Lopez v. UQM Technologies, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Precy Lopez
Defendant: John E. Sztykiel, Joseph R. Mitchell, Stephen J. Roy, Joseph P. Sellinger, UQM Technologies, Inc. and Donald W. Vanlandingham
Case Number: 1:2019cv00543
Filed: February 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Michael E Hegarty
Referring Judge: Marcia S Krieger
2 Judge: William J Martinez
Nature of Suit: Securities, Commodities, Exchange
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 78
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 24, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Case by Plaintiff Precy Lopez (Monteverde, Juan)
April 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MINUTE ORDER granting #21 Stipulation to Continue Case Management Conference by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 04/15/2019. Scheduling Conference set for 4/16/2019 is vacated and rescheduled to 8/5/2019 10:30 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. (mdave, )
April 15, 2019 Filing 22 MEMORANDUM regarding #21 MOTION to Continue filed by Stephen J. Roy, Joseph R. Mitchell, John E. Sztykiel, UQM Technologies, Inc., Joseph P. Sellinger, Donald W. Vanlandingham. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty by Judge William J. Martinez on 4/15/2019. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, )
April 12, 2019 Filing 21 STIPULATION re #6 Minute Order of the Parites to Continue Case Management Conference by Defendants Joseph R. Mitchell, Stephen J. Roy, Joseph P. Sellinger, John E. Sztykiel, UQM Technologies, Inc., Donald W. Vanlandingham. (Wagner, Thomas) Modified on 4/15/2019 to correct event (angar, ).
April 12, 2019 Filing 20 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Precy Lopez. Joseph P. Sellinger waiver sent on 2/26/2019, answer due 4/29/2019. (Monteverde, Juan)
April 12, 2019 Filing 19 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Precy Lopez. Joseph R. Mitchell waiver sent on 2/26/2019, answer due 4/29/2019. (Monteverde, Juan)
April 12, 2019 Filing 18 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Precy Lopez. John E. Sztykiel waiver sent on 2/26/2019, answer due 4/29/2019. (Monteverde, Juan)
April 12, 2019 Filing 17 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Precy Lopez. Stephen J. Roy waiver sent on 2/26/2019, answer due 4/29/2019. (Monteverde, Juan)
April 12, 2019 Filing 16 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Precy Lopez. Donald W. Vanlandingham waiver sent on 2/26/2019, answer due 4/29/2019. (Monteverde, Juan)
April 12, 2019 Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Precy Lopez. UQM Technologies, Inc. waiver sent on 2/26/2019, answer due 4/29/2019. (Monteverde, Juan)
March 4, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Bryan Michael Westhoff on behalf of All Defendants Attorney Bryan Michael Westhoff added to party Joseph R. Mitchell(pty:dft), Attorney Bryan Michael Westhoff added to party Stephen J. Roy(pty:dft), Attorney Bryan Michael Westhoff added to party Joseph P. Sellinger(pty:dft), Attorney Bryan Michael Westhoff added to party John E. Sztykiel(pty:dft), Attorney Bryan Michael Westhoff added to party UQM Technologies, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Bryan Michael Westhoff added to party Donald W. Vanlandingham(pty:dft) (Westhoff, Bryan)
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 AMENDED Order Referring Case 4 Magistrate Judge Hegarty is designated to conduct NDISPO proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 72(a) and (b). Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the Magistrate Judge or on the request of the parties by motion, the court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. SO ORDERED by Judge William J. Martinez on 3/4/2019. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, )
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER DIRECTING TRANSFER OF CASE by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 3/4/19. Case reassigned to Judge William J. Martinez for all further proceedings. Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger no longer assigned to case. (dkals, )
February 28, 2019 Filing 11 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Wagner, Thomas)
February 28, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF CASE ASSOCIATION by Thomas Hardy Wagner on behalf of All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Franchi Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Carter Complaint)(Wagner, Thomas)
February 28, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Jeffrey Kenneth Reeser on behalf of All Defendants Attorney Jeffrey Kenneth Reeser added to party Joseph R. Mitchell(pty:dft), Attorney Jeffrey Kenneth Reeser added to party Stephen J. Roy(pty:dft), Attorney Jeffrey Kenneth Reeser added to party Joseph P. Sellinger(pty:dft), Attorney Jeffrey Kenneth Reeser added to party John E. Sztykiel(pty:dft), Attorney Jeffrey Kenneth Reeser added to party UQM Technologies, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Jeffrey Kenneth Reeser added to party Donald W. Vanlandingham(pty:dft) (Reeser, Jeffrey)
