit Guirey Decl Ex 3 - Loss Charts, #5 Exhibit Guirey Decl Ex. 4 - Wolf Haldenstein resume, #6 Proposed Order (PDF Only) Guirey Ex. 5 - Proposed Order)(Cody-Hopkins, Karen)
April 15, 2019 Filing 14 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Jacobsen, Joni)
April 12, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance of Jacqueline V. Roeder by Jacqueline Ventre Roeder on behalf of All Defendants Attorney Jacqueline Ventre Roeder added to party Mark R Hunter(pty:dft), Attorney Jacqueline Ventre Roeder added to party Tracey I Joubert(pty:dft), Attorney Jacqueline Ventre Roeder added to party Molson Coors Brewing Company(pty:dft) (Roeder, Jacqueline)
April 12, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance of Kenzo Kawanabe by Kenzo Sunao Kawanabe on behalf of All Defendants Attorney Kenzo Sunao Kawanabe added to party Mark R Hunter(pty:dft), Attorney Kenzo Sunao Kawanabe added to party Tracey I Joubert(pty:dft), Attorney Kenzo Sunao Kawanabe added to party Molson Coors Brewing Company(pty:dft) (Kawanabe, Kenzo)
April 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER OF REFERENCE TO UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b) (1)(A) and (B) and F.R.Civ.P. 72(a) and (b), United States Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty is designated to conduct proceedings in this civil action as follows: Convene a scheduling conference under F.R.Civ.P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2.; Conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause; Convene such settlement conferences and direct related procedures authorized by law and the Federal Rules as may facilitate resolution of this case; Hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions; Conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions; Conduct a pretrial conference and enter a pretrial order, by Judge David M. Ebel on 4/11/2019. (evana, )
April 10, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by David H. Kistenbroker on behalf of All Defendants Attorney David H. Kistenbroker added to party Mark R Hunter(pty:dft), Attorney David H. Kistenbroker added to party Tracey I Joubert(pty:dft), Attorney David H. Kistenbroker added to party Molson Coors Brewing Company(pty:dft) (Kistenbroker, David)
April 10, 2019 Filing 9 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #7 Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge. All parties do not consent. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge David M. Ebel. All future pleadings should be designated as 19-cv-00455-DME. (Text Only Entry) (tsher, )
April 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER re: #7 Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge filed by Gene Segalis by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 4/10/2019. Parties do not consent. The Court directs the Clerk of the Court to reassign this case under D.C.Colo. LCivR 40.1(a). (tsher, )
April 8, 2019 Filing 7 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiff Gene Segalis All parties do not consent.. (Walker, Jacob)
April 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER granting in part and denying in part #5 Joint Motion Regarding Discovery Stay and Briefing Schedule by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 4/3/2019.Consent Form due by 4/10/2019. Scheduling Conference is converted into Status Conference and is set for 4/17/2019 10:30 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. (tsher, )
April 2, 2019 Filing 5 Joint MOTION for Discovery Stay and Briefing Schedule by Defendants Mark R Hunter, Tracey I Joubert, Molson Coors Brewing Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Jacobsen, Joni)
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 2/20/2019. Consent Form due by 4/3/2019. Scheduling Conference set for 4/17/2019 10:30 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. (tsher, )
February 15, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (rvill, )
February 15, 2019 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Text Only Entry. (rvill, )
February 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6535514)Attorney Jacob Allen Walker added to party Gene Segalis(pty:pla), filed by Gene Segalis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certification of Plaintiff, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons)(Walker, Jacob)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Metropolitan Transportation Authority v. Molson Coors Brewing Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Molson Coors Brewing Company
Represented By: Joni Sue Jacobsen
Represented By: David H. Kistenbroker
Represented By: Kenzo Sunao Kawanabe
Represented By: Jacqueline Ventre Roeder
Represented By: Angela Marie Liu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tracey I Joubert
Represented By: Joni Sue Jacobsen
Represented By: David H. Kistenbroker
Represented By: Kenzo Sunao Kawanabe
Represented By: Jacqueline Ventre Roeder
Represented By: Angela Marie Liu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark R Hunter
Represented By: Joni Sue Jacobsen
Represented By: David H. Kistenbroker
Represented By: Kenzo Sunao Kawanabe
Represented By: Jacqueline Ventre Roeder
Represented By: Angela Marie Liu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas D. Tough
Represented By: Joni Sue Jacobsen
Represented By: David H. Kistenbroker
Represented By: Angela Marie Liu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew T. Molson
Represented By: Joni Sue Jacobsen
Represented By: David H. Kistenbroker
Represented By: Angela Marie Liu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles M. Herington
Represented By: Joni Sue Jacobsen
Represented By: David H. Kistenbroker
Represented By: Angela Marie Liu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Franklin W. Hobbs
Represented By: Joni Sue Jacobsen
Represented By: David H. Kistenbroker
Represented By: Angela Marie Liu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louis Vachon
Represented By: Joni Sue Jacobsen
Represented By: David H. Kistenbroker
Represented By: Angela Marie Liu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H. Sanford Riley
Represented By: Joni Sue Jacobsen
Represented By: David H. Kistenbroker
Represented By: Angela Marie Liu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Geoffrey E. Molson
Represented By: Joni Sue Jacobsen
Represented By: David H. Kistenbroker
Represented By: Angela Marie Liu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Lynn Ferguson-McHugh
Represented By: Joni Sue Jacobsen
Represented By: David H. Kistenbroker
Represented By: Angela Marie Liu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Betty K. Devita
Represented By: Joni Sue Jacobsen
Represented By: David H. Kistenbroker
Represented By: Angela Marie Liu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter J. Coors
Represented By: Joni Sue Jacobsen
Represented By: David H. Kistenbroker
Represented By: Angela Marie Liu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Iain J.G. Napier
Represented By: Joni Sue Jacobsen
Represented By: David H. Kistenbroker
Represented By: Angela Marie Liu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roger G. Eaton
Represented By: Joni Sue Jacobsen
Represented By: David H. Kistenbroker
Represented By: Angela Marie Liu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter H. Coors
Represented By: Joni Sue Jacobsen
Represented By: David H. Kistenbroker
Represented By: Angela Marie Liu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gene Segalis
Represented By: Jacob Allen Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Manhattan and Bronx Surface Transit Operating Authority Pension Plan
Represented By: Regina Marie Calcaterra
Represented By: Marisa C. Livesay
Represented By: Kevin Gilbert Cooper
Represented By: Betsy C. Manifold
Represented By: Matthew M. Guiney
Represented By: Karen Jean Cody-Hopkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Metropolitan Transportation Authority Defined Benefit Pension Plan Master Trust
Represented By: Marisa C. Livesay
Represented By: Betsy C. Manifold
Represented By: Matthew M. Guiney
Represented By: Karen Jean Cody-Hopkins
Represented By: Kevin Gilbert Cooper
Represented By: Regina Marie Calcaterra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Larry Sussberg
Represented By: Joseph Alexander Hood, II
Represented By: Jeremy Alan Lieberman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Iron Workers Local 580 Joint Funds
Represented By: Joseph Alexander Hood, II
Represented By: Jeremy Alan Lieberman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Electrical Workers Pension Fund, Local 103 I.B.E.W.
Represented By: Guillaume Buell
Represented By: Paul R. Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: George Murr
Represented By: Rusty Evan Glenn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?