Friends of Animals v. United States Bureau of Land Management

Plaintiff: Friends of Animals
Defendant: Bureau of Land Management and United States Bureau of Land Management
Case Number: 1:2019cv00541
Filed: February 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: N Reid Neureiter
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act of 1974
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER OF REFERENCE. Pursuant to the consent of the parties to the jurisdiction of the magistrate judge #9 , this case is referred to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter for all purposes pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c).By Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 4/18/19. Text Only Entry (pabsec)
April 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MINUTE ORDER granting #10 Motion to Vacate Status Conference and Stay Proceedings, by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 4/18/2019. The Scheduling Conference set for 5/2/2019 at 10:00 a.m. is VACATED. Case is STAYED until 6/1/2019. PLEASE READ ATTACHED MINUTE ORDER. (tsher, )
April 17, 2019 Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION to Stay re #6 Order, and Stay Proceedings by Plaintiff Friends of Animals. (Harris, Michael)
April 17, 2019 Filing 9 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiff Friends of Animals All parties consent.. (Harris, Michael)
March 29, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by United States Bureau of Land Management.(Steiner, Logan)
March 12, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Logan Ann Steiner on behalf of United States Bureau of Land ManagementAttorney Logan Ann Steiner added to party United States Bureau of Land Management(pty:dft) (Steiner, Logan)
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Setting Scheduling/Planning Conference and Setting Deadline for Filing of Consent/Non-Consent Form, by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 2/26/2019. Consent/Non-Consent Form due on or before 4/18/2019. Scheduling/Planning Conference set for 5/2/2019 10:00 AM in Courtroom C205 before Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. (slibi, )
February 25, 2019 Filing 5 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (athom, )
February 25, 2019 Filing 4 MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE by Senior Judge Blackburn. This case is randomly reassigned to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. All future pleadings should be designated as 19-cv-00541-NRN. (athom, )
February 25, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (rroge, )
February 25, 2019 Filing 2 Case assigned to Judge Robert E. Blackburn and drawn to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. Text Only Entry. (rroge, )
February 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Bureau of Land Management (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6549858)Attorney Michael Ray Harris added to party Friends of Animals(pty:pla), filed by Friends of Animals. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Exhibit A-C)(Harris, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Friends of Animals v. United States Bureau of Land Management
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bureau of Land Management
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Bureau of Land Management
Represented By: Logan Ann Steiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Friends of Animals
Represented By: Michael Ray Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?