February 28, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Isuri Marianne Lawson on behalf of All Defendants Attorney Isuri Marianne Lawson added to party Joseph R. Mitchell(pty:dft), Attorney Isuri Marianne Lawson added to party Stephen J. Roy(pty:dft), Attorney Isuri Marianne Lawson added to party Joseph P. Sellinger(pty:dft), Attorney Isuri Marianne Lawson added to party John E. Sztykiel(pty:dft), Attorney Isuri Marianne Lawson added to party UQM Technologies, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Isuri Marianne Lawson added to party Donald W. Vanlandingham(pty:dft) (Lawson, Isuri)
February 28, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Thomas Hardy Wagner on behalf of All Defendants Attorney Thomas Hardy Wagner added to party Joseph R. Mitchell(pty:dft), Attorney Thomas Hardy Wagner added to party Stephen J. Roy(pty:dft), Attorney Thomas Hardy Wagner added to party Joseph P. Sellinger(pty:dft), Attorney Thomas Hardy Wagner added to party John E. Sztykiel(pty:dft), Attorney Thomas Hardy Wagner added to party UQM Technologies, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Thomas Hardy Wagner added to party Donald W. Vanlandingham(pty:dft) (Wagner, Thomas)
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 02/27/2019. Scheduling Conference set for 4/16/2019 01:30 PM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. (mdave, )
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REGARDING CUSTODY OF EXHIBITS AND DEPOSITIONS USED IN EVIDENTIARY HEARINGS AND TRIALS: Any exhibits and depositions used during evidentiary hearings or trials, counsel for the parties shall retrieve the originals of such exhibits and depositions from the Court following the evidentiary hearing or trial, and shall retain same for 60 days beyond the later of the time to appeal or conclusion of any appellate proceedings. The Court will retain its copy of the exhibits for the same time period after which the documents will be destroyed. by Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 2/27/19. Text Only Entry (pglov)
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty: IT IS ORDERED that pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and FED. R. CIV. P. 72(a) and (b), this matter is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to:(1)Convene a scheduling conference under FED. R. CIV. P. 16(b), enter a Scheduling Order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, enter such orders as appropriate to enforce the Scheduling Order, and resolve discovery matters;(2)ADR: Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. Early Neutral Evaluation is approved. On the informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, the Court may direct the parties to engage in a settlement conference conducted by the magistrate judge if the parties have engaged in an Early Neutral Evaluation and are unable to afford or otherwise attain private settlement assistance;(3)Hear and determine referred matters in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B). by Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 2/26/19. Text Only Entry (msklc2, )
February 25, 2019 Filing 3 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). No Summons Issued. (rvill, )
February 25, 2019 Filing 2 Case assigned to Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger and drawn to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Text Only Entry. (rvill, )
February 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Joseph R. Mitchell, Stephen J. Roy, Joseph P. Sellinger, John E. Sztykiel, UQM Technologies, Inc., Donald W. Vanlandingham (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6550085)Attorney Juan E. Monteverde added to party Precy Lopez(pty:pla), filed by Precy Lopez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Monteverde, Juan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lopez v. UQM Technologies, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John E. Sztykiel
Represented By: Bryan Michael Westhoff
Represented By: Thomas Hardy Wagner
Represented By: Isuri Marianne Lawson
Represented By: Jeffrey Kenneth Reeser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph R. Mitchell
Represented By: Bryan Michael Westhoff
Represented By: Thomas Hardy Wagner
Represented By: Isuri Marianne Lawson
Represented By: Jeffrey Kenneth Reeser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen J. Roy
Represented By: Bryan Michael Westhoff
Represented By: Thomas Hardy Wagner
Represented By: Isuri Marianne Lawson
Represented By: Jeffrey Kenneth Reeser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph P. Sellinger
Represented By: Bryan Michael Westhoff
Represented By: Thomas Hardy Wagner
Represented By: Isuri Marianne Lawson
Represented By: Jeffrey Kenneth Reeser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UQM Technologies, Inc.
Represented By: Bryan Michael Westhoff
Represented By: Thomas Hardy Wagner
Represented By: Isuri Marianne Lawson
Represented By: Jeffrey Kenneth Reeser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald W. Vanlandingham
Represented By: Bryan Michael Westhoff
Represented By: Thomas Hardy Wagner
Represented By: Isuri Marianne Lawson
Represented By: Jeffrey Kenneth Reeser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Precy Lopez
Represented By: Juan E. Monteverde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?