Estate of Daniel B. Culver, Deceased ANB Bank, Executor v. USA

Plaintiff: Estate of Daniel B. Culver, Deceased ANB Bank, Executor
Defendant: United States of America and USA
Case Number: 1:2019cv00462
Filed: February 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Raymond P Moore
Referring Judge: N Reid Neureiter
Nature of Suit: Tax Suits
Cause of Action: 28:1346
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 11, 2019 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE of Mailing/Service re #1 Complaint,, US Attorney, Denver, CO by Plaintiff Estate of Daniel B. Culver, Deceased ANB Bank, Executor. (Gaertner, Susan)
March 11, 2019 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE of Mailing/Service re #1 Complaint,, US Attorney General, Washington, DC by Plaintiff Estate of Daniel B. Culver, Deceased ANB Bank, Executor. (Gaertner, Susan)
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 5/8/2019 09:30 AM in Courtroom C205 before Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter, by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 2/21/2019. (jgonz, )
February 21, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Sally Stolen Grossman on behalf of Estate of Daniel B. Culver, Deceased ANB Bank, ExecutorAttorney Sally Stolen Grossman added to party Estate of Daniel B. Culver, Deceased ANB Bank, Executor(pty:pla) (Grossman, Sally)
February 21, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (cthom, )
February 21, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by James Robert Thomson on behalf of Estate of Daniel B. Culver, Deceased ANB Bank, ExecutorAttorney James Robert Thomson added to party Estate of Daniel B. Culver, Deceased ANB Bank, Executor(pty:pla) (Thomson, James)
February 21, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS REQUEST as to United States of American c/o William Bar, Attorney General re #1 Complaint,, by Plaintiff Estate of Daniel B. Culver, Deceased ANB Bank, Executor. (Gaertner, Susan)
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER: With the assignment of this matter, the parties are advised that throughout this case they are expected to be familiar and comply with not only the Local Rules of this District, but also Judge Raymond P. Moore's Civil Practice Standards, which may be found at: http://www.cod.uscourts.gov/JudicialOfficers/ActiveArticleIIIJudges/HonRaymondPMoore.aspx. SO ORDERED by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 2/20/2019. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec )
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, (4) conduct a pretrial conference and enter a pretrial order, and (5) conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions. Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, this court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. Entered by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 2/20/2019. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec )
February 19, 2019 Filing 4 MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE. Case returned to Judge Raymond P. Moore for all further proceedings. Judge Robert E. Blackburn is no longer assigned to case. (dkals, )
February 19, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (dbera, )
February 15, 2019 Filing 2 Case assigned to Judge Robert E. Blackburn and drawn to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. Text Only Entry (dbera, )
February 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against United States of America (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6536508)Attorney Susan Emily Gaertner added to party Estate of Daniel B. Culver, Deceased ANB Bank, Executor(pty:pla), filed by Estate of Daniel B. Culver, Deceased ANB Bank, Executor. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B-1, #3 Exhibit B-2, #4 Exhibit B-3, #5 Exhibit B-4, #6 Exhibit B-5, #7 Exhibit B-6, #8 Exhibit B-7, #9 Exhibit B-8, #10 Exhibit C, #11 Exhibit D, #12 Exhibit E, #13 Exhibit F, #14 Exhibit G, #15 Exhibit H, #16 Civil Cover Sheet, #17 Summons #1, #18 Summons #2)(Gaertner, Susan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Estate of Daniel B. Culver, Deceased ANB Bank, Executor v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estate of Daniel B. Culver, Deceased ANB Bank, Executor
Represented By: Susan Emily Gaertner
Represented By: James Robert Thomson
Represented By: Sally Stolen Grossman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?