Sussberg v. Molson Coors Brewing Company et al
Plaintiff: Larry Sussberg
Defendant: Mark R Hunter, Tracey I Joubert and Molson Coors Brewing Company
Petitioner: George Murr
Interested Party: Metropolitan Transportation Authority and Manhattan and Bronx Surface Transit Operating Authority
Case Number: 1:2019cv00514
Filed: February 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Kristen L Mix
Nature of Suit: Securities, Commodities, Exchange
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 16, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Movant George Murr's Motion for Consolidation of Related Actions, Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Counsel by Movant George Murr (Glenn, Rusty)
April 16, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Consolidate Cases , MOTION for Appointment of Lead Plaintiff, MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Interested Parties Metropolitan Transportation Authority, Manhattan and Bronx Surface Transit Operating Authority. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Guirey Declaration, #2 Exhibit Guirey Decl Ex. 1 - Notice, #3 Exhibit Guirey Decl Ex. 2 - Certifications, #4 Exhibit Guirey Decl Ex. 3 - Loss Charts, #5 Exhibit Guirey Decl Ex. 4 - Wolf Haldenstein resume, #6 Proposed Order (PDF Only) Guirey Decl Ex 5 Proposed Order)(Cody-Hopkins, Karen)
March 25, 2019 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Larry Sussberg. Mark R Hunter waiver sent on 3/19/2019, answer due 5/20/2019. (Lieberman, Jeremy)
March 25, 2019 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Larry Sussberg. Tracey I Joubert waiver sent on 3/19/2019, answer due 5/20/2019. (Lieberman, Jeremy)
March 25, 2019 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Larry Sussberg. Molson Coors Brewing Company waiver sent on 3/19/2019, answer due 5/20/2019. (Lieberman, Jeremy)
March 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING/PLANNING CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 3/8/19. Scheduling Conference set for 7/19/2019 2:00 PM in Courtroom A401 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1, #2 Attachment 2) (lgale, )
February 21, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Joseph Alexander Hood, II on behalf of Larry SussbergAttorney Joseph Alexander Hood, II added to party Larry Sussberg(pty:pla) (Hood, Joseph)
February 21, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (rvill, )
February 21, 2019 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. Text Only Entry. (rvill, )
February 21, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Molson Coors Brewing Company, Mark R. Hunter, and Tracey I. Joubert re #1 Complaint, by Plaintiff Larry Sussberg. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Lieberman, Jeremy)
February 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Mark R Hunter, Tracey I Joubert, Molson Coors Brewing Company (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6544166)Attorney Jeremy Alan Lieberman added to party Larry Sussberg(pty:pla), filed by Larry Sussberg.(Lieberman, Jeremy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sussberg v. Molson Coors Brewing Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark R Hunter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tracey I Joubert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Molson Coors Brewing Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Sussberg
Represented By: Joseph Alexander Hood, II
Represented By: Jeremy Alan Lieberman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Metropolitan Transportation Authority
Represented By: Karen Jean Cody-Hopkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Manhattan and Bronx Surface Transit Operating Authority
Represented By: Karen Jean Cody-Hopkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: George Murr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?