Castle & Cook Mortgage, LLC v. Harris et al
Plaintiff: CASTLE & COOK MORTGAGE and Castle & Cook Mortgage, LLC
Defendant: SECRETARY HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT, Angela M. Harris, Thomas S. Mowle and Secretary of Housing and Urban Development, The
Case Number: 1:2019cv00497
Filed: February 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: R Brooke Jackson
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1446tl
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 16, 2019 Filing 21 RESPONSE to #14 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by Defendant Secretary of Housing and Urban Development filed by Plaintiff Castle & Cook Mortgage, LLC. (Van Remortel, Fred)
April 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #19 First Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #14 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint. The response is now due by April 16, 2019. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 4/10/19. Text Only Entry (rbjsec,.)
April 9, 2019 Filing 19 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #14 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by Plaintiff Castle & Cook Mortgage, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only) Granting Extension of Time to File Response)(Van Remortel, Fred)
April 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MINUTE ORDER: A Scheduling Conference is set for 6/25/2019 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom A 902 before Judge R. Brooke Jackson. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 4/3/19. Text Only Entry (rbjsec.)
March 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER TO SET SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: This matter comes before the Court sua sponte. In light of the decline of consent to a magistrate judge by one or more of the parties in this case and its reassignment to this Court, the Scheduling Conference set April 22, 2019 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya is VACATED. The parties are ordered to set an initial scheduling conference in this Court (with Judge Jackson) pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.1. The parties are directed to jointly contact Chambers by telephone at (303) 844-4694 or by email at Jackson_Chambers@cod.uscourts.gov to obtain a scheduling conference date within 14 days of the date of this order. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 3/22/19. (rbjsec. )
March 21, 2019 Filing 16 MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE by Senior Judge Blackburn. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge R. Brooke Jackson. All future pleadings should be designated as 19-cv-00497-RBJ. (athom, )
March 21, 2019 Filing 15 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #13 Consent/Non-Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge. All parties do not consent. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Robert E. Blackburn. All future pleadings should be designated as 19-cv-00497-REB. (Text Only Entry) (jgonz, )
March 19, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant Secretary of Housing and Urban Development, The. (Garcia, J.)
March 19, 2019 Filing 13 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiff Castle & Cook Mortgage, LLC All parties do not consent.. (Van Remortel, Fred)
February 27, 2019 Filing 12 RESPONSE to #11 Notice (Other) by Defendant Secretary of Housing and Urban Development, The. (Garcia, J.)
February 27, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE State Docket Sheet by Defendant Secretary of Housing and Urban Development, The (Garcia, J.)
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 4/22/2019 09:30 AM in Courtroom 101 (Colorado Springs) before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 02/26/2019. (ksena)
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Complaint. Defendant Secretary of Housing and Urban Development shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint no later than 3/19/2019. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 2/21/19. Text Only Entry (kmtlc1 )
February 20, 2019 Filing 8 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond by Defendant Secretary of Housing and Urban Development, The. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Garcia, J.)
February 20, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE re #1 Notice of Removal, by Defendant Secretary of Housing and Urban Development, The (Garcia, J.)
February 20, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance for Castle and Cooke Mortgage, LLC by Fred Van Remortel on behalf of Castle & Cook Mortgage, LLCAttorney Fred Van Remortel added to party Castle & Cook Mortgage, LLC(pty:pla) (Van Remortel, Fred)
February 19, 2019 Filing 5 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (rroge, )
February 19, 2019 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Text Only Entry. (rroge, )
February 19, 2019 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against Angela M. Harris, Thomas S. Mowle, Secretary of Housing and Urban Development, The, filed by Castle & Cook Mortgage, LLC.(rroge, )
February 19, 2019 Filing 2 FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawls of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (rroge, )
February 19, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by SECRETARY HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT from District Court, El Paso County, Colorado, Case Number 2018cv32847., filed by SECRETARY HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit State Court Complaint, #4 Exhibit)(Garcia, J.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Castle & Cook Mortgage, LLC v. Harris et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CASTLE & COOK MORTGAGE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Castle & Cook Mortgage, LLC
Represented By: Fred Van Remortel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SECRETARY HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT
Represented By: J. Benedict Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angela M. Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas S. Mowle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secretary of Housing and Urban Development, The
Represented By: J. Benedict Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?