Coffey v. Commissioner, Social Security Administration

Plaintiff: Jennifer L Coffey
Defendant: Commissioner, Social Security Administration
Interested Party: USAO-SS-Noticing and SSA Noticing
Case Number: 1:2019cv00460
Filed: February 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Wiley Y Daniel
Nature of Suit: Social Security - DIWC/DIWW (405(g))
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 11, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Danielle Alicia Pedderson on behalf of Commissioner, Social Security AdministrationAttorney Danielle Alicia Pedderson added to party Commissioner, Social Security Administration(pty:dft) (Pedderson, Danielle)
March 22, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Change of Address/Contact Information of Attorney by Teresa H. Abbott (Abbott, Teresa)
March 14, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by J. Benedict Garcia on behalf of Commissioner, Social Security AdministrationAttorney J. Benedict Garcia added to party Commissioner, Social Security Administration(pty:dft) (Garcia, J.)
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REGARDING INSTRUCTIONS FOR JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN for Social Security Cases, by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 2/19/2019. (Attachments: #1 Case Management Form) (evana, )
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER that the Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs (ECF No. #2 ) is GRANTED, by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 2/19/2019. (evana, )
February 15, 2019 Filing 6 Utility Setting Deadlines: Commissioner, Social Security Administration answer due 4/16/2019. Text Only Entry (evana, )
February 15, 2019 Filing 5 Administrative Notice: Social Security Case Service. Pursuant to the Letter of Agreement signed by the Clerk, U.S. District Court;U.S. Attorneys Office for the District of Colorado (USAO), and Social Security Administration (SSA), service of the initiating document(s) by the plaintiff to the SSA, the U.S. Attorney General, and USAO in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(i) is not necessary unless the court otherwise orders. A summons is not required and will not be issued. (Text Only Entry) (cmadr, )
February 15, 2019 Filing 4 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (cmadr, )
February 15, 2019 Filing 3 Case assigned to Judge Wiley Y. Daniel. Text Only Entry. (cmadr, )
February 15, 2019 Filing 2 Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs. by Plaintiff Jennifer L Coffey. (Abbott, Teresa)
February 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT AND PETITION FOR REVIEW against Nancy A. Berryhill Attorney Teresa H. Abbott added to party Jennifer L Coffey(pty:pla), filed by Jennifer L Coffey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Abbott, Teresa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Coffey v. Commissioner, Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: USAO-SS-Noticing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA Noticing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner, Social Security Administration
Represented By: J. Benedict Garcia
Represented By: Danielle Alicia Pedderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer L Coffey
Represented By: Teresa H. Abbott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?