Altigen Communications, Inc. v. CTI Communications, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Altigen Communications, Inc.
Defendant: Richard Browne, CTI Communications, LLC and CTIcommunications.com LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00488
Filed: February 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: R Brooke Jackson
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 19, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Tracy A. Oldemeyer on behalf of Richard Browne, CTI Communications, LLC, CTIcommunications.com LLCAttorney Tracy A. Oldemeyer added to party Richard Browne(pty:dft), Attorney Tracy A. Oldemeyer added to party CTI Communications, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Tracy A. Oldemeyer added to party CTIcommunications.com LLC(pty:dft) (Oldemeyer, Tracy)
April 19, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Amended Pleading by Plaintiff Altigen Communications, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Summons)(Bruno, Harold)
April 19, 2019 Filing 11 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Richard Browne, CTI Communications, LLC, filed by Altigen Communications, Inc..(Bruno, Harold)
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER TO SET SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: This matter comes before the Court sua sponte. The parties are ordered to set an initial scheduling conference in this Court (with Judge Jackson) pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.1 no later than 45 days after the answer, motion to dismiss or other response to the complaint is filed. The parties are directed to jointly contact Chambers by telephone at (303) 844-4694 or by email at Jackson_Chambers@cod.uscourts.gov to obtain a scheduling conference date. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 2/22/19. (rbjsec. )
February 21, 2019 Filing 9 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #8 Memorandum Returning Case. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge R. Brooke Jackson. All future pleadings should be designated as 19-cv-00488-RBJ. (Text Only Entry) (rkeec)
February 21, 2019 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel. (rkeec)
February 20, 2019 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT re #6 Summons Issued Waiver of Service of Summons by Plaintiff Altigen Communications, Inc.. (Bruno, Harold)
February 20, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (evana, )
February 20, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS REQUEST as to CTI Communications, LLC, & Richard Browne re #1 Complaint, by Plaintiff Altigen Communications, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Bruno, Harold)
February 19, 2019 Filing 4 Report re Copyright: Report on the filing of an action emailed separately to the Director of the Copyright Office. (rroge, )
February 19, 2019 Filing 3 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). No Summons Issued. (rroge, )
February 19, 2019 Filing 2 Case assigned to Judge Wiley Y. Daniel and drawn to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. Text Only Entry. (rroge, )
February 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6540026)Attorney Harold R. Bruno, III added to party Altigen Communications, Inc.(pty:pla), filed by Altigen Communications, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Bruno, Harold)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Altigen Communications, Inc. v. CTI Communications, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Browne
Represented By: Tracy A. Oldemeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CTI Communications, LLC
Represented By: Tracy A. Oldemeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CTIcommunications.com LLC
Represented By: Tracy A. Oldemeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Altigen Communications, Inc.
Represented By: Harold R. Bruno, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?