Gish et al v. Real Time Resolutions, Inc.
Plaintiff: Anne K. Gish and Jeremiah J. Gish
Defendant: Real Time Resolutions, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00517
Filed: February 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: N Reid Neureiter
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 12:2605
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MINUTE ORDER re #8 Defendants Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 4/12/2019. Motion Hearing set for 4/29/2019 11:00 AM in Courtroom C205 before Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. (slibi, )
April 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER OF REFERENCE. Pursuant to the consent of the parties to the jurisdiction of the magistrate judge #16 , this case is referred to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter for all purposes pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). By Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 4/12/19. Text Only Entry (pabsec)
April 12, 2019 Filing 16 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendant Real Time Resolutions, Inc. All parties consent.. (Jeanfreau, Charles)
April 12, 2019 Filing 15 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendant Real Time Resolutions, Inc. All parties consent.. (Jeanfreau, Charles)
April 9, 2019 Filing 14 Plaintiff's OPPOSITION to re #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Plaintiffs Anne K. Gish, Jeremiah J. Gish (tsher, )
April 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MINUTE ORDER re: #12 Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge filed by Real Time Resolutions, Inc. by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 4/9/2019. Consent Form due by 4/12/2019. PLEASE READ ATTACHED MINUTE ORDER. (tsher, )
April 5, 2019 Filing 12 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendant Real Time Resolutions, Inc. All parties consent.. (Jeanfreau, Charles)
March 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MINUTE ORDER Consent/Non-Consent Form due by 4/5/2019, by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 3/28/2019. (slibi, )
March 21, 2019 Filing 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Real Time Group, Inc. for Real Time Resolutions, Inc.. (Jeanfreau, Charles)
March 21, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of Mailing/Service re #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Defendant Real Time Resolutions, Inc.. (Jeanfreau, Charles)
March 20, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Defendant Real Time Resolutions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Jeanfreau, Charles)
March 5, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Lisa Cancanon on behalf of Real Time Resolutions, Inc.Attorney Lisa Cancanon added to party Real Time Resolutions, Inc.(pty:dft) (Cancanon, Lisa)
March 5, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Deanna Lee Westfall on behalf of Real Time Resolutions, Inc.Attorney Deanna Lee Westfall added to party Real Time Resolutions, Inc.(pty:dft) (Westfall, Deanna)
March 4, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Charles Harris Jeanfreau, Jr on behalf of Real Time Resolutions, Inc.Attorney Charles Harris Jeanfreau, Jr added to party Real Time Resolutions, Inc.(pty:dft) (Jeanfreau, Charles)
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Setting Status Conference for Pro se Plaintiff for 4/29/2019 11:00 AM in Courtroom C205 before Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter, by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 2/26/2019. Consent/Non-Consent Form due on or before 4/15/2019. (slibi, )
February 21, 2019 Filing 3 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. Summons issued in paper format over the counter. (cmadr, )
February 21, 2019 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. Text Only Entry. (cmadr, )
February 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Real Time Resolutions, Inc. Filing Fee: ($400.00Receipt Number:COX89069), filed by Jeremiah J. Gish, Anne K. Gish. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits)(cmadr, ) Modified to correct entry on 2/21/2019 (cmadr, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gish et al v. Real Time Resolutions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anne K. Gish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeremiah J. Gish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Real Time Resolutions, Inc.
Represented By: Charles Harris Jeanfreau, Jr.
Represented By: Lisa Cancanon
Represented By: Deanna Lee Westfall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?